This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:51:06 (UTC).

Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC v. Kyocera Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2015 Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Kyocera Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Richard A Jones. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00346

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Richard A Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC

Defendants

Kyocera Corporation

Kyocera Communications, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William F Cronin

Attorney at CORR CRONIN MICHELSON BAUMGARDNER FOGG & MOORE LLP

1001 4Th Ave, Ste 3900

Seattle, WA 98154-1051

Defendant Attorneys

M. Andrew Woodmansee

Attorney at MORRISON & FOERSTER (SAN DIEGO)

12531 High Bluff Drive, Ste 100

San Diego, CA 92130

E. Dale Buxton

Attorney at MORRISON & FOERSTER (SAN DIEGO)

12531 High Bluff Drive, Ste 100

San Diego, CA 92130

Christian G Andreu-von Euw

Attorney at MORRISON & FOERSTER (SAN DIEGO)

12531 High Bluff Drive, Ste 100

San Diego, CA 92130

David C Doyle

Attorney at MORRISON & FOERSTER (SAN DIEGO)

12531 High Bluff Drive, Ste 100

San Diego, CA 92130

Bradley S Keller

Attorney at BYRNES KELLER CROMWELL LLP

1000 Second Avenue, 38Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98104

John Arthur Tondini

Attorney at BYRNES KELLER CROMWELL LLP

1000 Second Avenue, 38Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Microsoft Corporation for Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC (Cronin, William) (Entered: 03/06/2015)

#3

(#3) Summonses Issued as to defendants Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(MKB) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

#4

(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. E-mailed to the US Patent Office. (Attachments: # 1 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120)) (MKB) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

#5

(#5) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Kyocera Communications, Inc. on 3/12/2015 (Cronin, William) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Kyocera Corporation mailed on 3/18/2015 (Cronin, William) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Arthur Tondini on behalf of Defendants Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation. (Tondini, John) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendants' Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by parties (Tondini, John) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER Extending Defendants' Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading re 8 Stipulation by Judge Richard A Jones. Defendants Kyocera Corporation and Kyocera Communications, Inc., shall have an extension from the current deadlines, until June 16, 2015, for each party to file its answer, or other responsive pleading. (LMK) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

#13

(#13) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY E. Dale Buxton II FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3971910 (Tondini, John) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

#14

(#14) ORDER re 10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney M. Andrew Woodmansee for Kyocera Communications, Inc. and for Kyocera Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

#15

(#15) ORDER re 11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David C Doyle for Kyocera Communications, Inc. and for Kyocera Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

#16

(#16) ORDER re 12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christian G Andreu-von Euw for Kyocera Communications, Inc. and for Kyocera Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

#17

(#17) ORDER re 13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney E. Dale Buxton for Kyocera Communications, Inc. and for Kyocera Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

#18

(#18) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/19/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/26/2015, Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2015, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

#19

(#19) STANDING ORDER FOR PATENT CASES by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

#20

(#20) Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading and Other Case Schedule Deadlines by Defendants Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation. Noting Date 6/12/2015, (Tondini, John) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC (Cronin, William) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC (Cronin, William) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading and Other Case Schedule Deadlines by Defendants Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation. Noting Date 6/12/2015, (Tondini, John) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) STANDING ORDER FOR PATENT CASES by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/19/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/26/2015, Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2015, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER re 13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney E. Dale Buxton for Kyocera Communications, Inc. and for Kyocera Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER re 12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christian G Andreu-von Euw for Kyocera Communications, Inc. and for Kyocera Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER re 11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David C Doyle for Kyocera Communications, Inc. and for Kyocera Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER re 10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney M. Andrew Woodmansee for Kyocera Communications, Inc. and for Kyocera Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY E. Dale Buxton II FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3971910 (Tondini, John) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christian G. Andreu-von Euw FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3971868 (Tondini, John) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY M. Andrew Woodmansee FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3971843 (Tondini, John) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Extending Defendants' Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading re 8 Stipulation by Judge Richard A Jones. Defendants Kyocera Corporation and Kyocera Communications, Inc., shall have an extension from the current deadlines, until June 16, 2015, for each party to file its answer, or other responsive pleading. (LMK) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendants' Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by parties (Tondini, John) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Arthur Tondini on behalf of Defendants Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation. (Tondini, John) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Kyocera Corporation mailed on 3/18/2015 (Cronin, William) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Kyocera Communications, Inc. on 3/12/2015 (Cronin, William) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. E-mailed to the US Patent Office. (Attachments: # 1 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120)) (MKB) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summonses Issued as to defendants Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(MKB) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Microsoft Corporation for Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC (Cronin, William) (Entered: 03/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-3934114), filed by Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120), # 10 Summons Kyocera Corporation, # 11 Summons Kyocera Communications, Inc.)(Cronin, William) (Entered: 03/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less