This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2016 at 20:57:13 (UTC).

Multimedia Holdings Corporation and Gannett River States Publishing Corporation et al v. The Honorable Mark H. Mahon, Chief Judge of the Fourth Judicial Circuit, In and For Duval, Clay and Nassau Counties, Florida

Case Summary

On 09/26/2014 Multimedia Holdings Corporation and Gannett River States Publishing Corporation filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The Honorable Mark H Mahon, Chief Judge of the Fourth Judicial Circuit, In and For Duval, Clay and Nassau Counties, Florida. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-01177

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Timothy J. Corrigan

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cox Television Jacksonville, LLC, WJAX/WFOX

Multimedia Holdings Corporation and Gannett River States Publishing Corporation

Morris Publishing Group, LLC

Graham Media Group, Florida Inc.

Defendants

The Honorable Mark H. Mahon, Chief Judge of the Fourth Judicial Circuit, in and for Duval, Clay, and Nassau Counties, Florida

The Honorable Donald R. Moran, Jr., Chief Judge, Fourth Judicial Circuit, In and For Duval, Clay and Nassau Counties, Florida

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Suzanne M. Judas

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

Suite 3900, 50 N Laura St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Ben Ziggy Williamson

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

Suite 3900, 50 N Laura St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Jennifer A. Mansfield

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

Suite 3900, 50 N Laura St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

George D. Gabel, Jr.

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

Suite 3900, 50 N Laura St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant Attorneys

Michael E. Lockamy

Attorney at Bedell, Dittmar, DeVault, Pillans & Coxe, PA

101 E Adams St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

John Andrew DeVault, III

Attorney at Bedell, Dittmar, DeVault, Pillans & Coxe, PA

101 E Adams St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The Honorable Donald R. Moran, Jr., Chief Judge, Fourth Judicial Circuit, In and For Duval, Clay and Nassau Counties, Florida (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number JAX13856) filed by Multimedia Holdings Corporation and Gannett River States Publishing Corporation, Morris Publishing Group, LLC, Cox Television Jacksonville, LLC WJAX/WFOX, Graham Media Group, Florida Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (RH) (Entered: 09/30/2014)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS issued as to The Honorable Donald R. Moran, Jr., Chief Judge, Fourth Judicial Circuit, In and For Duval, Clay and Nassau Counties, Florida. (RH) (Entered: 09/30/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/1/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Case Management Report form, # 2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD) (Entered: 10/01/2014)

#4

(#4) AGREED MOTION to extend time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by The Honorable Donald R. Moran, Jr., Chief Judge, Fourth Judicial Circuit, in and for Duval, Clay and Nassau Counties, Florida. (Lockamy, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (Modified on 10/22/2014 to edit text) (DSY). (Entered: 10/22/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Cox Television Jacksonville, LLC, WJAX/WFOX, Graham Media Group, Florida Inc., Morris Publishing Group, LLC, Multimedia Holdings Corporation and Gannett River States Publishing Corporation re 3 Related case order and track 2 notice of Service (Judas, Suzanne) (Entered: 10/22/2014)

#6

(#6) ENDORSED ORDER granting 4 Motion to extend time. On or before November 10, 2014, Defendant shall file an answer or response to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 10/22/2014. (ADM) (Entered: 10/22/2014)

#7

(#7) PROOF of service by Cox Television Jacksonville, LLC, WJAX/WFOX, Graham Media Group, Florida Inc., Morris Publishing Group, LLC, Multimedia Holdings Corporation and Gannett River States Publishing Corporation (Judas, Suzanne) (Entered: 10/29/2014)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by The Honorable Donald R. Moran, Jr., Chief Judge, Fourth Judicial Circuit, In and For Duval, Clay and Nassau Counties, Florida. (Lockamy, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (Entered: 11/07/2014)

#9

(#9) ENDORSED ORDER granting 8 Motion to extend time. On or before December 1, 2014, Defendant shall file an answer or response to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 11/10/2014. (ADM) (Entered: 11/10/2014)

#15

(#15) MOTION for leave to file Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Voluntary Dismissal by Cox Television Jacksonville, LLC, WJAX/WFOX, Graham Media Group, Florida Inc., Morris Publishing Group, LLC, Multimedia Holdings Corporation and Gannett River States Publishing Corporation. (Gabel, George) (Entered: 01/06/2015)

#16

(#16) ORDER denying 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; granting 15 Motion for Leave to File Reply; plaintiffs to file combined response and reply no later than 1/30/2015; defendant permitted to file reply/sur-reply no later than 2/17/2015; case set for hearing on pending motions and status conference on 3/16/2015 at 2:00 p.m., Courtroom 10D; parties to advise re: substitution under FRCP 25(d) by 1/30/2015. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 1/7/2015.(SRW) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

#17

(#17) Joint MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant by The Honorable Donald R. Moran, Jr., Chief Judge, Fourth Judicial Circuit, In and For Duval, Clay and Nassau Counties, Florida. (Lockamy, Michael) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting 17 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 1/26/2015. (ADM) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

#19

(#19) REPLY to Response to Motion re 12 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Voluntary Dismissal of action without prejudice filed by Cox Television Jacksonville, LLC, WJAX/WFOX, Graham Media Group, Florida Inc., Morris Publishing Group, LLC, Multimedia Holdings Corporation and Gannett River States Publishing Corporation. (Gabel, George) (Entered: 01/29/2015)

#20

(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply/Sur-Reply (Agreed) by The Honorable Mark H. Mahon, Chief Judge of the Fourth Judicial Circuit, in and for Duval, Clay, and Nassau Counties, Florida. (Lockamy, Michael) (Entered: 02/12/2015)

#21

(#21) ENDORSED ORDER granting 20 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Reply/Sur-reply. Defendant shall file his reply/sur-reply on or before 2/20/2015. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 2/12/2015. (BJB) (Entered: 02/12/2015)

#22

(#22) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Cox Television Jacksonville, LLC, WJAX/WFOX, Graham Media Group, Florida Inc., Morris Publishing Group, LLC, Multimedia Holdings Corporation and Gannett River States Publishing Corporation. (Gabel, George) (Entered: 02/19/2015)

#23

(#23) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice pursuant to 22 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal without Prejudice. The Clerk should terminate all motions and deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 2/25/2015. (BJB) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice pursuant to 22 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal without Prejudice. The Clerk should terminate all motions and deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 2/25/2015. (BJB) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Cox Television Jacksonville, LLC, WJAX/WFOX, Graham Media Group, Florida Inc., Morris Publishing Group, LLC, Multimedia Holdings Corporation and Gannett River States Publishing Corporation. (Gabel, George) (Entered: 02/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ENDORSED ORDER granting 20 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Reply/Sur-reply. Defendant shall file his reply/sur-reply on or before 2/20/2015. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 2/12/2015. (BJB) (Entered: 02/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply/Sur-Reply (Agreed) by The Honorable Mark H. Mahon, Chief Judge of the Fourth Judicial Circuit, in and for Duval, Clay, and Nassau Counties, Florida. (Lockamy, Michael) (Entered: 02/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) REPLY to Response to Motion re 12 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Voluntary Dismissal of action without prejudice filed by Cox Television Jacksonville, LLC, WJAX/WFOX, Graham Media Group, Florida Inc., Morris Publishing Group, LLC, Multimedia Holdings Corporation and Gannett River States Publishing Corporation. (Gabel, George) (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting 17 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 1/26/2015. (ADM) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Joint MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant by The Honorable Donald R. Moran, Jr., Chief Judge, Fourth Judicial Circuit, In and For Duval, Clay and Nassau Counties, Florida. (Lockamy, Michael) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER denying 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; granting 15 Motion for Leave to File Reply; plaintiffs to file combined response and reply no later than 1/30/2015; defendant permitted to file reply/sur-reply no later than 2/17/2015; case set for hearing on pending motions and status conference on 3/16/2015 at 2:00 p.m., Courtroom 10D; parties to advise re: substitution under FRCP 25(d) by 1/30/2015. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 1/7/2015.(SRW) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for leave to file Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Voluntary Dismissal by Cox Television Jacksonville, LLC, WJAX/WFOX, Graham Media Group, Florida Inc., Morris Publishing Group, LLC, Multimedia Holdings Corporation and Gannett River States Publishing Corporation. (Gabel, George) (Entered: 01/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Cox Television Jacksonville, LLC, WJAX/WFOX, Graham Media Group, Florida Inc., Morris Publishing Group, LLC, Multimedia Holdings Corporation and Gannett River States Publishing Corporation. (Gabel, George) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (Entered: 01/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by The Honorable Donald R. Moran, Jr., Chief Judge, Fourth Judicial Circuit, In and For Duval, Clay and Nassau Counties, Florida.(Lockamy, Michael) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ENDORSED ORDER granting 8 Motion to extend time. On or before December 1, 2014, Defendant shall file an answer or response to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 11/10/2014. (ADM) (Entered: 11/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by The Honorable Donald R. Moran, Jr., Chief Judge, Fourth Judicial Circuit, In and For Duval, Clay and Nassau Counties, Florida. (Lockamy, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (Entered: 11/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROOF of service by Cox Television Jacksonville, LLC, WJAX/WFOX, Graham Media Group, Florida Inc., Morris Publishing Group, LLC, Multimedia Holdings Corporation and Gannett River States Publishing Corporation (Judas, Suzanne) (Entered: 10/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENDORSED ORDER granting 4 Motion to extend time. On or before November 10, 2014, Defendant shall file an answer or response to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 10/22/2014. (ADM) (Entered: 10/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by Cox Television Jacksonville, LLC, WJAX/WFOX, Graham Media Group, Florida Inc., Morris Publishing Group, LLC, Multimedia Holdings Corporation and Gannett River States Publishing Corporation re 3 Related case order and track 2 notice of Service (Judas, Suzanne) (Entered: 10/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AGREED MOTION to extend time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by The Honorable Donald R. Moran, Jr., Chief Judge, Fourth Judicial Circuit, in and for Duval, Clay and Nassau Counties, Florida. (Lockamy, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (Modified on 10/22/2014 to edit text) (DSY). (Entered: 10/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/1/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Case Management Report form, # 2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD) (Entered: 10/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS issued as to The Honorable Donald R. Moran, Jr., Chief Judge, Fourth Judicial Circuit, In and For Duval, Clay and Nassau Counties, Florida. (RH) (Entered: 09/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against The Honorable Donald R. Moran, Jr., Chief Judge, Fourth Judicial Circuit, In and For Duval, Clay and Nassau Counties, Florida (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number JAX13856) filed by Multimedia Holdings Corporation and Gannett River States Publishing Corporation, Morris Publishing Group, LLC, Cox Television Jacksonville, LLC WJAX/WFOX, Graham Media Group, Florida Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (RH) (Entered: 09/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less