This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 08:55:12 (UTC).

MLR, LLC v. Southern Telecom, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2014 MLR, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Southern Telecom, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00817

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

MLR, LLC

Counter Claimant

Southern Telecom, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Amy Sanborn Owen

John Daniel Victor Ferman

Nicholas Valdis Cumings

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Clyde Elbert Findley

Antigone Gabriella Peyton

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#23

#24

#25

#26

#27

#28

#29

#30

#31

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent No.'s 7,386,322, 6,961,584, 6,934,558, 6,134,453, 5,854,985 - DISPOSITION. (pmil, ) (Entered: 02/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) So Ordered re: 29 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by MLR, LLC. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 02/11/15. (pmil, ) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) STIPULATION of Dismissal by MLR, LLC. (Cumings, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER granting 26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Amy Sanborn Owen terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 02/04/15. (pmil, ) (Entered: 02/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Waiver of re 26 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney oral argument by MLR, LLC (Owen, Amy) (Entered: 02/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MLR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Owen, Amy) (Entered: 02/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Hundley on behalf of MLR, LLC (Hundley, James) (Entered: 02/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE by MLR, LLC of Change of Address (Cumings, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) STIPULATED ORDER Governing the Production of Electronically-Stored Information (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 12/19/14. (pmil, ) (Entered: 12/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding the handling and labeling of confidential material. (see Order for complete details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 12/19/14. (tfitz, ) (Entered: 12/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Southern Telecom, Inc., filed by MLR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cumings, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Southern Telecom, Inc.; waiver sent on 9/3/2014, answer due 11/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(pmil, ) (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting 7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Attorney John Daniel Victor Ferman terminated). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 09/02/14. (pmil, ) (Entered: 09/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MLR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferman, John) (Entered: 08/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Valdis Cumings on behalf of MLR, LLC (Cumings, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John Daniel Victor Ferman on behalf of MLR, LLC (Ferman, John) (Entered: 08/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s) 7,386,322; 6,961,584; 6,934,558; 6,134,453; and 5,854,985. (rban, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/30/2014) (rban, ). (Entered: 06/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Southern Telecom, Inc. For service by process server. (rban, ) (Entered: 06/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by MLR, LLC. (rban, ) (Entered: 06/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Southern Telecom, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683044614.), filed by MLR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt)(rban, ) (Entered: 06/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southern Telecom Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MLR, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy Sanborn Owen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Valdis Cumings