This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:21:11 (UTC).

MemSmart Semiconductor Corp. v. AAC Technologies Pte. Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2015 MemSmart Semiconductor Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AAC Technologies Pte Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00531

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.

Defendants

American Audio Component, Inc.

AAC Technologies Holdings Inc.

AAC Technologies Pte. Ltd.

Not Classified By Court

David Folsom

Texarkana, TX 75503

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Winston Oliver Huff

Attorney at W O Huff & Associates, PLLC

4925 Greenville Avenue, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorneys

Dallas William Tharpe

Attorney at Yarbrough Wilcox, PLLC

100 E. Ferguson Street, Suite 1015

Tyler, TX 75702

Ming-Tao Yang

Attorney at Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner - Palo Alto

3300 Hillview Ave

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1203

E Robert Yoches

Attorney at Finnegan, LLP- Washington, DC

901 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Herbert A Yarbrough, III

Attorney at Yarbrough Wilcox, PLLC

100 E Ferguson, Suite 1015

Tyler, TX 75702

Weiguo Chen

Attorney at Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner - Palo Alto

3300 Hillview Ave

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1203

Not Classified By Court Attorney

David Folsom

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

6002-B Summerfield Drive

Texarkana, TX 75503

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

#40

(#40) ORDER granting 39 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/10/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp. (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

#35

(#35) ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/17/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.. American Audio Component, Inc. served on 5/12/2015, answer due 6/2/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

#34

(#34) NOTICE of Change of Address by Winston Oliver Huff (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

#32

(#32) AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/21/15. (mrm, ) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

#2

(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.. (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AAC Technologies Holdings Inc., AAC Technologies Pte. Ltd., American Audio Component, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5163316.), filed by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Huff, Winston) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

#39

(#39) Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated) by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#7

(#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Audio Component, Inc.( Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

#38

(#38) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp. (Compliance with P.R. 4-1) (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

#37

(#37) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by American Audio Component, Inc. (Chen, Weiguo) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

#33

(#33) Joint MOTION for Entry of the Parties' Order Regarding Electronic Discovery by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Regarding Electronic Discovery)(Huff, Winston) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to American Audio Component, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Weiguo Chen on behalf of American Audio Component, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5269184. (Chen, Weiguo) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#36

(#36) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by American Audio Component, Inc. (Chen, Weiguo) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ming-Tao Yang on behalf of American Audio Component, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5269359. (Yang, Ming-Tao) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ORDER granting 39 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/10/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated) by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp. (Compliance with P.R. 4-1) (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by American Audio Component, Inc. (Chen, Weiguo) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by American Audio Component, Inc. (Chen, Weiguo) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/17/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) NOTICE of Change of Address by Winston Oliver Huff (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Joint MOTION for Entry of the Parties' Order Regarding Electronic Discovery by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Regarding Electronic Discovery)(Huff, Winston) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/21/15. (mrm, ) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp. of Compliance Initial Disclosures (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) American Audio Component, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by American Audio Component, Inc..(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ming-Tao Yang on behalf of American Audio Component, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5269359. (Yang, Ming-Tao) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Weiguo Chen on behalf of American Audio Component, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5269184. (Chen, Weiguo) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Audio Component, Inc.( Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.. American Audio Component, Inc. served on 5/12/2015, answer due 6/2/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to American Audio Component, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp. (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.. (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against AAC Technologies Holdings Inc., AAC Technologies Pte. Ltd., American Audio Component, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5163316.), filed by MemSmart Semiconductor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Huff, Winston) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.