This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 03:18:34 (UTC).

McSwain v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2015 McSwain filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00130

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Martin Reidinger

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Minerva McSwain

Defendants

J.R. Clarkson Company

Owens-Illinois, Inc.

United Conveyor Corporation

SEPCO Corporation

Crane Co. - Chempump

Grinnell LLC

Aurora Pump

Uniroyal, Inc.

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Crosby Valve, Inc.

Crane Co.

Daniel International Corporation

General Electric Company

Ingersoll Rand Company

Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company

Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc.

Trane U.S. Inc.

Fisher Controls International, LLC.

Fluor Daniel Services Corporation

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William M. Graham

Attorney at Wallace & Graham

525 North Main Street

Salisbury, NC 28144

Daniel Ray Francis

Attorney at Wallace & Graham P.A.

525 North Main Street

Salisbury, NC 28144

Defendant Attorneys

Travis Andrew Bustamante

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

100 N. Tryon St., 42Nd Floor

Charlotte, NC 28202

Tracy Edward Tomlin

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough, LLP

100 N. Tryon St., 42Nd Floor

Charlotte, NC 28202

William M. Starr

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough, LLP

100 N. Tryon St., 42Nd Floor

Charlotte, NC 28202-4000

Robert O. Meriwether

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough, LLP

1320 Main St., Suite 17, P.O. Box 11070

Columbia, SC 29201

Timothy Peck

Attorney at Smith Moore Leatherwood LLP

Po Box 21927

Greensboro, NC 27420

Teresa E. Lazzaroni

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young LLP

303 Peachtree Street, N.E., Suite 4000

Atlanta, GA 30308-3243

Richard A. Farrier, Jr.

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

134 Meeting Street, Suite 200

Charleston, SC 29401

Ronald Alfonso Charlot

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

214 North Tryon Street, 47Th Floor

Charlotte, NC 28202

Charles Monroe Sprinkle, III

Attorney at Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd, P.A.

75 Beattie Place, Eleventh Floor

Greenville, SC 29601

Jennifer M. Techman

Attorney at Evert Weathersby Houff

3455 Peachtree Road, Ne, Suite 1550

Atlanta, GA 30326

Kelly B. Jones

Attorney at Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, PLLC

P.O. Box 831

Raleigh, NC 27602

James M. Dedman, IV

Attorney at Gallivan, White, & Boyd, P.A.

6805 Morrison Blvd, Suite 200

Charlotte, NC 28211

Other Attorneys

Jason Robert Benton

Attorney at Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein L.L.P.

Three Wachovia Center, 401 South Tryon Street, Ste. 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

Keith E. Coltrain

Attorney at Wall, Templeton & Haldrup, PA

1001 Wade Ave., Ste. 423, P. O. Box 10937

Raleigh, NC 27605

Matthew Culp

Attorney at Rasmussen Willis Dickey & Moore, LLC

9200 Ward Parkway, Suite 400

Kansas City, MO 64114

John T. Holden

Attorney at Dickie, McCamey & Chilcoat P.C.

2115 Rexford Road, Suite 210

Charlotte, NC 28211

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-2696656), filed by Minerva McSwain Individually, and as Executrix of the Estate of Buren Edward McSwain. (Graham, William) Modified text on 7/1/2015 (emw). (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (emw) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Ray Francis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Francis, Daniel) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Keith E. Coltrain on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Coltrain, Keith) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and to Cross-Claims of any and all other Defendants and Third-Party Defendants by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Coltrain, Keith) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Coltrain, Keith) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Ingersoll Rand Company.(Peck, Timothy) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll Rand Company (Peck, Timothy) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Trane U.S. Inc..(Peck, Timothy) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#84

(#84) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly B. Jones on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Jones, Kelly) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

#83

(#83) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ITT Corporation (Tomlin, Tracy) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

#82

(#82) Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Conveyor Corporation (Peck, Timothy) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

#81

(#81) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by United Conveyor Corporation.(Peck, Timothy) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

#80

(#80) NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Andrew Bustamante on behalf of ITT Corporation (Bustamante, Travis) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

#79

(#79) NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Starr on behalf of ITT Corporation (Starr, William) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

#78

(#78) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by ITT Corporation.(Tomlin, Tracy) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

#77

(#77) Summons Reissued Electronically as to Crosby Valve, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 and Local Rule 73.1(A)(2). (emw) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

#76

(#76) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Daniel Services Corporation (Sprinkle, Charles) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly B. Jones on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Jones, Kelly) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#83) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ITT Corporation (Tomlin, Tracy) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Conveyor Corporation (Peck, Timothy) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#81) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by United Conveyor Corporation.(Peck, Timothy) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#80) NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Andrew Bustamante on behalf of ITT Corporation (Bustamante, Travis) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Starr on behalf of ITT Corporation (Starr, William) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#78) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by ITT Corporation.(Tomlin, Tracy) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) Summons Reissued Electronically as to Crosby Valve, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 and Local Rule 73.1(A)(2). (emw) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Daniel Services Corporation (Sprinkle, Charles) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Fluor Daniel Services Corporation.(Sprinkle, Charles) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trane U.S. Inc. (Peck, Timothy) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Trane U.S. Inc..(Peck, Timothy) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll Rand Company (Peck, Timothy) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Ingersoll Rand Company.(Peck, Timothy) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Coltrain, Keith) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and to Cross-Claims of any and all other Defendants and Third-Party Defendants by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Coltrain, Keith) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Keith E. Coltrain on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Coltrain, Keith) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Ray Francis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Francis, Daniel) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (emw) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-2696656), filed by Minerva McSwain Individually, and as Executrix of the Estate of Buren Edward McSwain. (Graham, William) Modified text on 7/1/2015 (emw). (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.