This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 09:06:03 (UTC).

Morguloff v. Baylor Health Care System et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2014 Morguloff filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Baylor Health Care System. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge David L Horan and Judge Jorge A Solis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-01065

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge David L Horan

Judge

Judge Jorge A Solis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barry Morguloff

Defendants

Kimberly Morgan

Christopher Duntsch

Baylor Regional Medical Center at Plano

Baylor Health Care System

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael P Lyons

Attorney at Deans & Lyons LLP

325 N Saint Paul Street, Ste 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Robert John Bogdanowicz, III

Attorney at Deans & Lyons, LLP

325 N. Saint Paul St., Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin Edward Oliver

Attorney at Law Office Brian J Judis

700 N. Pearl, Suite 425

Dallas, TX 75201

Douglas R Lewis

Attorney at Chamblee Ryan Kershaw & Anderson PC

2777 N Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1157

Dallas, TX 75207

William H Chamblee

Attorney at Chamblee Ryan Kershaw & Anderson PC

2777 N Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1157

Dallas, TX 75207

John Anthony Scully

Attorney at Cooper & Scully

900 Jackson St, Suite 100

Dallas, TX 75202

Cory Sutker

Attorney at Cooper & Scully

900 Jackson, Suite 100

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Barry Morguloff. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-5933442) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Cover Sheet, # 8 Proposed Summons, # 9 Proposed Summons, # 10 Proposed Summons, # 11 Proposed Summons) (Lyons, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Barry Morguloff. (Lyons, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Fish. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm) (Entered: 03/26/2014)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Baylor Health Care System, Baylor Regional Medical Center at Plano, Christopher Duntsch, Kimberly Morgan. (axm) (Entered: 03/26/2014)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Baylor Health Care System; served on 3/28/2014. (Lyons, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2014)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Baylor Regional Medical Center at Plano; served on 3/28/2014. (Lyons, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2014)

#7

(#7) **WITHDRAWN** see order 19 - ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David L Horan for all discovery matters. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/3/2014) (jrr) Modified on 5/19/2014 (chmb). (Entered: 04/03/2014)

#8

(#8) **VACATED** see order 19 -STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS: This order governs the filing and disposition of all discovery-related motions in this case. (See order for specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L Horan on 4/3/2014) (mcrd) (Entered: 04/04/2014)

#9

(#9) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Jorge A Solis for all further proceedings. Senior Judge A. Joe Fish no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/16/2014) (twd) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

#18

(#18) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kimberly Morgan. (Oliver, Kevin) (Entered: 05/07/2014)

#19

(#19) ELECTRONIC ORDER: Order Referring Case to Magistrate David L. Horan for all Discovery Matters is withdrawn. (Ordered by Judge Jorge A Solis on 5/19/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

#20

(#20) ELECTRONIC ORDER: Based on the Court's May 19, 2014 Electronic Order 19 , the undersigned VACATES the April 3, 2014 Standing Order on Discovery Motions 8 . (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 5/19/2014.) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

#21

(#21) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Christopher Duntsch. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Lewis, Douglas) (Entered: 05/23/2014)

#22

(#22) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support, and in the Alternative Motion to Stay filed by Christopher Duntsch (Lewis, Douglas) (Entered: 05/23/2014)

#23

(#23) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Christopher Duntsch. (Lewis, Douglas) (Entered: 05/23/2014)

#24

(#24) Notice of Correction of Signature Omission, correcting signature omission in 21 Answer to Complaint, filed by Christopher Duntsch. (Lewis, Douglas) (Entered: 05/27/2014)

#25

(#25) Notice of Correction of Signature Omission, correcting signature omission in 22 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Christopher Duntsch. (Lewis, Douglas) (Entered: 05/27/2014)

#26

(#26) RESPONSE filed by Barry Morguloff re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support, and in the Alternative Motion to Stay (Lyons, Michael) (Entered: 06/16/2014)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) RESPONSE filed by Barry Morguloff re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support, and in the Alternative Motion to Stay (Lyons, Michael) (Entered: 06/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Notice of Correction of Signature Omission, correcting signature omission in 22 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Christopher Duntsch. (Lewis, Douglas) (Entered: 05/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Notice of Correction of Signature Omission, correcting signature omission in 21 Answer to Complaint, filed by Christopher Duntsch. (Lewis, Douglas) (Entered: 05/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Christopher Duntsch. (Lewis, Douglas) (Entered: 05/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support, and in the Alternative Motion to Stay filed by Christopher Duntsch (Lewis, Douglas) (Entered: 05/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Christopher Duntsch. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Lewis, Douglas) (Entered: 05/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ELECTRONIC ORDER: Based on the Court's May 19, 2014 Electronic Order 19 , the undersigned VACATES the April 3, 2014 Standing Order on Discovery Motions 8 . (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 5/19/2014.) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ELECTRONIC ORDER: Order Referring Case to Magistrate David L. Horan for all Discovery Matters is withdrawn. (Ordered by Judge Jorge A Solis on 5/19/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kimberly Morgan. (Oliver, Kevin) (Entered: 05/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Kimberly Morgan. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Oliver, Kevin) (Entered: 05/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Baylor Health Care System. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Sutker, Cory) (Entered: 04/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Jorge A Solis for all further proceedings. Senior Judge A. Joe Fish no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/16/2014) (twd) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) **VACATED** see order 19 -STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS: This order governs the filing and disposition of all discovery-related motions in this case. (See order for specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L Horan on 4/3/2014) (mcrd) (Entered: 04/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) **WITHDRAWN** see order 19 - ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David L Horan for all discovery matters. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/3/2014) (jrr) Modified on 5/19/2014 (chmb). (Entered: 04/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Baylor Regional Medical Center at Plano; served on 3/28/2014. (Lyons, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Baylor Health Care System; served on 3/28/2014. (Lyons, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Baylor Health Care System, Baylor Regional Medical Center at Plano, Christopher Duntsch, Kimberly Morgan. (axm) (Entered: 03/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Fish. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm) (Entered: 03/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Barry Morguloff. (Lyons, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Barry Morguloff. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-5933442) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Cover Sheet, # 8 Proposed Summons, # 9 Proposed Summons, # 10 Proposed Summons, # 11 Proposed Summons) (Lyons, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT GRAPEVINE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael P Lyons

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert J. Bogdanowicz, III