This case was last updated from PACER on 05/24/2016 at 22:51:24 (UTC).

Mitchell v. City Of Mobile et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2015 Mitchell filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City Of Mobile. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Callie V. S. Granade and Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00360

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Callie V. S. Granade

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ann Mitchell

Defendants

City Of Mobile

Steven Chandler

Miranda Wilson

Patrick Palmer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth Andrew Hairston

1826 3Rd Avenue South

Birmingham, AL 35233

Ernest Lloyd Jarrett

Attorney at Ernest L. Jarrett P.C

65 Cadillac Square Suite 2100

Detroit, MI 48226

Defendant Attorneys

Michael David Strasavich

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP

P. O. Box 2287

Mobile, AL 36652

Atoyia Antoinette Scott

P.O. Box 2287

Mobile, AL 36652

Ricardo Andrew Woods

Attorney at Burr & Forman, LLP

11 North Water Street, Suite 22200, P. O. Box 2287

Mobile, AL 36602

Thomas O. Gaillard, III

Attorney at Satterwhite, Druhan, Gaillard & Tyler, LLC

1325 Daupin Street

Mobile, AL 36604

Latisha Rhodes Davis

Attorney at Armbrecht Jackson, LLP

63 South Royal Street, 1300 Riverview Plaza

Mobile, AL 36602

Mark A. Newell

Attorney at Armbrecht Jackson LLP

P. O. Box 290

Mobile, AL 36601

Mark L. Redditt

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale, PC

11 North Water Street, Suite 27000

Mobile, AL 36602

Herman Finhold Cox, Jr.

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale, PC

11 North Water Street, Suite 27000

Mobile, AL 36602

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Ann Mitchell (Hairston, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/22/2015)

#3

(#3) Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec) (Entered: 07/23/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Ann Mitchell (Hairston, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/23/2015)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Steven Chandler, City Of Mobile, Patrick Palmer, Miranda Wilson. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec) (Entered: 07/23/2015)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Earnest L. Jarrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1772350, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Ann Mitchell. (Hairston, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

#7

(#7) ENDORSED ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, adjudged and decreed that counselor Ernest Lloyd Jarrett, as a member in good standing of the Bar of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, who has complied with the rules of this Court, be and is hereby admitted pro hac vice to serve the interests of justice in the above entitled cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/29/2015. (Cassady, William) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss or alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment by City Of Mobile. (Strasavich, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

#33

(#33) NOTICE by Ann Mitchell Plaintiffs Response To Defendant Chandler's First Request For Admission (Jarrett, Ernest) (Entered: 10/12/2015)

#34

(#34) Notice of Filing Defendant Miranda Wilson's First Interrogatories to Plaintiff filed by Miranda Wilson. (Davis, Latisha) (Entered: 10/12/2015)

#35

(#35) Notice of Filing First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff filed by Patrick Palmer. (Redditt, Mark) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

#36

(#36) NOTICE by Steven Chandler Notice of Filing Def Chandler's Initial Disclosures (Gaillard, Thomas) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#37

(#37) Notice of Filing Initial Disclosures filed by Miranda Wilson. (Davis, Latisha) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#38

(#38) Notice of Filing Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Patrick Palmer. (Cox, Herman) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#39

(#39) Notice of Filing Initial Disclosures filed by City Of Mobile. (Strasavich, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#40

(#40) STIPULATION to Entry of Protective and ESI Consent Orders (Joint) by City Of Mobile. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order Governing Confidential Materials and Discovery of Electronically Stored Information) (Strasavich, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#41

(#41) Order re: parties' 40 Joint Stipulation to Entry of Protective & ESI Consent Orders. Telephone Conference set for 10/29/2015 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/22/2015. (tot) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Order re: parties' 40 Joint Stipulation to Entry of Protective & ESI Consent Orders. Telephone Conference set for 10/29/2015 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/22/2015. (tot) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) STIPULATION to Entry of Protective and ESI Consent Orders (Joint) by City Of Mobile. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order Governing Confidential Materials and Discovery of Electronically Stored Information) (Strasavich, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Notice of Filing Initial Disclosures filed by City Of Mobile. (Strasavich, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Notice of Filing Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Patrick Palmer. (Cox, Herman) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Notice of Filing Initial Disclosures filed by Miranda Wilson. (Davis, Latisha) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE by Steven Chandler Notice of Filing Def Chandler's Initial Disclosures (Gaillard, Thomas) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Notice of Filing First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff filed by Patrick Palmer. (Redditt, Mark) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Notice of Filing Defendant Miranda Wilson's First Interrogatories to Plaintiff filed by Miranda Wilson. (Davis, Latisha) (Entered: 10/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE by Ann Mitchell Plaintiffs Response To Defendant Chandler's First Request For Admission (Jarrett, Ernest) (Entered: 10/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Callie V. S. Granade. Amended Pleadings due by 12/11/2015. Discovery cutoff 1/9/2017. Motions due by 3/3/2017. Jury Selection set for 8/29/2017 at 08:45 AM. Trial set during the month of September 2017, the specific dates to be set at the Final Pretrial Conference. ETT: 4-6 Days. Position Regarding Settlement due by 1/9/2017. Agreed-Upon Consent Order re: ESI should be filed NLT 10/21/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/7/2015. (Attachment: # 1 Standing Order Governing Final Pretrial Conferences) (tot) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Memorandum in Support re 9 MOTION to Dismiss or alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by City Of Mobile. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Strasavich, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss or alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment by City Of Mobile. (Strasavich, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Ernest Lloyd Jarrett on behalf of Ann Mitchell (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of service) (Jarrett, Ernest) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ENDORSED ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, adjudged and decreed that counselor Ernest Lloyd Jarrett, as a member in good standing of the Bar of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, who has complied with the rules of this Court, be and is hereby admitted pro hac vice to serve the interests of justice in the above entitled cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/29/2015. (Cassady, William) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Earnest L. Jarrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1772350, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Ann Mitchell. (Hairston, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Steven Chandler, City Of Mobile, Patrick Palmer, Miranda Wilson. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec) (Entered: 07/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Ann Mitchell (Hairston, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec) (Entered: 07/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Ann Mitchell (Hairston, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ann Mitchell. (Hairston, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2015: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing fee paid (#46031035913) (eec). (Entered: 07/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less