This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:41:44 (UTC).

Mci Communications Services, Inc. Et Al V. 360networks (usa) Inc. Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/31/2014 a Other case was filed by Mci Communications Services Inc against 360networks Usa Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-04571

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Judge Sidney A Fitzwater

 

Party Details

Defendants

Granite Telecommunications, Llc

Dickey Rural Telephone Cooperative

United Telephone Mutual Aid Corporation

Midstate Communications Inc

Polar Communications Mutual Aid Corporation

North Dakota Telephone Company

Integra Telecom Of North Dakota, Inc.

Dakota Central Telecom I, Inc.

360networks (usa) Inc.

Missouri Valley Communications, Inc.

26 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 314000473) filed by Verizon Select Services Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(as) Modified on 10/8/2014 to add two defendants omitted at case opening. (kmk). [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to MCI Communications Services, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/22/2014. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Verizon Select Services Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/22/2014. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Select Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MCI Broadband Solutions, Inc., Corporate Parent Terremark Worldwide, Inc., Corporate Parent Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Corporate Parent MCI Communications Corporation, Corporate Parent Verizon Business Global LLC, Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for MCI Communications Services, Inc.; Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc., Corporate Parent GTE Corporation, Corporate Parent NYNEX LLC, Corporate Parent Verizon Ventures LLC for Verizon Select Services Inc. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 09/08/2014)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Select Services Inc. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 09/19/2014)

#7

(#7) (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson. Case assigned to Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein for all further proceedings. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 09/19/2014)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to United Telephone Mutual Aid Corporation, West River Telecommunications Cooperative. (Second summons issued as to defendants inadvertently omitted in case opening) (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 10/08/2014)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Verizon Select Services Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc.(as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 11/18/2014)

#58

(#58) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadvox-CLEC, LLC. (Thomas, Steven) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

#57

(#57) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McLeodUSA Telecommunications Services, L.L.C.. (Johnson, Eric) (Entered: 04/24/2015)

#56

(#56) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc. re 54 Summons Issued, 52 Amended Complaint,, Service of Summons on Defendant Midstate Communications Inc. (Maraschino, Margaret) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

#55

(#55) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Coates Watkins for James F. Bendernagel and Michael J. Hunseder on behalf of AT&T Corp. (Watkins, Emily) (Entered: 04/06/2015)

#54

(#54) Summons Issued as to Midstate Communications Inc. (ctf) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

#53

(#53) ***DISREGARD, INCORRECT SUMMONS ISSUED***Summons Issued as to Zayo Group LLC. (ndt) Modified on 3/31/2015 (ctf). (Entered: 03/30/2015)

#52

(#52) AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Verizon Select Services Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

#51

(#51) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 360Networks (USA) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Zayo Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Zayo Group, LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Onvoy, LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Communications Infrastructure Investments, LLC for 360Networks (USA) Inc.. (Blau, Russell) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#50

(#50) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell M Blau on behalf of 360Networks (USA) Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Blau, Russell) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadvox-CLEC, LLC. (Thomas, Steven) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McLeodUSA Telecommunications Services, L.L.C.. (Johnson, Eric) (Entered: 04/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc. re 54 Summons Issued, 52 Amended Complaint,, Service of Summons on Defendant Midstate Communications Inc. (Maraschino, Margaret) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Coates Watkins for James F. Bendernagel and Michael J. Hunseder on behalf of AT&T Corp. (Watkins, Emily) (Entered: 04/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) Summons Issued as to Midstate Communications Inc. (ctf) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) ***DISREGARD, INCORRECT SUMMONS ISSUED***Summons Issued as to Zayo Group LLC. (ndt) Modified on 3/31/2015 (ctf). (Entered: 03/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Verizon Select Services Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Godley, Tamerlin) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 360Networks (USA) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Zayo Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Zayo Group, LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Onvoy, LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Communications Infrastructure Investments, LLC for 360Networks (USA) Inc.. (Blau, Russell) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell M Blau on behalf of 360Networks (USA) Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Blau, Russell) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Blau, Russell) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to McLeodUSA Telecommunications Services, L.L.C. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 11/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Verizon Select Services Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc.(as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 11/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to United Telephone Mutual Aid Corporation, West River Telecommunications Cooperative. (Second summons issued as to defendants inadvertently omitted in case opening) (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 10/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson. Case assigned to Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein for all further proceedings. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 09/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Select Services Inc. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 09/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Select Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MCI Broadband Solutions, Inc., Corporate Parent Terremark Worldwide, Inc., Corporate Parent Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Corporate Parent MCI Communications Corporation, Corporate Parent Verizon Business Global LLC, Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for MCI Communications Services, Inc.; Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc., Corporate Parent GTE Corporation, Corporate Parent NYNEX LLC, Corporate Parent Verizon Ventures LLC for Verizon Select Services Inc. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Verizon Select Services Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/22/2014. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to MCI Communications Services, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/22/2014. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 314000473) filed by Verizon Select Services Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(as) Modified on 10/8/2014 to add two defendants omitted at case opening. (kmk). [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.] (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.