This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 10:50:20 (UTC).

MCI Communications Services, Inc. et al v. Mpower Communications Corp et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2014 MCI Communications Services, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Mpower Communications Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-06965

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Ronald S.W. Lew

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCI Communications Services, Inc.

Verizon Select Services Inc

Defendants

Wholesale Airtime, Inc.

Time Warner Cable Information Services (California), LLC

Telscape Communications, Inc.

Pacific Bell Telephone Company

U.S. TelePacific Corp.

Surewest Televideo

Surewest Telephone

Mpower Communications Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christa L Culver

Attorney at Munger Tolles and Olson LLP

355 South Grand Avenue 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Margaret G Maraschino

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP

355 South Grand Avenue 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Tamerlin J Godley

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP

355 South Grand Avenue 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Henry Weissmann

Attorney at Munger Tolles and Olson LLP

355 S Grand Avenue 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Defendant Attorneys

W Scott McCollough

Attorney at McCollough Henry PC

1250 South Capital Of Texas Highway Building 2-235

Westlake Hills, TX 78746

Craig J Mariam

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

633 West Fifth Street Suite 5200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-14409542 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Verizon Select Services Inc, MCI Communications Services, Inc.. (Attorney Tamerlin J Godley added to party MCI Communications Services, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Tamerlin J Godley added to party Verizon Select Services Inc(pty:pla))(Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Select Services Inc. (Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying MCI Broadband Solutions, Inc.; Terremark Worldwide, Inc.; Verizon Business Network Services Inc.; MCI Communications Corporation; Verizon Business Global LLC; Verizon Communications Inc.; CQRCert, LLC; Terrelight, LLC; Verizon Business Purchasing LLC; Verizon Communications Inc.; GTE Corporation; NYNEX LLC; Verizon Ventures LLC; Verizon Select Services of Virginia Inc.. (Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Select Services Inc. (Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Select Services Inc. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-1, # 3 Exhibit B-2)(Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Margaret G Ziegler counsel for Plaintiffs MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Select Services Inc. Filed by Plaintiffs MCI Communications Services, Inc. and Verizon Select Services Inc.. (Attorney Margaret G Ziegler added to party MCI Communications Services, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Margaret G Ziegler added to party Verizon Select Services Inc(pty:pla))(Ziegler, Margaret) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. (car) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendants Mpower Communications Corp, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Surewest Telephone, Surewest Televideo, Telscape Communications, Inc., Time Warner Cable Information Services (California), LLC, U.S. TelePacific Corp., Wholesale Airtime, Inc. (car) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#17

(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Verizon Select Services Inc, MCI Communications Services, Inc.. upon Pacific Bell Telephone Company waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/2/2014, answer due 1/31/2015. Waiver of Service signed by Daniel Kazlauski. (Maraschino, Margaret) (Entered: 12/19/2014)

#18

(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Verizon Select Services Inc, MCI Communications Services, Inc.. Waiver of Service signed by John S. Cooper, Latham & Watkins, LLP, Counsel for Time Warner Cable Information Systems (California), LLC.. (Maraschino, Margaret) (Entered: 12/19/2014)

#19

(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Verizon Select Services Inc, MCI Communications Services, Inc.. upon Surewest Telephone waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/2/2014, answer due 1/31/2015. Waiver of Service signed by Russell M. Blau. (Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 12/29/2014)

#20

(#20) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Verizon Select Services Inc, MCI Communications Services, Inc., upon Defendant Wholesale Airtime, Inc. served on 12/18/2014, answer due 1/8/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kelli R.l Sword, Office Manager/Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Ruud & Romo in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 12/30/2014)

#21

(#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Verizon Select Services Inc, MCI Communications Services, Inc., upon Defendant Telscape Communications, Inc. served on 12/31/2014, answer due 1/21/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Craig Mariam (counsel for Telscape Communications, Inc.) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 01/02/2015)

#22

(#22) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2587, transferring case to USDC Northern District of Texas assigned to Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. Entire case electronically transferred to USDC Northern District of Texas at Dallas. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

#23

(#23) Transfer Out Transmittal Letter. Entire case and file Electronically transferred to USDC Northern district of Texas at Dallas, Texas on 1/15/15. (lc) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

#24

(#24) Transfer Out Transmittal Letter. Entire case and file Electronically transferred to USDC Northern District of Texas at Dallas, Texas on 1/15/15 (lc) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

#25

(#25) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: MDL - Transfer Out Letter (CV 117) 24 : ONLY this MDL transfer letter, docket entry no. 24 was inadvertently docketed on this case in Error, and should have been docketed on CV 14-9092 ODW (SSx) Century Link Comm. vs Verizon was docketed on this case in Error. (lc) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: MDL - Transfer Out Letter (CV 117) 24 : ONLY this MDL transfer letter, docket entry no. 24 was inadvertently docketed on this case in Error, and should have been docketed on CV 14-9092 ODW (SSx) Century Link Comm. vs Verizon was docketed on this case in Error. (lc) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Transfer Out Transmittal Letter. Entire case and file Electronically transferred to USDC Northern District of Texas at Dallas, Texas on 1/15/15 (lc) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Transfer Out Transmittal Letter. Entire case and file Electronically transferred to USDC Northern district of Texas at Dallas, Texas on 1/15/15. (lc) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2587, transferring case to USDC Northern District of Texas assigned to Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. Entire case electronically transferred to USDC Northern District of Texas at Dallas. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Verizon Select Services Inc, MCI Communications Services, Inc., upon Defendant Telscape Communications, Inc. served on 12/31/2014, answer due 1/21/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Craig Mariam (counsel for Telscape Communications, Inc.) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 01/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Verizon Select Services Inc, MCI Communications Services, Inc., upon Defendant Wholesale Airtime, Inc. served on 12/18/2014, answer due 1/8/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kelli R.l Sword, Office Manager/Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Ruud & Romo in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 12/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Verizon Select Services Inc, MCI Communications Services, Inc.. upon Surewest Telephone waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/2/2014, answer due 1/31/2015. Waiver of Service signed by Russell M. Blau. (Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 12/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Verizon Select Services Inc, MCI Communications Services, Inc.. Waiver of Service signed by John S. Cooper, Latham & Watkins, LLP, Counsel for Time Warner Cable Information Systems (California), LLC.. (Maraschino, Margaret) (Entered: 12/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Verizon Select Services Inc, MCI Communications Services, Inc.. upon Pacific Bell Telephone Company waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/2/2014, answer due 1/31/2015. Waiver of Service signed by Daniel Kazlauski. (Maraschino, Margaret) (Entered: 12/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Verizon Select Services Inc, MCI Communications Services, Inc.. upon U.S. TelePacific Corp. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/2/2014, answer due 1/31/2015. Waiver of Service signed by Russell M. Blau. (Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 12/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION for attorney W. Scott McCollough to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Telscape Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proof of Service)(Attorney Craig J Mariam added to party Telscape Communications, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mariam, Craig) (Entered: 11/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendants Mpower Communications Corp, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Surewest Telephone, Surewest Televideo, Telscape Communications, Inc., Time Warner Cable Information Services (California), LLC, U.S. TelePacific Corp., Wholesale Airtime, Inc. (car) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. (car) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Margaret G Ziegler counsel for Plaintiffs MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Select Services Inc. Filed by Plaintiffs MCI Communications Services, Inc. and Verizon Select Services Inc.. (Attorney Margaret G Ziegler added to party MCI Communications Services, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Margaret G Ziegler added to party Verizon Select Services Inc(pty:pla))(Ziegler, Margaret) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Select Services Inc. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-1, # 3 Exhibit B-2)(Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Select Services Inc. (Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying MCI Broadband Solutions, Inc.; Terremark Worldwide, Inc.; Verizon Business Network Services Inc.; MCI Communications Corporation; Verizon Business Global LLC; Verizon Communications Inc.; CQRCert, LLC; Terrelight, LLC; Verizon Business Purchasing LLC; Verizon Communications Inc.; GTE Corporation; NYNEX LLC; Verizon Ventures LLC; Verizon Select Services of Virginia Inc.. (Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Select Services Inc. (Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-14409542 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Verizon Select Services Inc, MCI Communications Services, Inc.. (Attorney Tamerlin J Godley added to party MCI Communications Services, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Tamerlin J Godley added to party Verizon Select Services Inc(pty:pla))(Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less