This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:04:20 (UTC).

Motile Optics, LLC v. Craig Electronics, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/27/2015 Motile Optics, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Craig Electronics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge John D. Love and Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:15-CV-01072

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge John D. Love

Judge

Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Motile Optics, LLC

Defendant

Craig Electronics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rasheed M McWilliams

Attorney at Cotman IP Law Group, PLC

35 Hugus Alley, Suite 210

Pasadena, CA 91103

Daniel C Cotman

Attorney at Cotman IP Law Group, PLC

35 Hugus Alley, Suite 210

Pasadena, CA 91103

Defendant Attorneys

Adam Felix Diamond

Attorney at Lott & Fischer

355 Alhambra Circle, Suite 1100

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Ury Fischer

Attorney at Lott & Fischer

355 Alhambra Circle, Suite 1100

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Craig Electronics, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5501949.), filed by Motile Optics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cotman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/27/2015)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Cotman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/27/2015)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Craig Electronics, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rasheed M McWilliams on behalf of Motile Optics, LLC (McWilliams, Rasheed) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motile Optics, LLC (McWilliams, Rasheed) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Motile Optics, LLC. Craig Electronics, Inc. waiver sent on 12/30/2015, answer due 2/29/2016. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Felix Diamond on behalf of Craig Electronics, Inc. (Diamond, Adam) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ury Fischer on behalf of Craig Electronics, Inc. (Fischer, Ury) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

#9

(#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Craig Electronics, Inc.( Diamond, Adam) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Craig Electronics, Inc.( Diamond, Adam) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ury Fischer on behalf of Craig Electronics, Inc. (Fischer, Ury) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Felix Diamond on behalf of Craig Electronics, Inc. (Diamond, Adam) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Motile Optics, LLC. Craig Electronics, Inc. waiver sent on 12/30/2015, answer due 2/29/2016. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motile Optics, LLC (McWilliams, Rasheed) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rasheed M McWilliams on behalf of Motile Optics, LLC (McWilliams, Rasheed) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Craig Electronics, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Cotman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Craig Electronics, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5501949.), filed by Motile Optics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cotman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Craig Electronics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Motile Optics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel C Cotman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rasheed McWilliams