This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2016 at 14:45:56 (UTC).

Microsystems Development Technologies, Inc. v. Panasonic Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2015 Microsystems Development Technologies, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Panasonic Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-03820

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Ronald M. Whyte

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

michael brooks

Chip-Tech Ltd.

Microsystems Development Technologies, Inc.

Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs

Top Floor Home Improvements

Nebraska Dynamics, Inc.

Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs

Linkitz Systems, Inc.

Defendants

Yageo Corporation

Sanyo North America Corporation

Panasonic Corporation of North America

TDK U.S.A. Corporation

Murata Electronics North America, Inc.

Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.

ROHM Co. Ltd.

Panasonic Electronic Devices Co Ltd

Yageo America Corporation

KOA Corporation

Panasonic Corporation

Intervenor

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

209 S. Lasalle, Suite 600

Chicago, IL 60604

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cadio R. Zirpoli

Attorney at Saveri & Saveri, Inc.

706 Sansome Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

C. Andrew Dirksen

Attorney at Cera LLP

800 Boylston Street, 16Th Floor

Boston, MA 02199

Andrew Michael Purdy

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm

555 Montgomery Street, Suite 1210

San Francisco, CA 94111

Steven Noel Williams

Attorney at Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy LLP

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Daniel C. Hedlund

Attorney at Gustafson Gluek PLLC

120 South Sixth St., Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jill Michelle Manning

Attorney at Steyer Lowenthal Boodrookas Alvarez & Smith LLP

One California Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

Eva W. Cole

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Brandon W Duke

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

1111 Louisiana Street, 25Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Robert E. Freitas

Attorney at Freitas Angell & Weinberg LLP

350 Marine Parkway, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Jason C. Murray

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

515 South Flower Street, 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Intervenor Attorney

Michael N. Loterstein

Attorney at U.S. Dept. of Justice

209 S. Lasalle, Suite 600

Chicago, IL 60604

Other Attorneys

Scott A. Stempel

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Laura M Alexander

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers and Toll PLLC

1100 New York Ave, Nw, Suite 500W

Washington, DC 20005

Katie Michelle Yablonka

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

275 Battery St., 23Rd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Daniel A. Small

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC

1100 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 500 West Tower

Washington, DC 20005-3964

Brian D Clark

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.

100 Washington Avenue South, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Heidi M Silton

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.

100 Washington Avenue South, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

John Clayton Everett, Jr.

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Ave. Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Jordan Lee Ludwig

Attorney at Crowell and Moring LLP

515 S. Flower St., 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michelle Park Chiu

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

40 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Alleged CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9774313). Filed by Microsystems Development Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Modified on 9/1/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/20/2015)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 8/20/2015) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

#3

(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/17/2015. Case Management Conference set for 11/24/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to KOA Corporation, KOA Speer Electronics, Inc., Murata Electronics North America, Inc., Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Industrial Devices Sales Company of America, ROHM Co. Ltd., Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Vishay Intertechnology, Inc., Yageo America Corporation, Yageo Corporation. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

#6

(#6) ERRATA re 1 Complaint Corrected Appendix A by Microsystems Development Technologies, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/24/2015) (Entered: 08/24/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Demetrius Xavier Lambrinos (Lambrinos, Demetrius) (Filed on 8/27/2015) (Entered: 08/27/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Joyce Chang (Chang, Joyce) (Filed on 8/27/2015) (Entered: 08/27/2015)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microsystems Development Technologies, Inc.. KOA Speer Electronics, Inc. served on 8/25/2015, answer due 9/15/2015; Murata Electronics North America, Inc. served on 8/25/2015, answer due 9/15/2015; Panasonic Corporation of North America served on 8/25/2015, answer due 9/15/2015; Panasonic Industrial Devices Sales Company of America served on 8/25/2015, answer due 9/15/2015; Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC served on 8/25/2015, answer due 9/15/2015; Vishay Intertechnology, Inc. served on 8/25/2015, answer due 9/15/2015; Yageo America Corporation served on 8/25/2015, answer due 9/15/2015. . AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on KOA Speer Electronics, Inc., Murata Electronics North America, Inc., Panasonic Industrial Devices Sales Company of America, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Vishay Intertechnology, Inc., ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, and Yaego America Corporation on August 25, 2015, filed by Microsystems Development Technologies, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/28/2015) Modified on 8/31/2015 incorrect selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/28/2015)

#102

(#102) Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/18/2015, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 10:54 a.m. - 12:00 noon = 66 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (92 in 5:15-cv-03820-RMW) Transcript Order, (94 in 5:15-cv-03820-RMW) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2016. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 1/12/2016) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

#101

(#101) Letter to Judge Whyte regarding Case Management Order Dated 12/31/2915 for a Limited Discovery Stay (Redlined and (Proposed) Order by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (Redlined))(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/8/2016) Modified on 1/11/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2016)

#100

(#100) REDLINED STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR LIMITED DISCOVERY STAY filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1(Proposed) Order Redlined Copy) (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 1/8/2016) Modified on 1/11/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2016)

#99

(#99) Statement Initial Submission Regarding DOJ's Request for a Stay of Discovery by KOA Speer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Redline to DOJ's (Proposed) Order)(Stokes, Joshua) (Filed on 1/8/2016) Modified on 1/11/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2016)

#98

(#98) NOTICE of Appearance of Travis Luke Manfredi by Michael Brooks (Manfredi, Travis) (Filed on 1/8/2016) Modified on 1/8/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2016)

#97

(#97) NOTICE of Appearance by Guido of Saveri by Michael Brooks (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 1/8/2016) Modified on 1/8/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2016)

#96

(#96) [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR A LIMITED DISCOVERY STAY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Judge Whyte from AK Rosa)(Loterstein, Michael) (Filed on 1/8/2016) Modified on 1/8/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2016)

#95

(#95) TRANSCRIPT ORDER by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz. (Rosa, Andrew) (Filed on 1/7/2016) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

#94

(#94) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for 12/18/2015 proceeding by ROHM Co. Ltd., Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Tubach, Michael) (Filed on 1/7/2016) (TRANSCRIBER: LEO MANCKIEWICZ) Modified on 1/7/2016 (sms, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2016)

98 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/18/2015, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 10:54 a.m. - 12:00 noon = 66 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (92 in 5:15-cv-03820-RMW) Transcript Order, (94 in 5:15-cv-03820-RMW) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2016. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 1/12/2016) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) Letter to Judge Whyte regarding Case Management Order Dated 12/31/2915 for a Limited Discovery Stay (Redlined and (Proposed) Order by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (Redlined))(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/8/2016) Modified on 1/11/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) REDLINED STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR LIMITED DISCOVERY STAY filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1(Proposed) Order Redlined Copy) (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 1/8/2016) Modified on 1/11/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) Statement Initial Submission Regarding DOJ's Request for a Stay of Discovery by KOA Speer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Redline to DOJ's (Proposed) Order)(Stokes, Joshua) (Filed on 1/8/2016) Modified on 1/11/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) NOTICE of Appearance of Travis Luke Manfredi by Michael Brooks (Manfredi, Travis) (Filed on 1/8/2016) Modified on 1/8/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) NOTICE of Appearance by Guido of Saveri by Michael Brooks (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 1/8/2016) Modified on 1/8/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR A LIMITED DISCOVERY STAY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Judge Whyte from AK Rosa)(Loterstein, Michael) (Filed on 1/8/2016) Modified on 1/8/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) TRANSCRIPT ORDER by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz. (Rosa, Andrew) (Filed on 1/7/2016) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#94) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for 12/18/2015 proceeding by ROHM Co. Ltd., Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Tubach, Michael) (Filed on 1/7/2016) (TRANSCRIBER: LEO MANCKIEWICZ) Modified on 1/7/2016 (sms, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#93) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for 12/18/2015 proceeding by Chip-Tech Ltd. for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/6/2016) (TRANSCRIBED BY: LEO MANCKIEWICZ) Modified on 1/6/2016 (sms, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance of Ian L Papendick by Panasonic Corporation of North America (Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 8/31/2015) Modified on 9/1/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microsystems Development Technologies, Inc.. KOA Speer Electronics, Inc. served on 8/25/2015, answer due 9/15/2015; Murata Electronics North America, Inc. served on 8/25/2015, answer due 9/15/2015; Panasonic Corporation of North America served on 8/25/2015, answer due 9/15/2015; Panasonic Industrial Devices Sales Company of America served on 8/25/2015, answer due 9/15/2015; Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC served on 8/25/2015, answer due 9/15/2015; Vishay Intertechnology, Inc. served on 8/25/2015, answer due 9/15/2015; Yageo America Corporation served on 8/25/2015, answer due 9/15/2015. . AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on KOA Speer Electronics, Inc., Murata Electronics North America, Inc., Panasonic Industrial Devices Sales Company of America, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Vishay Intertechnology, Inc., ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, and Yaego America Corporation on August 25, 2015, filed by Microsystems Development Technologies, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/28/2015) Modified on 8/31/2015 incorrect selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Joyce Chang (Chang, Joyce) (Filed on 8/27/2015) (Entered: 08/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Demetrius Xavier Lambrinos (Lambrinos, Demetrius) (Filed on 8/27/2015) (Entered: 08/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ERRATA re 1 Complaint Corrected Appendix A by Microsystems Development Technologies, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/24/2015) (Entered: 08/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to KOA Corporation, KOA Speer Electronics, Inc., Murata Electronics North America, Inc., Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Industrial Devices Sales Company of America, ROHM Co. Ltd., Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Vishay Intertechnology, Inc., Yageo America Corporation, Yageo Corporation. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/17/2015. Case Management Conference set for 11/24/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 8/20/2015) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Alleged CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9774313). Filed by Microsystems Development Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Modified on 9/1/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.