This case was last updated from PACER on 05/29/2016 at 00:53:18 (UTC).

Martinelli v. Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2014 Martinelli filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman and Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-02055

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman

Judge

Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JoAnn N. Martinelli

Petitioners

Stacey Gillis

Marrone Investor Group

Metzler Investment GmbH

Paul Sausman

Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P.

Special Situations Cayman Fund, L.P.

Defendants

Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc.

James B. Boyd

Donald J. Glidewell

Pamela G. Marrone

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert V. Prongay, NCAED

Attorney at Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Francis McConville, PHV

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

600 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Jeremy A. Lieberman, PHV

Attorney at Pomerantz, LLP

600 3Rd Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Lionel Z. Glancy

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Petitioner Attorneys

Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP

One Montgomery Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Shawn Anthony Williams

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP

One Montgomery Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Jon A. Tostrud

Attorney at Tostrud Law Group, P.C.

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2125

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Willow Eileen Radcliffe

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

100 Pine Street, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94115

Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.

Attorney at Lowenstein Sandler LLP

65 Livingston Avenue

Roseland, NJ 07068

Michael John McGaughey

Attorney at Lowenstein Sandler LLP

455 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 3177

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Lawrence M. Rolnick, PHV

Attorney at Lowenstein Sandler LLP

65 Livingston Avenue

Roseland, NJ 07068

Steven M. Hecht, PHV

Attorney at Lowenstein Sandler LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Defendant Attorney

Judson Earle Lobdell

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *James B. Boyd, Donald J. Glidewell, Pamela G. Marrone, Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lionel Z. Glancy* *Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP* *1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 VDRP) (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:14-cv-02072 by Paul Sausman. Attorney Radcliffe, Willow Eileen added. (Radcliffe, Willow) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

#5

(#5) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: James B. Boyd Waiver Donald J. Glidewell Pamela G. Marrone Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc. sent on 9/9/2014. (Glancy, Lionel) Modified on 9/17/2014 (Manzer, C). (Entered: 09/16/2014)

#6

(#6) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by JoAnn N. Martinelli for Attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $200.00, receipt number 0972-5524567) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Glancy, Lionel) Modified on 9/22/2014 (Michel, G). (Entered: 09/19/2014)

#7

(#7) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by JoAnn N. Martinelli for Attorney Francis McConville to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $200.00, receipt number 0972-5524577) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Glancy, Lionel) Modified on 9/22/2014 (Michel, G). (Entered: 09/19/2014)

#8

(#8) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/19/14. Added attorney Francis McConville, PHV for JoAnn N. Martinelli. (Manzer, C) (Entered: 09/22/2014)

#9

(#9) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/29/2014 ORDERING 6 Attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman, for JoAnn N. Martinelli. (Reader, L) (Entered: 09/30/2014)

#37

(#37) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Special Situations Cayman Fund, L.P., Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P. for attorney Thomas E. Redburn, Jr. to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-5646624) (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Good Standing)(McGaughey, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

#38

(#38) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Special Situations Cayman Fund, L.P., Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P. for attorney Lawrence M. Rolnick to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-5646659) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McGaughey, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

#39

(#39) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Special Situations Cayman Fund, L.P., Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P. for attorney Steven M. Hecht to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-5646682) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McGaughey, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

#40

(#40) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 12/11/14 adding Attorney Steven M. Hecht, PHV for Special Situations Cayman Fund, L.P., and Steven M. Hecht, PHV for Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P.. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

#41

(#41) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 12/11/14 adding Attorney Thomas E. Redburn, Jr., for Special Situations Cayman Fund, L.P., and Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P.. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

#42

(#42) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 12/11/14 adding Attorney Lawrence M. Rolnick, PHV for Special Situations Cayman Fund, L.P., and Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P.. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

#43

(#43) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the unavailability of the Court's calendar and on the Court's own motion pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 12/18/2014 hearing on Defendants' Motions to Appoint Counsel and Motions to Consolidate (ECF Nos. 15, 20, 24) is vacated and continued to 1/22/2015 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 7.(Deutsch, S) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#44

(#44) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the Defendants' Motions to Appoint Counsel and Motions to Consolidate (ECF Nos. 15, 20, 24) all scheduled for hearing on 2/22/2015, are submitted without oral argument and the hearing is vacated. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date.(Deutsch, S) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#45

(#45) ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/12/2015 ORDERING that all Motions to Consolidate ( 15 , 20 , and 24 ) are GRANTED. Special Situations' Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and for Approval of Lead Counsel ( 15 ) in the above-captioned actions and all related actions consolidated under this Order is GRANTED, and the Global Investors and Marrone Investor Group motions ( 20 , 24 ) are DENIED without prejudice. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42, the actions denominated as Martinelli v. Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc., No. 2:14-cv-02055-MCE-KJN, Sausman v. Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc., No. 2:14-cv-02072-MCE-KJN, Chen v. Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc., 2:14-cv-02105-MCE-KJN, Oldham v. Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc., 2:14-cv-02130-MCE-KJN, and Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P. v. Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc., No. 2:14-cv-02571-MCE-KJN are CONSOLIDATED. Case No. 2:14-cv-02571-MCE-KJN is designated as the "master file." The Clerk of the Court is directed to add all complaints and answers filed in Case Nos. 2:14-cv-02055-MCE-KJN, 2:14-cv-02072-MCE-KJN, 2:14-cv-02105-MCE-KJN, and 2:14-cv-02130-MCE-KJN to the master case. The Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively close Case Nos. 2:14-cv-02055-MCE-KJN, 2:14-cv-02072-MCE-KJN, 2:14-cv-02105-MCE-KJN, and 2:14-cv-02130-MCE-KJN. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report, with all parties participating, pursuant to the Order Requiring Joint Status Report in the master case. The parties are directed to file all future pleadings, motions and other filings ONLY in case No. 2:14-cv-02571-MCE-KJN. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/12/2015 ORDERING that all Motions to Consolidate ( 15 , 20 , and 24 ) are GRANTED. Special Situations' Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and for Approval of Lead Counsel ( 15 ) in the above-captioned actions and all related actions consolidated under this Order is GRANTED, and the Global Investors and Marrone Investor Group motions ( 20 , 24 ) are DENIED without prejudice. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42, the actions denominated as Martinelli v. Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc., No. 2:14-cv-02055-MCE-KJN, Sausman v. Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc., No. 2:14-cv-02072-MCE-KJN, Chen v. Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc., 2:14-cv-02105-MCE-KJN, Oldham v. Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc., 2:14-cv-02130-MCE-KJN, and Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P. v. Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc., No. 2:14-cv-02571-MCE-KJN are CONSOLIDATED. Case No. 2:14-cv-02571-MCE-KJN is designated as the "master file." The Clerk of the Court is directed to add all complaints and answers filed in Case Nos. 2:14-cv-02055-MCE-KJN, 2:14-cv-02072-MCE-KJN, 2:14-cv-02105-MCE-KJN, and 2:14-cv-02130-MCE-KJN to the master case. The Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively close Case Nos. 2:14-cv-02055-MCE-KJN, 2:14-cv-02072-MCE-KJN, 2:14-cv-02105-MCE-KJN, and 2:14-cv-02130-MCE-KJN. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report, with all parties participating, pursuant to the Order Requiring Joint Status Report in the master case. The parties are directed to file all future pleadings, motions and other filings ONLY in case No. 2:14-cv-02571-MCE-KJN. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the Defendants' Motions to Appoint Counsel and Motions to Consolidate (ECF Nos. 15, 20, 24) all scheduled for hearing on 2/22/2015, are submitted without oral argument and the hearing is vacated. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date.(Deutsch, S) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the unavailability of the Court's calendar and on the Court's own motion pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 12/18/2014 hearing on Defendants' Motions to Appoint Counsel and Motions to Consolidate (ECF Nos. 15, 20, 24) is vacated and continued to 1/22/2015 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 7.(Deutsch, S) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 12/11/14 adding Attorney Lawrence M. Rolnick, PHV for Special Situations Cayman Fund, L.P., and Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P.. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 12/11/14 adding Attorney Thomas E. Redburn, Jr., for Special Situations Cayman Fund, L.P., and Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P.. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 12/11/14 adding Attorney Steven M. Hecht, PHV for Special Situations Cayman Fund, L.P., and Steven M. Hecht, PHV for Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P.. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Special Situations Cayman Fund, L.P., Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P. for attorney Steven M. Hecht to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-5646682) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McGaughey, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Special Situations Cayman Fund, L.P., Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P. for attorney Lawrence M. Rolnick to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-5646659) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McGaughey, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Special Situations Cayman Fund, L.P., Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P. for attorney Thomas E. Redburn, Jr. to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-5646624) (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Good Standing)(McGaughey, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) OPPOSITION by Special Situations Cayman Fund, L.P., Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P. to 20 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL, 24 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McGaughey, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/7/14 ORDERING that Sausman v. Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc. et al 2:14-cv-02072-MCE-KJN and Martinelli v. Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc. et al 2:14-cv-02055-MCE-KJN ARE DESIGNATED as related actions as defined by Local Rule 123(a). However, given that both actions are already assigned to the same judges, no reassignment is necessary. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/29/2014 ORDERING 6 Attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman, for JoAnn N. Martinelli. (Reader, L) (Entered: 09/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/19/14. Added attorney Francis McConville, PHV for JoAnn N. Martinelli. (Manzer, C) (Entered: 09/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by JoAnn N. Martinelli for Attorney Francis McConville to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $200.00, receipt number 0972-5524577) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Glancy, Lionel) Modified on 9/22/2014 (Michel, G). (Entered: 09/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by JoAnn N. Martinelli for Attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $200.00, receipt number 0972-5524567) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Glancy, Lionel) Modified on 9/22/2014 (Michel, G). (Entered: 09/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: James B. Boyd Waiver Donald J. Glidewell Pamela G. Marrone Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc. sent on 9/9/2014. (Glancy, Lionel) Modified on 9/17/2014 (Manzer, C). (Entered: 09/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:14-cv-02072 by Paul Sausman. Attorney Radcliffe, Willow Eileen added. (Radcliffe, Willow) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 VDRP) (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *James B. Boyd, Donald J. Glidewell, Pamela G. Marrone, Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lionel Z. Glancy* *Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP* *1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT [Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws] against James B. Boyd, Donald J. Glidewell, Pamela G. Marrone, Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc. by JoAnn N. Martinelli. Attorney Glancy, Lionel Z. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-5501160) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Glancy, Lionel) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less