This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 09:12:16 (UTC).

Moussouris v. Microsoft Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/16/2015 Moussouris filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Microsoft Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge James L. Robart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-01483

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge James L. Robart

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dana Piermarini

Holly Muenchow

Katherine Moussouris

Defendant

Microsoft Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth V Stork

Attorney at OUTTEN & GOLDEN, LLP

3 Park Avenue, 29Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Ossai Miazad

Attorney at OUTTEN & GOLDEN, LLP

3 Park Avenue, 29Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Anne B. Shaver

Attorney at LIEFF CABRASER HEIMANN & BERNSTEIN

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Yaman Salahi

Attorney at LIEFF CABRASER HEIMANN & BERNSTEIN (SF)

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Katrina L Eiland

Attorney at OUTTEN & GOLDEN, LLP

One Embarcadero Center, 38Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Sharon M Lee

Attorney at LIEFF, CABRASER, HEIMANN & BERNSTEIN, LLP (WA)

2101 Fourth Avenue, Ste 1900

Seattle, WA 98121-1843

Kelly M Dermody

Attorney at LIEFF CABRASER HEIMANN & BERNSTEIN

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Adam T Klein

Attorney at OUTTEN & GOLDEN, LLP

3 Park Avenue, 29Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Michael C Subit

Attorney at FRANK FREED SUBIT & THOMAS

705 2Nd Ave, Ste 1200

Seattle, WA 98104-1729

Michael Levin-Gesundheit

Attorney at LIEFF CABRASER HEIMANN & BERNSTEIN

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

Lauri A Damrell

Attorney at ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP

400 Capitol Mall, Suite 3000

Sacramento, CA 95814-4497

Mark Steven Parris

Attorney at ORRICK HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP (SEA)

701 Fifth Avenue, Ste 5600

Seattle, WA 98104

Jessica R Perry

Attorney at ORRICK HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE (MENLO PK)

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025-1014

Wendy Butler Curtis

Attorney at ORRICK HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE (DC)

1152 15Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Lynne C Hermle

Attorney at ORRICK HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE (MENLO PK)

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025-1014

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Katherine Moussouris (Lee, Sharon) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kelly M. Dermody FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Katherine Moussouris (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4163135 (Lee, Sharon) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#4

(#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anne B. Shaver FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Katherine Moussouris (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4163156 (Lee, Sharon) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#5

(#5) ORDER re 3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kelly M Dermody for Katherine Moussouris, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#6

(#6) ORDER re 4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Anne B. Shaver for Katherine Moussouris, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#7

(#7) Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) Microsoft Corporation. (ST) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Microsoft Corporation with JURY DEMAND, filed by Katherine Moussouris. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lee, Sharon) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

#51

(#51) STIPULATION AND ORDER concerning production of electronically stored information by Judge James L. Robart. (RS) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

#52

(#52) ORDER granting in part and denying in part Microsoft's 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; court grants plaintiffs 30 days to amend their complaint and directs parties to file a proposed class discovery and certification schedule within 15 days by Judge James L. Robart.(RS) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

#53

(#53) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER on class discovery and certification schedule by parties (Shaver, Anne) (Entered: 03/23/2016)

#54

(#54) MINUTE ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. The court ORDERS that Plaintiffs file their class certification motion so as to note no later than 10/7/2016. The deadline to complete discovery on class certification shall be 8/12/2016.(AD) (Entered: 03/25/2016)

#55

(#55) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Microsoft Corporation with JURY DEMAND, filed by Dana Piermarini, Katherine Moussouris, Holly Muenchow. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shaver, Anne) (Entered: 04/06/2016)

#56

(#56) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Yaman Salahi FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Katherine Moussouris, Holly Muenchow, Dana Piermarini (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4405004 (Lee, Sharon) (Entered: 04/07/2016)

#57

(#57) ORDER re 56 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Yaman Salahi for Katherine Moussouris, Holly Muenchow, and for Dana Piermarini, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/07/2016)

#58

(#58) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth V. Stork FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Katherine Moussouris, Holly Muenchow, Dana Piermarini (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4405598 (Lee, Sharon) (Entered: 04/07/2016)

#59

(#59) ORDER re 58 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth V Stork for Katherine Moussouris, Holly Muenchow, and for Dana Piermarini, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/07/2016)

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) ORDER re 58 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth V Stork for Katherine Moussouris, Holly Muenchow, and for Dana Piermarini, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth V. Stork FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Katherine Moussouris, Holly Muenchow, Dana Piermarini (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4405598 (Lee, Sharon) (Entered: 04/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) ORDER re 56 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Yaman Salahi for Katherine Moussouris, Holly Muenchow, and for Dana Piermarini, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Yaman Salahi FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Katherine Moussouris, Holly Muenchow, Dana Piermarini (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4405004 (Lee, Sharon) (Entered: 04/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Microsoft Corporation with JURY DEMAND, filed by Dana Piermarini, Katherine Moussouris, Holly Muenchow. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shaver, Anne) (Entered: 04/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) MINUTE ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. The court ORDERS that Plaintiffs file their class certification motion so as to note no later than 10/7/2016. The deadline to complete discovery on class certification shall be 8/12/2016.(AD) (Entered: 03/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER on class discovery and certification schedule by parties (Shaver, Anne) (Entered: 03/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) ORDER granting in part and denying in part Microsoft's 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; court grants plaintiffs 30 days to amend their complaint and directs parties to file a proposed class discovery and certification schedule within 15 days by Judge James L. Robart.(RS) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) STIPULATION AND ORDER concerning production of electronically stored information by Judge James L. Robart. (RS) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Production of Electronically Stored Information by parties (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Parris, Mark) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Adam T. Klein FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Katherine Moussouris, Holly Muenchow, Dana Piermarini (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4214113 (Lee, Sharon) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark Steven Parris on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Parris, Mark) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Microsoft Corporation with JURY DEMAND, filed by Katherine Moussouris. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lee, Sharon) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) Microsoft Corporation. (ST) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER re 4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Anne B. Shaver for Katherine Moussouris, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER re 3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kelly M Dermody for Katherine Moussouris, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anne B. Shaver FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Katherine Moussouris (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4163156 (Lee, Sharon) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kelly M. Dermody FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Katherine Moussouris (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4163135 (Lee, Sharon) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Katherine Moussouris (Lee, Sharon) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against defendant(s) Microsoft Corporation with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-4161088) Attorney Sharon M Lee added to party Katherine Moussouris(pty:pla), filed by Katherine Moussouris. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Sharon) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less