This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/26/2016 at 10:34:49 (UTC).

Medlock v. Taco Bell Corp., et al.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2007 Medlock filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Taco Bell Corp . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:07-CV-01314

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2007

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone

Judge

Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hilario Escobar

Christopher Duggan

Amanda Wentz

Sandrika Medlock

Loraine Naranjo

Lisa Hardiman

Teresa Nave

Debra Doyle

Miriam Leyva

Endang Widjaja

Kevin Taylor

Defendants

Taco Bell of America, Inc.

Taco Bell Corp.

Yum! Brands

Taco Bell Foundation, Inc.

Yum Brands, Inc

Taco Bell

Yum!

Northern California Taco Bell Association, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Thomas Theriault

Attorney at Capstone Law APC

1840 Century Park E Suite 450

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Joseph Hoff

Attorney at Law Offices Of Mark Yablonovich

1875 Century Park East, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Mark Yablonovich

Attorney at Law Offices of Mark Yablonovich

1875 Century Park East, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Neda Roshanian

Attorney at Law Offices Of Mark Yablonovich

1875 Century Park East, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Patrick Joseph Clifford

Attorney at Law Offices of Mark Yablonovich

1875 Century Park East, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

D. Alan Harris

Attorney at Harris & Ruble

4771 Cromwell Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90027

David Cheng

Attorney at Ford & Harrison LLP

350 S. Grand Ave., Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Monica Balderrama

Attorney at Initiative Legal Group APC

1800 Century Park East, Mezzanine

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Gregory Yu

Attorney at Initiative Legal Group LLP

1800 Century Park East, 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Katherine Carol Denbleyker

Attorney at Capstone Law APC

1840 Century Park East, Suite 450

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Miriam Leigh Schimmel

Attorney at Capstone Law APC

1840 Century Park East Suite 450

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Shawn Charles Westrick

Attorney at Initiative Legal Group LLP

1800 Century Park East, 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kenneth Yoon

Attorney at Law Offices Of Kenneth H. Yoon

One Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Linda P. Whitehead

Attorney at Law Offices Of Kenneth H. Yoon

One Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Tmothy Donahue

Attorney at Law Office Of Timothy Donahue

374 S. Glassell St.

Orange, CA 92866

Morgan Patricia Forsey

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton (San Francisco)

Four Embarcadero Center, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Joseph R. Wilbert

Attorney at Irell & Manella, LLP

840 Newport Center Drive, Suite 400

Newport Beach, CA 92660-6324

Justin E Klaeb

Attorney at Irell and Manella

840 Newport Center Drive, Suite 400

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Kara Diane McDonald

Attorney at Irell and Manella

840 Newport Center Drive, Suite 400

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Tracey Adano Kennedy

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

333 South Hope Street, 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#488

#523

#524

#525

#526

#527

#528

#529

#530

486 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#530) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jonathan Sing Lee on behalf of Lisa Hardiman, Sandrika Medlock. (Lee, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#529) Order DENYING Defendants' 523 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/25/2015. (Figueroa, O) (Entered: 02/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#528) MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: MOTION HEARING RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT OR TO STRIKE held on 2/25/2015, MOTIONS SUBMITTED. The Court to issue a written order. The Court informed counsel that it may consider any stipulation submitted by the parties. Plaintiffs Counsel Matthew Theriault, Monica Balderrama. Defendants Counsel Tracey Kennedy, Patrick Clifford, Jerusalem Beligan. Court Reporter/CD Number: K Hooven. (Hernandez, M) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#527) REPLY by Taco Bell Corp., Taco Bell of America, Inc. to RESPONSE to 523 MOTION to DISMISS. (Stiles, Nora) (Entered: 02/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#526) OPPOSITION by Lisa Hardiman, Sandrika Medlock to 523 MOTION to DISMISS. (Lee, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#525) NOTICE of Change in Counsel by Debra Doyle, Christopher Duggan, Hilario Escobar, Kevin Taylor. (Clifford, Patrick) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#524) MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) THE COURT RESETS THE MOTION HEARING as to 523 DEFENDANT'S MOTION to DISMISS from 2/18/2015 to 2/25/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/12/2015. (Hernandez, M) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#523) MOTION to DISMISS by Taco Bell Corp., Taco Bell of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Taco Bell's Motion to Dismiss or Strike Portions of Third Amended Consolidated Complaint)(Stiles, Nora) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#488) ANSWER by Taco Bell Corp., Taco Bell of America, Inc..(Stiles, Nora) (Entered: 09/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#487) ORDER DENYING Defendant's Motion to Strike; Defendants Motion to Dismiss is partially granted; Defendants Motion to Alter or Amend partially granted. Defendants counsel shall appear in person for a show cause hearing on 9/24/2014 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/29/2014. (Hernandez, M) (Entered: 08/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
474 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *YUM! BRANDS, INC.(a business entity form unknown)* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Joseph Cho* *Initiative Legal Group LL* *1800 Century Park East, Second Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Scrivner, E) (Entered: 09/10/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *YUM!* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Joseph Cho* *Initiative Legal Group LLP* *1800 Century Park East, Second Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Scrivner, E) (Entered: 09/10/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Taco Bell of America, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Joseph Cho* *Initiative Legal Group LL* *1800 Century Park East, Second Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Scrivner, E) (Entered: 09/10/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Taco Bell Foundation, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Joseph Cho* *Initiative Legal Group LLP* *1800 Century Park East, Second Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Scrivner, E) (Entered: 09/10/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Taco Bell Corp.* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Joseph Cho* *Initiative Legal Group LLP* *1800 Century Park East, Second Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Scrivner, E) (Entered: 09/10/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Taco Bell* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Joseph Cho* *Initiative Legal Group LLP* *1800 Century Park East, Second Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Scrivner, E) (Entered: 09/10/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Northern California Taco Bell Association, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Joseph Cho* *Initiative Legal Group LLP* *1800 Century Park East, Second Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Scrivner, E) (Entered: 09/10/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Sandrika Medlock, Lisa Hardiman. and Certification of Interested Parties (Cho, Joseph) (Entered: 09/07/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Sandrika Medlock, Lisa Hardiman (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Cho, Joseph) (Entered: 09/07/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against all defendants by Sandrika Medlock, Lisa Hardiman. Attorney Cho, Joseph added.(Cho, Joseph) (Entered: 09/07/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Yum's, Inc. d/b/a/ Yum's Subs is a litigant

Latest cases where Yum! Brands, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Taco Bell of America, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph R Wilbert