This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 07:17:49 (UTC).

Marks v. AARP Foundation Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2014 Marks filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against AARP Foundation Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Douglas L Rayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-01329

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Douglas L Rayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chester Lee Marks

Phoenix, AZ 85017

Defendants

Paula Wright

Judy Montini

AARP Foundation Incorporated

Susan Ekback

Unknown Party

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Leslie V Maffeo

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP - Washington, DC

975 F St. Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Karla Grossenbacher

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP - Washington, DC

975 F St. Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Daniel Patrick Wierzba

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP - Los Angeles, CA

2029 Century Park E, Ste. 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Chester Lee Marks. (LAD) (3 pages) (Entered: 08/06/2014)

#4

(#4) This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-01329-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MHU) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

#12

(#12) * MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AARP Foundation Incorporated, Paula Wright. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wierzba, Daniel) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 7/30/2014 (LAD). (Entered: 07/28/2014)

#17

(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition to 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Chester Lee Marks. (LAD) (9 pages) (Entered: 08/06/2014)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Chester Lee Marks.(MHU) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

#7

(#7) MOTION for United States Marshal Office to Service Summons and Complaint upon Defendants by Chester Lee Marks. (LAD) (2 pages) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

#11

(#11) SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: Paula Wright upon order, summons, complaint on Paula Wright. (LAD) (Entered: 07/24/2014)

#6

(#6) ORDER denying 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/19/2014.(MMO) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/19/2014. (MMO) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

#8

(#8) ORDER denying 7 Motion for United States Marshal Office to Service Summons and Complaint upon Defendant. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/25/2014. (MMO) (Entered: 06/25/2014)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal LA Allied Barto, St. Mary Food Bank, Allegiance and John Doe by Chester Lee Marks. (LAD) (2 pages) (Entered: 07/02/2014)

#10

(#10) SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: order, summons and complaint upon Susan Ekback on 7/14/14. (LAD) (Entered: 07/24/2014)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting 9 Motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants L.A. Allied Barton Employee John Doe and St. Mary's Food Bank Allegiance Supervisor Susan Ekback are hereby dismissed from this action. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/30/14. (LAD) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AARP Foundation Incorporated. (Wierzba, Daniel) (Entered: 07/28/2014)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Chester Lee Marks. (MHU) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Hearing or Conference by Chester Lee Marks. (LAD) (2 pages) (Entered: 08/06/2014)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Chester Lee Marks. (MHU) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RESPONSE in Opposition to 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Chester Lee Marks. (LAD) (9 pages) (Entered: 08/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Hearing or Conference by Chester Lee Marks. (LAD) (2 pages) (Entered: 08/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Chester Lee Marks. (LAD) (3 pages) (Entered: 08/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting 9 Motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants L.A. Allied Barton Employee John Doe and St. Mary's Food Bank Allegiance Supervisor Susan Ekback are hereby dismissed from this action. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/30/14. (LAD) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AARP Foundation Incorporated. (Wierzba, Daniel) (Entered: 07/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) * MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AARP Foundation Incorporated, Paula Wright. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wierzba, Daniel) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 7/30/2014 (LAD). (Entered: 07/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: Paula Wright upon order, summons, complaint on Paula Wright. (LAD) (Entered: 07/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: order, summons and complaint upon Susan Ekback on 7/14/14. (LAD) (Entered: 07/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal LA Allied Barto, St. Mary Food Bank, Allegiance and John Doe by Chester Lee Marks. (LAD) (2 pages) (Entered: 07/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER denying 7 Motion for United States Marshal Office to Service Summons and Complaint upon Defendant. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/25/2014. (MMO) (Entered: 06/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for United States Marshal Office to Service Summons and Complaint upon Defendants by Chester Lee Marks. (LAD) (2 pages) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER denying 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/19/2014.(MMO) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/19/2014. (MMO) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-01329-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MHU) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Chester Lee Marks. (MHU) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Chester Lee Marks. (MHU) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Chester Lee Marks.(MHU) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.