This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 02:31:07 (UTC).

M.S. et al v. Respress et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2014 M S filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Respress. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Paul W. Grimm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:14-CV-02831

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Paul W. Grimm

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sheila Spencer

M.S.

Defendants

Charles County, Maryland

James E. Richmond

Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education

One unknown official of West Lake High School, Charles County, Maryland

Joe Wesley Respress, III

Chrystal Benson

One other unknown official of a Charles County, Maryland School

Andterri El Amin

Roberta S. Wise

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John P Fatherree

Attorney at Law Office of John P Fatherree

717 D St Nw Ste 300

Washington, DC 20004

Tyler King

Attorney at Tyler Jay King Esq Attorney At Law

1420 N St Nw Ste 706

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew G Scott

Attorney at Pessin Katz Law PA

901 Dulaney Valley Rd Ste 400

Towson, MD 21204

Edmund J O Meally

Attorney at Pessin Katz Law PA

901 Dulaney Valley Rd Ste 400

Towson, MD 21204

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, One other unknown official of a Charles County, Maryland School, One unknown official of West Lake High School, Charles County, Maryland, Joe Wesley Respress, III, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise filed by M.S., Sheila Spencer.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, One other unknown official of a Charles County, Maryland School, One unknown official of West Lake High School, Charles County, Maryland, Joe Wesley Respress, III, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise filed by M.S., Sheila Spencer.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, One other unknown official of a Charles County, Maryland School, One unknown official of West Lake High School, Charles County, Maryland, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#6

(#6) Statement of Filing and Service of Notification of Removal by Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, One other unknown official of a Charles County, Maryland School, One unknown official of West Lake High School, Charles County, Maryland, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#7

(#7) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, One other unknown official of a Charles County, Maryland School, One unknown official of West Lake High School, Charles County, Maryland, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#8

(#8) (FILED IN ERROR) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/8/14. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/8/2014 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#9

(#9) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/8/14. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#32

(#32) REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimPARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise. (Scott, Andrew) (Entered: 10/14/2014)

#34

(#34) QC NOTICE: 33 Notice (Other) filed by M.S. was filed incorrectly. **Discovery material is not filed with the Court pursuant to Local Rule 104. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/15/2014)

#35

(#35) STIPULATION JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER by Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit #1)(O Meally, Edmund) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

#36

(#36) ORDER granting 35 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Confidentiality. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/23/14. (jf2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

#37

(#37) STIPULATION of Dismissal STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise. (Scott, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

#38

(#38) PAPERLESS ORDER CONSTRUING as an unopposed Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 motion the Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice, 37 , that Plaintiffs M.S. and Sheila Spencer and Defendants Board of Education of Charles County, Roberta S. Wise, James E. Richmond, Chrystal Benson, and Andterri El Amin (collectively, the "Board Defendants") filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), regarding the dismissal with prejudice of the Board Defendants and not Defendant Joe Wesley Respress III; and GRANTING the motion 37 . See Young v. UPS, No. DKC-08-2586, 2011 WL 665321, at *7 (D. Md. Feb. 14, 2011) (stating that when a plaintiff wants to dismiss less than an entire action, Rule 15 is the proper vehicle). This case will proceed as to Defendant Joe Wesley Respress III only. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/01/2014. (lyb)(Grimm, Paul) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

#39

(#39) PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in light of 37 and 38 . Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/1/2014. (Grimm, Paul) (lyb) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

#40

(#40) MOTION for Summary Judgment by M.S., Sheila Spencer. Responses due by 3/26/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Exhibit Statement of Material Facts not in Dispute, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, Criminal Docket, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(King, Tyler) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

#41

(#41) Supplemental to 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by M.S., Sheila Spencer Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute. (King, Tyler) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Supplemental to 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by M.S., Sheila Spencer Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute. (King, Tyler) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) MOTION for Summary Judgment by M.S., Sheila Spencer. Responses due by 3/26/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Exhibit Statement of Material Facts not in Dispute, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, Criminal Docket, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(King, Tyler) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in light of 37 and 38 . Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/1/2014. (Grimm, Paul) (lyb) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) PAPERLESS ORDER CONSTRUING as an unopposed Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 motion the Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice, 37 , that Plaintiffs M.S. and Sheila Spencer and Defendants Board of Education of Charles County, Roberta S. Wise, James E. Richmond, Chrystal Benson, and Andterri El Amin (collectively, the "Board Defendants") filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), regarding the dismissal with prejudice of the Board Defendants and not Defendant Joe Wesley Respress III; and GRANTING the motion 37 . See Young v. UPS, No. DKC-08-2586, 2011 WL 665321, at *7 (D. Md. Feb. 14, 2011) (stating that when a plaintiff wants to dismiss less than an entire action, Rule 15 is the proper vehicle). This case will proceed as to Defendant Joe Wesley Respress III only. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/01/2014. (lyb)(Grimm, Paul) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) STIPULATION of Dismissal STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise. (Scott, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ORDER granting 35 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Confidentiality. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/23/14. (jf2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) STIPULATION JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER by Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit #1)(O Meally, Edmund) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) QC NOTICE: 33 Notice (Other) filed by M.S. was filed incorrectly. **Discovery material is not filed with the Court pursuant to Local Rule 104. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimPARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise. (Scott, Andrew) (Entered: 10/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) RESPONSE in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimPARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS filed by M.S., Sheila Spencer. Replies due by 10/27/2014. (King, Tyler) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE re 9 Standing Order Concerning Removal RESPONSE TO STANDING ORDER CONCERNING REMOVAL filed by Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, One other unknown official of a Charles County, Maryland School, One unknown official of West Lake High School, Charles County, Maryland, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise. (Scott, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/8/14. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) (FILED IN ERROR) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/8/14. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/8/2014 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, One other unknown official of a Charles County, Maryland School, One unknown official of West Lake High School, Charles County, Maryland, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Statement of Filing and Service of Notification of Removal by Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, One other unknown official of a Charles County, Maryland School, One unknown official of West Lake High School, Charles County, Maryland, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, One other unknown official of a Charles County, Maryland School, One unknown official of West Lake High School, Charles County, Maryland, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, One other unknown official of a Charles County, Maryland School, One unknown official of West Lake High School, Charles County, Maryland, Joe Wesley Respress, III, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise filed by M.S., Sheila Spencer.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Chrystal Benson, Charles County, Maryland, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Andterri El Amin, One other unknown official of a Charles County, Maryland School, One unknown official of West Lake High School, Charles County, Maryland, Joe Wesley Respress, III, James E. Richmond, Roberta S. Wise filed by M.S., Sheila Spencer.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Charles County, case number 08-C-14-01891 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637076265) filed by One other unknown official of a Charles County, Maryland School, Andterri El Amin, Charles County, Maryland, Board of Education, Roberta S. Wise, James E. Richmond, Chrystal Benson, One unknown official of West Lake High School, Charles County, Maryland. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less