This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 10:55:09 (UTC).

Michelle Rodriguez et al v. American Honda Motors Co., Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2015 Michelle Rodriguez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against American Honda Motors Co , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-09203

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michelle Rodriguez

Johnny Hernandez

Defendant

American Honda Motor Co., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian R Morrison

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow LLP

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005

Steve W Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1918 Eighth Avenue Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98101

Elaine T Byszewski

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

301 North Lake Avenue Suite 203

Pasadena, CA 91101

Martis Ann Alex

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow LLP

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005

Daniel R Leathers

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow LLP

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005

Lee M Gordon

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

301 North Lake Avenue Suite 203

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant Attorneys

Katherine Rykken

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Kathleen P Lally

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

330 North Wabash Avenue Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

Mark S Mester

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

330 North Wabash Avenue Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16850329 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Rodriguez, Johnny Hernandez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12) (Attorney Lee M Gordon added to party Johnny Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Lee M Gordon added to party Michelle Rodriguez(pty:pla))(Gordon, Lee) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Johnny Hernandez, Michelle Rodriguez. (Gordon, Lee) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs Johnny Hernandez, Michelle Rodriguez. (Gordon, Lee) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Johnny Hernandez, Michelle Rodriguez, (Gordon, Lee) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Johnny Hernandez, Michelle Rodriguez. Related Case(s): 2:15-cv-06491 (Gordon, Lee) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Daniel R Leathers for Plaintiffs Johnny Hernandez, Michelle Rodriguez. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (ghap) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

#33

(#33) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Rodriguez, Johnny Hernandez. upon American Honda Motor Co., Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/9/2015, answer due 2/8/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Kathleen P. Lally. (Gordon, Lee) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#32

(#32) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities 31 filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Rykken, Katherine) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

#31

(#31) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/27/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of K. Rykken (Exhibits Attached), # 2 Proposed Order) (Rykken, Katherine) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

#30

(#30) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc., identifying American Honda Motor Co., Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Honda Motor Co., Ltd., a Japanese corporation.. (Rykken, Katherine) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

#29

(#29) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting 25 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel R. Leathers on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Lee M. Gordon as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#28

(#28) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting 24 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian R. Morrison on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Lee M. Gordon as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#27

(#27) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting 23 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathleen P. Lally on behalf of Defendant, designating Katherine A. Rykken as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

#26

(#26) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting 22 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark S. Mester on behalf of Defendant, designating Katherine A. Rykken as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

#25

(#25) APPLICATION for attorney Daniel R. Leathers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-17162903 paid.) filed by Plaintiffs Johnny Hernandez, Michelle Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Gordon, Lee) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Rodriguez, Johnny Hernandez. upon American Honda Motor Co., Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/9/2015, answer due 2/8/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Kathleen P. Lally. (Gordon, Lee) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities 31 filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Rykken, Katherine) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/27/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of K. Rykken (Exhibits Attached), # 2 Proposed Order) (Rykken, Katherine) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc., identifying American Honda Motor Co., Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Honda Motor Co., Ltd., a Japanese corporation.. (Rykken, Katherine) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting 25 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel R. Leathers on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Lee M. Gordon as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting 24 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian R. Morrison on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Lee M. Gordon as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting 23 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathleen P. Lally on behalf of Defendant, designating Katherine A. Rykken as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting 22 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark S. Mester on behalf of Defendant, designating Katherine A. Rykken as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) APPLICATION for attorney Daniel R. Leathers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-17162903 paid.) filed by Plaintiffs Johnny Hernandez, Michelle Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Gordon, Lee) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) APPLICATION for attorney Brian R. Morrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-17162894 paid.) filed by Plaintiffs Johnny Hernandez, Michelle Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Gordon, Lee) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Brian R Morrison for Plaintiffs Johnny Hernandez, Michelle Rodriguez. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (ghap) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Daniel R Leathers for Plaintiffs Johnny Hernandez, Michelle Rodriguez. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (ghap) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Johnny Hernandez, Michelle Rodriguez. Related Case(s): 2:15-cv-06491 (Gordon, Lee) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Johnny Hernandez, Michelle Rodriguez, (Gordon, Lee) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs Johnny Hernandez, Michelle Rodriguez. (Gordon, Lee) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Johnny Hernandez, Michelle Rodriguez. (Gordon, Lee) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16850329 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Rodriguez, Johnny Hernandez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12) (Attorney Lee M Gordon added to party Johnny Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Lee M Gordon added to party Michelle Rodriguez(pty:pla))(Gordon, Lee) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.