This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2016 at 00:30:12 (UTC).

Marie Wick v. Johnson and Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2015 Marie Wick filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson and Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-05393

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Jesus G. Bernal

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marie Wick

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

Ethicon LLC

Does

Johnson and Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Noah M Wexler

Attorney at Arnold and Itkin LLP

1401 Mckinney Street Suite 2550

Houston, TX 77010

Helen E Zukin

Attorney at Kiesel Law LLP

8648 Wilshire Boulevard

Beverly Hills, CA 90211-2910

Mark Sparks

Attorney at Mostyn Law Firm

6280 Delaware Street

Beaumont, TX 77706

Amy F Solomon

Attorney at Girardi Keese

1126 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Kurt B Arnold

Attorney at Arnold and Itkin LLP

1401 Mckinney Street Suite 2550

Houston, TX 77010

J Steve Mostyn

Attorney at The Mostyn Law Firm

3810 W Alabama Street

Houston, TX 77027

Jason A Itkin

Attorney at Arnold and Itkin LLP

1401 Mckinney Street Suite 2550

Houston, TX 77010

Thomas Vincent Girardi

Attorney at Girardi Keese

1126 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua J Wes

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

Lauren H Bragin

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Mollie Fleming Benedict

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC531848OOO Receipt No: 0973-16090358 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Ethicon LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Joshua J. Wes in Support of Removal) (Attorney Joshua J Wes added to party Ethicon LLC(pty:dft))(Wes, Joshua) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ethicon LLC. (Wes, Joshua) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Ethicon LLC, (Wes, Joshua) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Ethicon LLC. Related Case(s): 2:14-cv-00899-JGB-SP (Wes, Joshua) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#5

(#5) ANSWERJURY DEMAND. filed by DEFENDANT Ethicon LLC.(Attorney Lauren H Bragin added to party Ethicon LLC(pty:dft))(Bragin, Lauren) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Kurt B Arnold for Plaintiff Marie Wick. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (ghap) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Jason A Itkin for Plaintiff Marie Wick. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (ghap) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

#31

(#31) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,,, Motion Hearing,, 30 filed by Plaintiff Marie Wick. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Sparks, Mark) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#32

(#32) DECLARATION of Mark Sparks in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,,, Motion Hearing,, 30 31 filed by Plaintiff Marie Wick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6)(Sparks, Mark) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#33

(#33) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,,, Motion Hearing,, 30 31 filed by Defendant Ethicon LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua J. Wes in Support of Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration, # 2 Exhibit A-D to Declaration of Joshua J. Wes)(Wes, Joshua) (Entered: 09/14/2015)

#34

(#34) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal filed by Plaintiff Marie Wick. Motion set for hearing on 10/19/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Sparks, Mark) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#35

(#35) DECLARATION of Mark Sparks in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal 34 filed by Plaintiff Marie Wick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Sparks, Mark) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#36

(#36) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,,, Motion Hearing,, 30 31 filed by Plaintiff Marie Wick. (Sparks, Mark) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

#37

(#37) DECLARATION of Mark Sparks in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,,, Motion Hearing,, 30 31 filed by Plaintiff Marie Wick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Sparks, Mark) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

#38

(#38) NOTICE OF VACATUR OF SUA SPONTE REMAND ORDERS CITED IN PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,,, Motion Hearing,, 30 31 filed by Defendant Ethicon LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Wes, Joshua) (Entered: 09/24/2015)

#39

(#39) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal 34 filed by Defendant Ethicon LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua J. Wes in Support of Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay and to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal, # 2 Exhibit A-B to Declaration of Joshua J. Wes)(Wes, Joshua) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal 34 filed by Defendant Ethicon LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua J. Wes in Support of Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay and to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal, # 2 Exhibit A-B to Declaration of Joshua J. Wes)(Wes, Joshua) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) NOTICE OF VACATUR OF SUA SPONTE REMAND ORDERS CITED IN PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,,, Motion Hearing,, 30 31 filed by Defendant Ethicon LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Wes, Joshua) (Entered: 09/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) DECLARATION of Mark Sparks in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,,, Motion Hearing,, 30 31 filed by Plaintiff Marie Wick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Sparks, Mark) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,,, Motion Hearing,, 30 31 filed by Plaintiff Marie Wick. (Sparks, Mark) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) DECLARATION of Mark Sparks in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal 34 filed by Plaintiff Marie Wick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Sparks, Mark) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal filed by Plaintiff Marie Wick. Motion set for hearing on 10/19/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Sparks, Mark) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,,, Motion Hearing,, 30 31 filed by Defendant Ethicon LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua J. Wes in Support of Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration, # 2 Exhibit A-D to Declaration of Joshua J. Wes)(Wes, Joshua) (Entered: 09/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) DECLARATION of Mark Sparks in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,,, Motion Hearing,, 30 31 filed by Plaintiff Marie Wick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6)(Sparks, Mark) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,, Order on Motion to Stay Case,,, Motion Hearing,, 30 filed by Plaintiff Marie Wick. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Sparks, Mark) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MINUTES OF DENYING Plaintiff's 15 MOTION to Remand and GRANTING Defendant's 16 MOTION to Stay Case: (see document image for further details). Plaintiffs motion to remand is DENIED. Ethicons motion to stay is GRANTED. The case is STAYED pending decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation whether to transfer the action. Pursuant to stipulation by counsel, this decision shall govern each of the 59 open cases related to former case 2:14-cv-00899-JGB. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) Court Reporter: Adele C Frazier. (ad) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Noah M Wexler for Plaintiff Marie Wick. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (ghap) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Jason A Itkin for Plaintiff Marie Wick. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (ghap) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Kurt B Arnold for Plaintiff Marie Wick. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (ghap) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWERJURY DEMAND. filed by DEFENDANT Ethicon LLC.(Attorney Lauren H Bragin added to party Ethicon LLC(pty:dft))(Bragin, Lauren) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Ethicon LLC. Related Case(s): 2:14-cv-00899-JGB-SP (Wes, Joshua) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Ethicon LLC, (Wes, Joshua) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ethicon LLC. (Wes, Joshua) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC531848OOO Receipt No: 0973-16090358 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Ethicon LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Joshua J. Wes in Support of Removal) (Attorney Joshua J Wes added to party Ethicon LLC(pty:dft))(Wes, Joshua) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less