This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2016 at 14:33:05 (UTC).

MAWAKANA v. BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Summary

On 12/05/2014 MAWAKANA filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Amy Berman Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-02069

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Amy Berman Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEMIT MAWAKANA

Defendant

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cassandra Webster Lenning

Attorney at HELLER, HURON, CHERTKOF & SALZMAN, PLLC

1730 M Street, Nw, Suite 412

Washington, DC 20036

Richard A. Salzman

Attorney at HELLER, HURON, CHERTKOF & SALZMAN, PLLC

1730 M Street, Nw, Suite 412

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Sara Elizabeth Robinson

Attorney at WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER, LLP

8444 Westpark Drive, Suite 510

Mclean, VA 22102

Janice Pardue Gregerson

Attorney at WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER, LLP

8444 Westpark Drive, Suite 510

Mclean, VA 22102

Smruti V. Radkar

Attorney at UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

4200 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20008

Yoora Pak

Attorney at WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER, LLP

8444 Westpark Drive, Suite 510

Mclean, VA 22102

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Salzman on behalf of KEMIT MAWAKANA (Salzman, Richard) (Entered: 12/10/2014)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Radkar, Smruti) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

#4

(#4) Receipt on 12/15/2014 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 14ca6242. (znmw, ) (Entered: 12/16/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Yoora Pak on behalf of BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Pak, Yoora) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

#6

(#6) ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Yoora Pak on behalf of BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Pak, Yoora) Modified on 2/13/2015 (jf, ). (Entered: 02/10/2015)

#7

(#7) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Plaintiff Kemit Mawakana by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Pak, Yoora) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Elizabeth Robinson on behalf of All Defendants (Robinson, Sara) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/10/2015. (lcabj2) (Entered: 07/10/2015)

#17

(#17) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pak, Yoora) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

#18

(#18) Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Pak, Yoora) (Entered: 07/22/2015)

#19

(#19) Joint MOTION for Protective Order , Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Materials and Acknowledgment by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pak, Yoora) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

#20

(#20) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS (See the Order for Complete Details). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/28/2015. (jth) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra Webster Lenning on behalf of KEMIT MAWAKANA (Lenning, Cassandra) (Entered: 09/14/2015)

#22

(#22) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to extend current deadlines by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pak, Yoora) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

#23

(#23) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Janice P. Gregerson, :Firm- WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP, :Address- 8444 Westpark Drive, Suite 510, McLean, Virginia 22102. Phone No. - 703.245.9300. Fax No. - 703.245.9301 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4396414. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Application for Admission PHV of Gregerson, # 2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Pak, Yoora) Modified on 2/2/2016 (jf). (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#24

(#24) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pak, Yoora) (Entered: 03/14/2016)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pak, Yoora) (Entered: 03/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Janice P. Gregerson, :Firm- WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP, :Address- 8444 Westpark Drive, Suite 510, McLean, Virginia 22102. Phone No. - 703.245.9300. Fax No. - 703.245.9301 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4396414. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Application for Admission PHV of Gregerson, # 2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Pak, Yoora) Modified on 2/2/2016 (jf). (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to extend current deadlines by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pak, Yoora) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra Webster Lenning on behalf of KEMIT MAWAKANA (Lenning, Cassandra) (Entered: 09/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS (See the Order for Complete Details). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/28/2015. (jth) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Joint MOTION for Protective Order , Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Materials and Acknowledgment by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pak, Yoora) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Pak, Yoora) (Entered: 07/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pak, Yoora) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/10/2015. (lcabj2) (Entered: 07/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/10/2015. (lcabj2) (Entered: 07/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by KEMIT MAWAKANA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2)(Salzman, Richard) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Elizabeth Robinson on behalf of All Defendants (Robinson, Sara) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A-B to Memo in Support of its Partial MTD, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Def's Partial MTD)(Pak, Yoora) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Plaintiff Kemit Mawakana by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Pak, Yoora) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Yoora Pak on behalf of BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Pak, Yoora) Modified on 2/13/2015 (jf, ). (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Yoora Pak on behalf of BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Pak, Yoora) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Receipt on 12/15/2014 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 14ca6242. (znmw, ) (Entered: 12/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Radkar, Smruti) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Salzman on behalf of KEMIT MAWAKANA (Salzman, Richard) (Entered: 12/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 14ca06242. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616067329) filed by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: # 1 Superior Court Documents, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet; # 3 Notice to Counsel/Party) (jf, ). (Entered: 12/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less