This case was last updated from PACER on 05/29/2016 at 07:32:48 (UTC).

MLR, LLC v. Hewlett-Packard Company

Case Summary

On 12/11/2014 MLR, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Hewlett-Packard Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    15-1187

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MLR, LLC

Defendant

Hewlett-Packard Company

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 12/08/2014. [203376]Entry of Appearance due 12/29/2014. Certificate of Interest is due on 12/29/2014. Docketing Statement due 12/29/2014. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 02/09/2015.

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Robert P. Greenspoon as principal counsel for Appellant MLR, LLC. Service: 12/29/2014 by email. [206416]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant MLR, LLC. Service: 12/29/2014 by email. [206419]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant MLR, LLC. Service: 12/29/2014 by email. [206421]

#5

(#5) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellant MLR, LLC. Service: 12/30/2014 by email. [206563]

#6

(#6) MOTION of Appellant MLR, LLC to extend the time to 03/11/2015 to file the appellant/petitioner's principal brief. Response/Opposition is due 02/12/2015 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 01/30/2015 by email. [214118]

#7

(#7) ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant principal brief [6] filed by Appellant MLR, LLC. Brief due 03/11/2015. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [214431]

#8

(#8) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant MLR, LLC indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 02/03/2015 by email. [214681]

#9

(#9) MOTION of Appellant MLR, LLC to terminate appeal through dismissal. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/05/2015 by email. [221808]

#11

(#11) ORDER granting motion to terminate appeal [9] filed by Appellant MLR, LLC, issuing mandate. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [221868]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting motion to terminate appeal [9] filed by Appellant MLR, LLC, issuing mandate. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [221868]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION of Appellant MLR, LLC to terminate appeal through dismissal. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/05/2015 by email. [221808]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant MLR, LLC indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 02/03/2015 by email. [214681]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant principal brief [6] filed by Appellant MLR, LLC. Brief due 03/11/2015. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [214431]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION of Appellant MLR, LLC to extend the time to 03/11/2015 to file the appellant/petitioner's principal brief. Response/Opposition is due 02/12/2015 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 01/30/2015 by email. [214118]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellant MLR, LLC. Service: 12/30/2014 by email. [206563]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant MLR, LLC. Service: 12/29/2014 by email. [206421]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant MLR, LLC. Service: 12/29/2014 by email. [206419]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Robert P. Greenspoon as principal counsel for Appellant MLR, LLC. Service: 12/29/2014 by email. [206416]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 12/08/2014. [203376]Entry of Appearance due 12/29/2014. Certificate of Interest is due on 12/29/2014. Docketing Statement due 12/29/2014. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 02/09/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.