This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2016 at 15:59:06 (UTC).

McKinney et al v. City of Hayward et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2015 McKinney filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Hayward. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore (Settlement) and Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-03121

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore (Settlement)

Judge

Hon. Thelton E. Henderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Richard McKinney

Diane McKinney

Jacqueline Taylor

James McKinney

Michael McKinney

Deborah McKinney

Defendants

City of Hayward

Kenneth Landreth

Ricardo Flores

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adante Pointer

Attorney at The Law Offices of John L. Burris

7677 Oakport Street, Suite 1120

Oakland, CA 94621

John L. Burris

Attorney at The Law Offices of John L. Burris

7677 Oakport Street, Suite 1120

Oakland, CA 94621

Lateef Hasani Gray

Attorney at The Law Offices of John L. Burris

7677 Oakport Street, Suite 1120

Oakland, CA 94621

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey Michael Vucinich

Attorney at Clapp Moroney Bellagamba Vucinich Beeman & Scheley

1111 Bayhill Drive, Suite 300

San Bruno, CA 94066

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Wrongful Death and Violation of Civil Rights and Damages; Jury Trial Demanded against City of Hayward, Ricardo Flores & Kenneth Landreth, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-9656112). Filed by Richard McKinney, Deborah McKinney, Diane McKinney, Jacqueline Taylor & Michael McKinney. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet) (Pointer, Adante) (Filed on 7/6/2015).. Modified on 7/7/2015 (tnS). (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Pointer, Adante) (Filed on 7/6/2015) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#3

(#3) Case assigned to Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Burris (Burris, John) (Filed on 7/7/2015) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #(1) TEH Revised Civil Standing Order, #(2) Standing Order for All Judges) (tnS) (Filed on 7/7/2015) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Defendants City of Hayward, Ricardo Flores & Kenneth Landreth. (tnS) (Filed on 7/7/2015) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

#7

(#7) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Wrongful Death and Violation of Civil Rights and Damages; Jury Trial Demanded against City of Hayward, Ricardo Flores, Kenneth Landreth. Filed by Richard McKinney, Deborah McKinney, Diane McKinney, Jacqueline Taylor, Michael McKinney. (Pointer, Adante) (Filed on 8/14/2015) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

#8

(#8) Proposed Summons. (Pointer, Adante) (Filed on 8/14/2015) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard McKinney, James McKinney, Deborah McKinney, Diane McKinney, Jacqueline Taylor, Michael McKinney. City of Hayward served on 7/16/2015, answer due 8/6/2015; Ricardo Flores served on 7/16/2015, answer due 8/6/2015; Kenneth Landreth served on 7/16/2015, answer due 8/6/2015. ORIGINAL COMPLAINT (Burris, John) (Filed on 8/20/2015) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

#24

(#24) CLERK'S NOTICE- Settlement conference will be held in Courtroom 2 on the 4th floor.(This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016) (Entered: 03/24/2016)

#23

(#23) AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: The Court has excused the officers from personally attending the settlement conference.Settlement Conference held on 1/28/2016.Total Time in Court 30. Court Reporter Name Not reported. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/28/2016) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

#22

(#22) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Settlement Conference held on 1/28/2016. Settlement Conference set for 3/25/2016 10:00 AM.Total Time in Court 30. Court Reporter Name Not reported. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/28/2016) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

#21

(#21) CLERK'S NOTICE - Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2016 at 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

#20

(#20) ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION AND REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Settlement. Discovery due by 6/20/2016. Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 10/4/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson for an estimated 5-7 days. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/05/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

#19

(#19) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/5/2015. Parties shall meet and confer regarding their choice of Magistrate Judge for settlement and report back to this Court's courtroom deputy no later than Friday, 10/09/2015. Case will be referred to a magistrate judge for a settlement conference to be heard within 150 days. Trial date and schedule set. Court will issue an order with all dates and deadlines. Jury Trial set for 10/04/2016, at 9:00 AM. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney Adante Pointer. Defendant Attorney Jeffrey Vucinich. This is a text only Minute Entry (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/5/2015) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Lateef Hasani Gray (Gray, Lateef) (Filed on 9/28/2015) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

#17

(#17) JOINT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Deborah McKinney, Diane McKinney, James McKinney, Michael McKinney, Richard McKinney, Jacqueline Taylor. (Pointer, Adante) (Filed on 9/28/2015) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

#16

(#16) ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on for October 1, 2015 at 11:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) CLERK'S NOTICE- Settlement conference will be held in Courtroom 2 on the 4th floor.(This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016) (Entered: 03/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: The Court has excused the officers from personally attending the settlement conference.Settlement Conference held on 1/28/2016.Total Time in Court 30. Court Reporter Name Not reported. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/28/2016) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Settlement Conference held on 1/28/2016. Settlement Conference set for 3/25/2016 10:00 AM.Total Time in Court 30. Court Reporter Name Not reported. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/28/2016) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CLERK'S NOTICE - Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2016 at 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION AND REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Settlement. Discovery due by 6/20/2016. Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 10/4/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson for an estimated 5-7 days. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/05/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/5/2015. Parties shall meet and confer regarding their choice of Magistrate Judge for settlement and report back to this Court's courtroom deputy no later than Friday, 10/09/2015. Case will be referred to a magistrate judge for a settlement conference to be heard within 150 days. Trial date and schedule set. Court will issue an order with all dates and deadlines. Jury Trial set for 10/04/2016, at 9:00 AM. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney Adante Pointer. Defendant Attorney Jeffrey Vucinich. This is a text only Minute Entry (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/5/2015) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Lateef Hasani Gray (Gray, Lateef) (Filed on 9/28/2015) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) JOINT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Deborah McKinney, Diane McKinney, James McKinney, Michael McKinney, Richard McKinney, Jacqueline Taylor. (Pointer, Adante) (Filed on 9/28/2015) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on for October 1, 2015 at 11:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Pointer, Adante) (Filed on 9/18/2015) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons on First Amended Complaint Issued as to Defendants City of Hayward, Ricardo Flores & Kenneth Landreth. (tnS) (Filed on 8/24/2015) (Entered: 08/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard McKinney, James McKinney, Deborah McKinney, Diane McKinney, Jacqueline Taylor, Michael McKinney. City of Hayward served on 7/16/2015, answer due 8/6/2015; Ricardo Flores served on 7/16/2015, answer due 8/6/2015; Kenneth Landreth served on 7/16/2015, answer due 8/6/2015. ORIGINAL COMPLAINT (Burris, John) (Filed on 8/20/2015) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Proposed Summons. (Pointer, Adante) (Filed on 8/14/2015) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Wrongful Death and Violation of Civil Rights and Damages; Jury Trial Demanded against City of Hayward, Ricardo Flores, Kenneth Landreth. Filed by Richard McKinney, Deborah McKinney, Diane McKinney, Jacqueline Taylor, Michael McKinney. (Pointer, Adante) (Filed on 8/14/2015) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Defendants City of Hayward, Ricardo Flores & Kenneth Landreth. (tnS) (Filed on 7/7/2015) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #(1) TEH Revised Civil Standing Order, #(2) Standing Order for All Judges) (tnS) (Filed on 7/7/2015) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Burris (Burris, John) (Filed on 7/7/2015) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case assigned to Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Pointer, Adante) (Filed on 7/6/2015) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Wrongful Death and Violation of Civil Rights and Damages; Jury Trial Demanded against City of Hayward, Ricardo Flores & Kenneth Landreth, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-9656112). Filed by Richard McKinney, Deborah McKinney, Diane McKinney, Jacqueline Taylor & Michael McKinney. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet) (Pointer, Adante) (Filed on 7/6/2015).. Modified on 7/7/2015 (tnS). (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less