This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 08:49:08 (UTC).

Marshall Feature Recognition, LLC v. Raymond James Financial, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/19/2015 Marshall Feature Recognition, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Raymond James Financial, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne and Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-01782

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Defendant

Raymond James Financial, Inc.

Counter Defendant

Marshall Feature Recognition, LLC

Counter Claimants

Juniper Networks, Inc.

Pepsi-Cola Company

Frito-Lay, Inc.

Consolidated Defendant

Medtronic, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

David Folsom

Texarkana, TX 75503

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jason S Jackson

Attorney at Kutak Rock LLP - Nebraska

1650 Farnam Street, The Omaha Building

Omaha, NE 68102-2186

Counter Defendant Attorney

Austin Hansley

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Alan Michael Fisch

Jennifer K Robinson

Melissa Richards Smith

Roy William Sigler

William Brown Collier, Jr

Neil J McNabnay

Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Munir R Meghjee

Attorney at Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi - Minneapolis

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2015

Clyde Moody Siebman

Attorney at Siebman Burg Phillips & Smith LLP

300 N Travis St

Sherman, TX 75090-0070

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#22

#23

#24

#25

#26

#27

#28

#29

#30

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Raymond James Financial, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Jason) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. David Folsom is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/26/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Judge David Folsom, filed by Marshall Feature Recognition, LLC. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan S Kagan on behalf of Juniper Networks, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5627173. (Kagan, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benton Rain Patterson, III on behalf of Marshall Feature Recognition, LLC (Patterson, Benton) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Medtronic, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Medtronic PLC for Medtronic, Inc.. (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Brown Collier, Jr on behalf of Frito-Lay, Inc., Pepsi-Cola Company (Collier, William) (Entered: 02/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) FILED IN ERROR STIPULATION between Marshall Feature Recognition, LLC and Raymond James Financial, Inc. by Marshall Feature Recognition, LLC. (Hansley, Austin) Modified on 2/17/2016 (nkl, ). (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Medtronic, Inc., filed by Marshall Feature Recognition, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Brandon Conrad on behalf of Frito-Lay, Inc., Pepsi-Cola Company (Conrad, David) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J McNabnay on behalf of Frito-Lay, Inc., Pepsi-Cola Company (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-1782. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/22/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason S Jackson on behalf of Raymond James Financial, Inc. (Jackson, Jason) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/19/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Raymond James Financial, Inc. C/O: CT Corporation System. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Marshall Feature Recognition, LLC. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Marshall Feature Recognition, LLC (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Raymond James Financial, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5490759.), filed by Marshall Feature Recognition, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Juniper Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where RAYMOND JAMES FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Marshall Feature Recognition, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FRITO-LAY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant