This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 13:12:53 (UTC).

McKeown v. Farrell & Seldin

Case Summary

On 06/26/2014 McKeown filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Farrell Seldin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are District Judge James O. Browning and Magistrate Judge William P Lynch. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00597

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge James O. Browning

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge William P Lynch

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peggy McKeown

Defendants

Thomas F. Farrell

Fenton and McGarvy Law Firm P.S.C.

Barry A. Seldin

Farrell & Seldin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Pooja Dosi

Attorney at Agruss Law Firm, LLC

4619 N. Ravenswood Ave, Suite 303A

Chicago, IL 60640

Mark Daniel Trujillo

Attorney at Branch Law Firm

2025 Rio Grande Blvd. Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87104

Defendant Attorneys

Kristina Caffrey

Attorney at Cadigan Law, PC

3840 Masthead St. Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Michael J Cadigan

Attorney at Cadigan & Park, PC

3840 Masthead Street Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87109

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against FARRELL & SELDIN ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by PEGGY MCKEOWN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Trujillo, Mark) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#2

(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (iad) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#3

(#3) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 1084-3640952 (iad)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 06/30/2014)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Order for Leave of Court to Serve Defendant by Alternative Means of Service by Peggy McKeown. (Trujillo, Mark) (Entered: 10/16/2014)

#5

(#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch granting 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave of Court to Serve Defendant By Alternative Means of Service. (ran) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

#6

(#6) ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch: Status Conference set for 1/22/2015 at 09:30 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch. (ran) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

#7

(#7) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Peggy McKeown by Mark Daniel Trujillo on behalf of: Pooja Dosi Agruss Law Firm, LLC 4619 N. Ravenswood AvenueChicago, Il 60640 312-224-4695 Fax 3122534451 pooja@agrusslawfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Trujillo, Mark)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Peggy McKeown Notice of Good Standing for Pooja Dosi (Trujillo, Mark) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#9

(#9) Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch: Status Conference held on 1/22/2015. (ran) (Entered: 01/22/2015)

#26

(#26) FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge James O. Browning (dmw) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

#25

(#25) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Thomas F. Farrell (Cadigan, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

#24

(#24) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: 21. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (hbs) (Entered: 03/30/2015)

#23

(#23) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

#22

(#22) AFFIDAVIT re 18 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Barry Seldin, Individually, and Thomas Farrell, Individually Notarized Affidavit of Thomas Farrell by Thomas F. Farrell (Cadigan, Michael) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

#20

(#20) NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed within 10 days. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

#19

(#19) NOTICE by Peggy McKeown of second extension of time for defendant (Dosi, Pooja) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

#18

(#18) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Barry Seldin, Individually, and Thomas Farrell, Individually by Thomas F. Farrell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Cadigan, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

#17

(#17) ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Fenton and McGarvy Law Firm P.S.C. answer due 3/25/2015. (ran) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge James O. Browning (dmw) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Thomas F. Farrell (Cadigan, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: 21. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (hbs) (Entered: 03/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) AFFIDAVIT re 18 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Barry Seldin, Individually, and Thomas Farrell, Individually Notarized Affidavit of Thomas Farrell by Thomas F. Farrell (Cadigan, Michael) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed within 10 days. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE by Peggy McKeown of second extension of time for defendant (Dosi, Pooja) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Barry Seldin, Individually, and Thomas Farrell, Individually by Thomas F. Farrell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Cadigan, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Fenton and McGarvy Law Firm P.S.C. answer due 3/25/2015. (ran) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Peggy McKeown. (Dosi, Pooja) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Farrell & Seldin, Thomas F. Farrell, Barry A. Seldin, Fenton and McGarvy Law Firm P.S.C.. adding Barry A. Seldin, Thomas F. Farrell and Fenton and McGarvy Law Firm P.S.C., Thomas F. Farrell, Barry A. Seldin and Fenton and McGarvy Law Firm P.S.C.., filed by Peggy McKeown.(Dosi, Pooja) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch: Status Conference held on 1/22/2015. (ran) (Entered: 01/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Peggy McKeown Notice of Good Standing for Pooja Dosi (Trujillo, Mark) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Peggy McKeown by Mark Daniel Trujillo on behalf of: Pooja Dosi Agruss Law Firm, LLC 4619 N. Ravenswood AvenueChicago, Il 60640 312-224-4695 Fax 3122534451 pooja@agrusslawfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Trujillo, Mark)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch: Status Conference set for 1/22/2015 at 09:30 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch. (ran) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch granting 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave of Court to Serve Defendant By Alternative Means of Service. (ran) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Order for Leave of Court to Serve Defendant by Alternative Means of Service by Peggy McKeown. (Trujillo, Mark) (Entered: 10/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 1084-3640952 (iad)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 06/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (iad) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against FARRELL & SELDIN ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by PEGGY MCKEOWN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Trujillo, Mark) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.