This case was last updated from PACER on 06/03/2016 at 09:11:56 (UTC).

Martin v. Pioneer Credit Recovery Inc

Case Summary

On 05/07/2015 Martin filed an Other lawsuit against Pioneer Credit Recovery Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long and Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-02099

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long

Judge

Judge Colin Stirling Bruce

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Martin

Defendant

Pioneer Credit Recovery Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sergei Lemberg

Attorney at LEMBERG LAW LLC

1100 Summer Street, 3Rd Floor

Stamford, CT 06905

Stephen F Taylor

Attorney at LEMBERG LAW LLC

3Rd Floor, 1100 Summer Street

Stamford, CT 06905

Defendant Attorney

Lisa Marie Simonetti

Attorney at VEDDER PRICE CA LLP

Suite 1900, 1925 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lisa Marie Simonetti on behalf of Pioneer Credit Recovery Inc (Simonetti, Lisa) (Entered: 07/09/2015)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Martin. Pioneer Credit Recovery Inc waiver sent on 5/14/2015, answer due 7/13/2015. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff Joseph Martin. Responses due by 5/26/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Sergei Lemberg)(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#6

(#6) ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/10/2015. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written order. (JMW, ilcd) (Entered: 07/10/2015)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Stay re 2 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff Joseph Martin. Responses due by 5/26/2015 (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2070354.), filed by Joseph Martin. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of Compliance pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 26(a)(1) & (a)(1)(C). (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Pioneer Credit Recovery Inc and mailed to plaintiff's attorney for service (SKD, ilcd) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#11

(#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Joseph Martin. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to 1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Pioneer Credit Recovery Inc.(Simonetti, Lisa) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

#13

(#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held 8/18/15 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Personal Appearance for Plaintiff by Stephen Taylor. Appearance for Defendant by Lisa Simonetti by telephone. Rule 16 conference held. Court grants Motion to Stay 3 . Plan approved; dates set. Consent to magistrate judge discussed. ADR options offered, including court-hosted settlement conference. The following discovery deadlines are set: Initial disclosure due by 8/17/15; amended pleadings due by 1/4/16; Joinder of parties due by 1/4/16; Plaintiff`s expert disclosure due by 4/15/16; Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 4/19/16; Defendant's expert disclosure due by 5/16/16; Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 5/20/16; Discovery due by 6/22/2016. Case Dispositive Motions due by 7/25/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A in Urbana before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 11/29/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A in Urbana before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. (trial estimated to be 9 days). Status Conference set for 11/2/2015 at 11:30 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long to discuss possible court hosted mediation or summary trial. (Tape #UR-B 10:02 AM.) (SKR, ilcd) Modified on 8/18/2015 to clarify appearances (SKR, ilcd). (Entered: 08/18/2015)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE. (Simonetti, Lisa) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Pioneer Credit Recovery Inc. (Simonetti, Lisa) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held 8/18/15 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Personal Appearance for Plaintiff by Stephen Taylor. Appearance for Defendant by Lisa Simonetti by telephone. Rule 16 conference held. Court grants Motion to Stay 3 . Plan approved; dates set. Consent to magistrate judge discussed. ADR options offered, including court-hosted settlement conference. The following discovery deadlines are set: Initial disclosure due by 8/17/15; amended pleadings due by 1/4/16; Joinder of parties due by 1/4/16; Plaintiff`s expert disclosure due by 4/15/16; Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 4/19/16; Defendant's expert disclosure due by 5/16/16; Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 5/20/16; Discovery due by 6/22/2016. Case Dispositive Motions due by 7/25/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A in Urbana before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 11/29/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A in Urbana before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. (trial estimated to be 9 days). Status Conference set for 11/2/2015 at 11:30 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long to discuss possible court hosted mediation or summary trial. (Tape #UR-B 10:02 AM.) (SKR, ilcd) Modified on 8/18/2015 to clarify appearances (SKR, ilcd). (Entered: 08/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE. (Simonetti, Lisa) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Joseph Martin. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE of Compliance pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 26(a)(1) & (a)(1)(C). (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Martin. Pioneer Credit Recovery Inc waiver sent on 5/14/2015, answer due 7/13/2015. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Pioneer Credit Recovery Inc. (Simonetti, Lisa) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to 1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Pioneer Credit Recovery Inc.(Simonetti, Lisa) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/10/2015. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written order. (JMW, ilcd) (Entered: 07/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lisa Marie Simonetti on behalf of Pioneer Credit Recovery Inc (Simonetti, Lisa) (Entered: 07/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Pioneer Credit Recovery Inc and mailed to plaintiff's attorney for service (SKD, ilcd) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Stay re 2 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff Joseph Martin. Responses due by 5/26/2015 (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff Joseph Martin. Responses due by 5/26/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Sergei Lemberg)(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2070354.), filed by Joseph Martin. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.