This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2016 at 21:05:18 (UTC).

MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. v. FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 MERCK SHARP DOHME CORP filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-03917

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Peter G. Sheridan

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA

Attorney at SAUL EWING, LLP

One Riverfront Plaza

Newark, NJ 07102-5490

AMAR A. MEHTA

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS LLP

75 East 55Th Street

New York, NY 10022

WILLIAM C. BATON

Attorney at SAUL EWING LLP

One Riverfront Plaza

Newark, NJ 07102

SARAH ANN SULLIVAN

Attorney at SAUL EWING LLP

One Riverfront Plaza, Suite 1520

Newark, NJ 07102-5426

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR

Attorney at SAIBER LLC

One Gateway Center, 10Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102-5311

JEFFREY S. SOOS

Attorney at SAIBER LLC

One Gateway Center, 10Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102-5311

ARNOLD B. CALMANN

Attorney at SAIBER LLC

One Gateway Center, 10Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102-5311

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 5759291), filed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mak) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#2

(#2) AO120 Patent Form filed. (mak) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. identifying MERCK & CO., INC. as Corporate Parent. (mak) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Marlene Kalbach* (mak) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ARNOLD B. CALMANN on behalf of FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFERY SOOS on behalf of FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC (SOOS, JEFFERY) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR on behalf of FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC (ESCANLAR, KATHERINE) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

#8

(#8) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

#9

(#9) Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J. and the Honorable Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J. Regarding Consolidation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 07/21/2014)

#66

(#66) CONSENT JUDGMENT AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/11/2016. (eaj) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

#65

(#65) Letter from C. Lizza to the Hon. Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J.. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

#64

(#64) TEXT ORDER that a telephone case management conference will be conducted 12/16/2015 at 10:30 a.m. Plaintiff is to initiate the call to chambers. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/15/2015. (Gonzalez, P) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

#63

(#63) TEXT ORDER that the telephonic status conference previously scheduled for 10/15/2015 is hereby cancelled. Counsel are to submit a joint letter updating the Court as to the status of this matter by no later than 11/13/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/14/2015. (Gonzalez, P) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

#62

(#62) LETTER ORDER rescheduling the 9/28/2015 and 10/1/2015 Telephone Conferences; The Telephone Conference will be held 10/15/2015 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman., Plaintiff is to initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/25/2015. (eaj) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

#61

(#61) APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alison Maddeford, Esq. (Unopposed) for by FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alison Maddeford, Esq., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

#60

(#60) Letter from the Parties to the Hon. Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J.. (BATON, WILLIAM) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#59

(#59) LETTER ORDER granting defendants request that the parties submit the referenced ex parte letters within 10 days of the parties receipt of Judge Sheridan's opinion in 12-3289. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/24/2015. (kas, ) (Entered: 08/24/2015)

#58

(#58) Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney AMAR A. MEHTA terminated. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) CONSENT JUDGMENT AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/11/2016. (eaj) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) Letter from C. Lizza to the Hon. Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J.. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) TEXT ORDER that a telephone case management conference will be conducted 12/16/2015 at 10:30 a.m. Plaintiff is to initiate the call to chambers. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/15/2015. (Gonzalez, P) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) TEXT ORDER that the telephonic status conference previously scheduled for 10/15/2015 is hereby cancelled. Counsel are to submit a joint letter updating the Court as to the status of this matter by no later than 11/13/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/14/2015. (Gonzalez, P) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) LETTER ORDER rescheduling the 9/28/2015 and 10/1/2015 Telephone Conferences; The Telephone Conference will be held 10/15/2015 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman., Plaintiff is to initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/25/2015. (eaj) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alison Maddeford, Esq. (Unopposed) for by FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alison Maddeford, Esq., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) Letter from the Parties to the Hon. Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J.. (BATON, WILLIAM) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) LETTER ORDER granting defendants request that the parties submit the referenced ex parte letters within 10 days of the parties receipt of Judge Sheridan's opinion in 12-3289. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/24/2015. (kas, ) (Entered: 08/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney AMAR A. MEHTA terminated. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding claims 14-19 of the '336 patent. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 8/18/2015. (eaj) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (BATON, WILLIAM) (Entered: 07/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Peter G. Sheridan, U.S.D.J. and the Honorable Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J. Regarding Consolidation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 07/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR on behalf of FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC (ESCANLAR, KATHERINE) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFERY SOOS on behalf of FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC (SOOS, JEFFERY) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ARNOLD B. CALMANN on behalf of FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Marlene Kalbach* (mak) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. identifying MERCK & CO., INC. as Corporate Parent. (mak) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AO120 Patent Form filed. (mak) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 5759291), filed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mak) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.