This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:45:51 (UTC).

Mey et al v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2014 Mey filed an Other lawsuit against Honeywell International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull and District Judge Irene M. Keeley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00059

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull

Judge

District Judge Irene M. Keeley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Diana Mey

Philip Charvat

Petitioner

Power Home Technologies

Defendants

ISI Alarms NC Inc.

Secure Home Technologies, Inc.

Monitronics International, Inc.

Kevin Klink

Jayson Waller

Honeywell International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony Paronich

Attorney at Broderick Law, P.C.

125 Summer St., Suite 1030

Boston, MA 02110

Edward A. Broderick

Attorney at Broderick Law, P.C.

125 Summer St.,Suite 1030

Boston, MA 02110

Jonathan R Marshall

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser LLP

209 Capitol Street

Charleston, WV 25301

Matthew P McCue

Attorney at Law Office of Matthew P. McCue

1 South Avenue, Suite 3

Natick, MA 01760

John W. Barrett

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser, LLP - Charleston

209 Capitol St.

Charleston, WV 25301

Petitioner and Defendant Attorneys

Robert B. Newkirk, III

Attorney at Newkirk Law Office, P.A.

P.O. Box 2536, 19810 W. Catawba Avenue

Cornelius, NC 28031

Ronda L. Harvey

Attorney at Bowles, Rice, McDavid, Graff & Love - Charleston

Po Box 1386, 600 Quarrier St.

Charleston, WV 25325-1386

Lara K. Omps-Botteicher

Attorney at Bowles Rice LLP

P O Drawer 1419

Martinsburg, WV 25402

Harry F. Bell, Jr.

Attorney at The Bell Law Firm PLLC

Po Box 1723

Charleston, WV 25326

Helen M. Mac Murray

Attorney at MAC MURRAY PETERSEN & SHUSTER

Suite 210, 6530 West Campus Oval

New Albany, OH 43054

Jonathan W. Price

Attorney at The Bell Law Firm PLLC

Po Box 1723

Charleston, WV 25326

Jeffrey A. Holmstrand

Attorney at Flaherty Sensabaugh Bonasso, PLLC - Wheeling

Po Box 6545

Wheeling, WV 26003

David I. Zalman

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Megan E. McCullough

Attorney at Spilman Thomas & Battle PLLC

300 Kanawha Blvd E, P. O. Box 273

Charleston, WV 25321-0273

Lauri A. Mazzuchetti

Attorney at KELLEY DRYE & WARREN LLP

One Jefferson Road, 2Nd Floor

Parsippany, NJ 07054

Alysa Hutnik

Attorney at KELLEY DRYE & WARREN

3050 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20007

Charity K Lawrence

Attorney at Spilman Thomas & Battle PLLC

Po Box 273

Charleston, WV 25321-0273

Joel A. Hankin

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Michael A. Innes

Attorney at KELLEY DRYE & WARREN LLP

One Jefferson Road, 2Nd Floor

Parsippany, NJ 07054

Leah P Macia

Attorney at Spilman Thomas & Battle PLLC

300 Kanawha Blvd E, P. O. Box 273

Charleston, WV 25321-0273

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Honeywell International, Inc. with summons, complaint, docket sheet and notice of filing of notice of removal from Circuit Court of Kanawha County; with consents to removal. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt #0425-1857066. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet) (slr) (Modified on 8/23/2012 to insert missing pages 6, 10 and 11 filed 8/23/2012 into Exhibit A to reflect total document originally filed in circuit court) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 05/29/2012)

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED SEPTEMBER 2, 2010. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Stanley for discovery. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (cds) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 05/29/2012)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Honeywell International, Inc. (Macia, Alexander) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 05/31/2012)

#4

(#4) AGREED STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by Diana Mey, Honeywell International, Inc., ISI Alarms NC, Inc., Secure Home Technologies, Inc. ISI Alarms NC, Inc. and Secure Home Technologies, Inc. will have until June 30, 2012 to file an Answer or otherwise resond. (Bell, Harry) Modified on 6/1/2012 to conform text to filed document and to add additional filers. (jkk) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 05/31/2012)

#5

(#5) AGREED STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by Diana Mey, Honewell International, Inc., ISI Alarms NC, Inc. and Secure Home Technologies, Inc. Honeywell International, Inc. will have until June 30, 2012 to file an Answer or otherwise respond. (Macia, Alexander) Modified on 6/1/2012 to conform text to filed document and to add additional filers. (jkk) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 05/31/2012)

#6

(#6) STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Lauri A. Mazzuchetti on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc.. Local counsel: Alexander Macia. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-1862982. (Macia, Alexander) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/04/2012)

#7

(#7) EMAIL NOTIFICATION to Lauri A. Mazzachetti with Notice from Teresa L. Deppner, Clerk, Re: Electronic filing requirements. (Attachments: # 1 Clerk's Notice) (jkk) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/05/2012)

#8

(#8) STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Alysa Hutnik on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. Local counsel: Alexander Macia. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-1865852. (Macia, Alexander) Modified on 6/7/2012 to add name of visiting attorney. (jkk) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/06/2012)

#9

(#9) EMAIL NOTIFICATION to Alysa Hutnik with Notice from Teresa L. Deppner, Clerk, Re: Electronic filing requirements. (Attachments: # 1 Clerk's Notice) (jkk) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/08/2012)

#448

(#448) NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

#447

(#447) NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#446

(#446) NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

#445

(#445) RETURN RECEIPT as to 536 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK Order on Motion to Compel. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/31/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

#444

(#444) ORDER denies (516) Motion to Compel in case 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK and defendant Alliance will answer Plaintiff's Third Set of Discovery thirty days after the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 8/28/15. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

#443

(#443) Proposed Order Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery by Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

#442

(#442) NOTICE of Appearance by Megan E. McCullough on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK(McCullough, Megan) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

#441

(#441) REPLY to Response to Motion re (283 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 141 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK, 53 in 1:15-cv-00100-IMK, 140 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 192 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 437 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 305 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 474 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 215 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 226 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 236 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 204 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 164 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 516 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 248 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK, 259 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 213 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK, 161 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 88 in 1:15-cv-00059-IMK-JSK) MOTION to Compel Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Discovery filed by Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

#440

(#440) RESPONSE to Motion re (283 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 141 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK, 53 in 1:15-cv-00100-IMK, 140 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 192 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 437 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 305 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 474 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 215 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 226 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 236 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 204 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 164 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 516 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 248 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK, 259 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 213 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK, 161 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 88 in 1:15-cv-00059-IMK-JSK) MOTION to Compel Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Discovery filed by Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security, Inc., Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security, Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security LLC, Alliance Security LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Teare, John) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

435 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#448) NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#447) NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#446) NOTICE by Diana Mey Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#445) RETURN RECEIPT as to 536 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK Order on Motion to Compel. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/31/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#444) ORDER denies (516) Motion to Compel in case 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK and defendant Alliance will answer Plaintiff's Third Set of Discovery thirty days after the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 8/28/15. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(jss) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#443) Proposed Order Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery by Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#442) NOTICE of Appearance by Megan E. McCullough on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK(McCullough, Megan) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#441) REPLY to Response to Motion re (283 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 141 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK, 53 in 1:15-cv-00100-IMK, 140 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 192 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 437 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 305 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 474 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 215 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 226 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 236 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 204 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 164 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 516 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 248 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK, 259 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 213 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK, 161 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 88 in 1:15-cv-00059-IMK-JSK) MOTION to Compel Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Discovery filed by Diana Mey. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Marshall, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#440) RESPONSE to Motion re (283 in 1:13-cv-00264-IMK-JSK, 141 in 1:14-cv-00177-IMK-JSK, 53 in 1:15-cv-00100-IMK, 140 in 1:14-cv-00215-IMK-JSK, 192 in 1:14-cv-00087-IMK-JSK, 437 in 1:14-cv-00059-IMK-JSK, 305 in 1:13-cv-00263-IMK-JSK, 474 in 5:11-cv-00090-IMK-JSK, 215 in 1:14-cv-00064-IMK-JSK, 226 in 1:14-cv-00054-IMK-JSK, 236 in 1:14-cv-00066-IMK-JSK, 204 in 1:14-cv-00082-IMK-JSK, 164 in 1:14-cv-00162-IMK-JSK, 516 in 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK, 248 in 1:14-cv-00034-IMK-JSK, 259 in 1:14-cv-00169-IMK-JSK, 213 in 1:14-cv-00158-IMK-JSK, 161 in 1:14-cv-00148-IMK-JSK, 88 in 1:15-cv-00059-IMK-JSK) MOTION to Compel Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Discovery filed by Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security, Inc., Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security, Alliance Security Inc., Alliance Security LLC, Alliance Security LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Teare, John) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#439) INCORRECTLY FILED IN MEMBER CASE 1:14CV59, RELATES ONLY TO MEMBER CASE 1:14CV158. BILL OF COSTS by Vincent Brizgys, Jonathan Mraunac, Nicholas Shreders. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Bill of Costs, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02493-IMK-JSK et al.(Edelman, Daniel) Modified on 9/1/2015 to correct case numbers (kd). (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
427 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by ISI Alarms NC, Inc. (Attachment: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bell, Harry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/29/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) EMAIL NOTIFICATION to Alysa Hutnik with Notice from Teresa L. Deppner, Clerk, Re: Electronic filing requirements. (Attachments: # 1 Clerk's Notice) (jkk) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/08/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Alysa Hutnik on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. Local counsel: Alexander Macia. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-1865852. (Macia, Alexander) Modified on 6/7/2012 to add name of visiting attorney. (jkk) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/06/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EMAIL NOTIFICATION to Lauri A. Mazzachetti with Notice from Teresa L. Deppner, Clerk, Re: Electronic filing requirements. (Attachments: # 1 Clerk's Notice) (jkk) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/05/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Lauri A. Mazzuchetti on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc.. Local counsel: Alexander Macia. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-1862982. (Macia, Alexander) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/04/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AGREED STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by Diana Mey, Honewell International, Inc., ISI Alarms NC, Inc. and Secure Home Technologies, Inc. Honeywell International, Inc. will have until June 30, 2012 to file an Answer or otherwise respond. (Macia, Alexander) Modified on 6/1/2012 to conform text to filed document and to add additional filers. (jkk) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 05/31/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AGREED STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by Diana Mey, Honeywell International, Inc., ISI Alarms NC, Inc., Secure Home Technologies, Inc. ISI Alarms NC, Inc. and Secure Home Technologies, Inc. will have until June 30, 2012 to file an Answer or otherwise resond. (Bell, Harry) Modified on 6/1/2012 to conform text to filed document and to add additional filers. (jkk) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 05/31/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Honeywell International, Inc. (Macia, Alexander) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 05/31/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED SEPTEMBER 2, 2010. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Stanley for discovery. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (cds) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 05/29/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Honeywell International, Inc. with summons, complaint, docket sheet and notice of filing of notice of removal from Circuit Court of Kanawha County; with consents to removal. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt #0425-1857066. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet) (slr) (Modified on 8/23/2012 to insert missing pages 6, 10 and 11 filed 8/23/2012 into Exhibit A to reflect total document originally filed in circuit court) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/3/2014.] (Entered: 05/29/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.