This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2016 at 02:23:33 (UTC).

Mario Aliano v. National Football League, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2015 Mario Aliano filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against National Football League, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-05508

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mario Aliano

Defendants

NFL Enterprises, LLC

Directv, LLC

DIRECTV Holding, LLC

National Football League, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam M Tamburelli

Attorney at Jarvis Krieger and Sullivan LLP

444 West Ocean Boulevard Suite 1700

Long Beach, CA 90807

Thomas A Zimmerman, Jr

Attorney at Zimmerman Law Offices PC

77 West Washington Street Suite 1220

Chicago, IL 60602

Matthew C De Re

Attorney at Zimmerman Law Offices PC

77 West Washington Street Suite 1220

Chicago, IL 60602

Charles T Spagnola

Attorney at Jarvis Krieger and Sullivan

444 West Ocean Boulevard Suite 1700

Long Beach, CA 90802

Eliot F Krieger

Attorney at Jarvis, Krieger and Sullivan

444 West Ocean Boulevard, Suite 1700 Suite 1210

Long Beach, CA 90802

Defendant Attorneys

Neema Trivedi Sahni

Attorney at Covington and Burling LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Melissa D Ingalls

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis LLP

333 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Robyn Eileen Bladow

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis LLP

333 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Tammy Ann Tsoumas

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis LLP

333 South Hope Street 29Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16119006 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Mario Aliano. (Attorney Adam M Tamburelli added to party Mario Aliano(pty:pla))(Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mario Aliano. (Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mario Aliano, (Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Mario Aliano. Related Case(s): 2:15-cv-05261 (Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Mario Aliano. AMENDED Related Case(s): 2:15-cv-04606 (Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Mario Aliano. (Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Thomas A. Zimmerman for Plaintiff Mario Aliano. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (esa) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

#33

(#33) ORDER ON STIPULATION TO FILING OF CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS IN RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Upon Stipulation 31 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff Mario Aliano will dismiss his individual action, Case No. 2:15-cv-05508-BRO-JEM, within three days of entry of this Order. Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint will be the only operative pleading in Case No. 2:15-cv-04606-BRO-JEM. Defendants' current response dates to Plaintiff Abrahamia's First Consolidated Complaint and Plaintiff Aliano's Complaint are vacated. Instead, Defendants NFL and DIRECTV shall have 60 days (until on or before 11/2/2015) to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint. To the extent that one or more Defendants respond to the Consolidated Complaint by motion in lieu of answer(s), Plaintiffs shall file response(s) to any such motions within 60 days of the filing of Defendants' motion(s) (on or before 1/4/2016). Any reply brief supporting a motion filed in response to the Consolidated Complaint shall be filed no later than 30 days after the filing of Plaintiffs' response(s) (on or before 2/3/2016). (gk) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#32

(#32) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting 25 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Adam M. Tamburelli as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 09/08/2015)

#31

(#31) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 2, 2015 filed by Defendants DIRECTV Holding, LLC, Directv, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ingalls, Melissa) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#30

(#30) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) 29 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

#29

(#29) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Counsel shall lodge a current Certificate of Good Standing by 9/14/2015. (jloz) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

#28

(#28) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16345867 paid.) 25 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Submitted Good Standing Certificate that is over 30 days old. Certificate was issued on 6/30/15 and application was filed on 8/27/15 See Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

#27

(#27) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew C. De Re on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Adam M. Tamburelli as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 08/31/2015)

#26

(#26) APPLICATION for attorney Matthew C. De Re to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16345975 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Mario Aliano. Application set for hearing on 9/28/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 08/27/2015)

#25

(#25) APPLICATION for attorney Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16345867 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Mario Aliano. Application set for hearing on 9/28/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 08/27/2015)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER ON STIPULATION TO FILING OF CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS IN RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Upon Stipulation 31 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff Mario Aliano will dismiss his individual action, Case No. 2:15-cv-05508-BRO-JEM, within three days of entry of this Order. Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint will be the only operative pleading in Case No. 2:15-cv-04606-BRO-JEM. Defendants' current response dates to Plaintiff Abrahamia's First Consolidated Complaint and Plaintiff Aliano's Complaint are vacated. Instead, Defendants NFL and DIRECTV shall have 60 days (until on or before 11/2/2015) to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint. To the extent that one or more Defendants respond to the Consolidated Complaint by motion in lieu of answer(s), Plaintiffs shall file response(s) to any such motions within 60 days of the filing of Defendants' motion(s) (on or before 1/4/2016). Any reply brief supporting a motion filed in response to the Consolidated Complaint shall be filed no later than 30 days after the filing of Plaintiffs' response(s) (on or before 2/3/2016). (gk) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting 25 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Adam M. Tamburelli as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 09/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 2, 2015 filed by Defendants DIRECTV Holding, LLC, Directv, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ingalls, Melissa) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) 29 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Counsel shall lodge a current Certificate of Good Standing by 9/14/2015. (jloz) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16345867 paid.) 25 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Submitted Good Standing Certificate that is over 30 days old. Certificate was issued on 6/30/15 and application was filed on 8/27/15 See Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew C. De Re on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Adam M. Tamburelli as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 08/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) APPLICATION for attorney Matthew C. De Re to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16345975 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Mario Aliano. Application set for hearing on 9/28/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 08/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) APPLICATION for attorney Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16345867 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Mario Aliano. Application set for hearing on 9/28/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 08/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mario Aliano, upon Defendant NFL Enterprises, LLC served on 8/12/2015, answer due 9/23/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent Amy McLaren in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Matthew C. De Re for Plaintiff Mario Aliano. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (esa) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Thomas A. Zimmerman for Plaintiff Mario Aliano. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (esa) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Mario Aliano. (Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Mario Aliano. AMENDED Related Case(s): 2:15-cv-04606 (Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Mario Aliano. Related Case(s): 2:15-cv-05261 (Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mario Aliano, (Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mario Aliano. (Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16119006 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Mario Aliano. (Attorney Adam M Tamburelli added to party Mario Aliano(pty:pla))(Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less