This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:42:05 (UTC).

Man-Q Corp. v. Conair Corp.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2015 Man-Q Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Conair Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan and District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-01367

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan

Judge

District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Man-Q Corp.

Defendant

Conair Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bernard Joseph DiMuro

Attorney at DiMuro Ginsberg PC

1101 King Street, Suite 610

Alexandria, VA 22314-2956

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas Valdis Cumings

Attorney at BrigliaHundley PC (Tysons)

1921 Gallows Rd, Suite 750

Tysons Corner, VA 22182

Amy Sanborn Owen

Attorney at BrigliaHundley PC (Tysons)

1921 Gallows Rd, Suite 750

Tysons Corner, VA 22182

Kristin Anne Martin Zech

Attorney at BrigliaHundley PC (Tysons)

1921 Gallows Rd, Suite 750

Tysons Corner, VA 22182

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Conair Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683054805.), filed by Man-Q Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Letter, # 4 Receipt)(kgra, ) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#2

(#2) Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s) D391,020; D404,524; D627,509; D635,296; D688,815; 8,161,982. (kgra, ) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

#3

(#3) Waiver of re 1 Complaint by Man-Q Corp. (DiMuro, Bernard) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/16/2015) (pmil, ). (Entered: 12/16/2015)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Man-Q Corp.. Conair Corp. waiver sent on 11/3/2015, answer due 1/4/2016. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Anne Martin Zech on behalf of Conair Corp. (Zech, Kristin) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Valdis Cumings on behalf of Conair Corp. (Cumings, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Conair Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Zech, Kristin) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Change Venue by Conair Corp.. (Zech, Kristin) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

#9

(#9) Memorandum in Support re 8 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Conair Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ellen Slicklen)(Zech, Kristin) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

#22

(#22) ORDER granting 8 Motion to Change Venue. ORDERED this civil action be and is TRANSFERRED to the District of Connecticut. ORDERED that the hearing on defendant's Motions to Transfer [Dkt. No. 8], which is currently set for 10:00 a.m. on Friday, January 22, 2015, be and is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/20/16. (klau, ) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#21

(#21) REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Conair Corp.. (Zech, Kristin) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

#20

(#20) RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Man-Q Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Sakagami, Sara) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

#19

(#19) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Man-Q Corp.. (Sakagami, Sara) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting 14 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 01/06/16. (pmil, ) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

#17

(#17) ORDER granting 13 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 01/06/16. (pmil, ) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting 12 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 01/06/16. (pmil, ) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

#15

(#15) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Conair Corp.. (Zech, Kristin) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

#14

(#14) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Travis Campbell and Certification of Local Counsel Kristin Zech Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4797792. by Conair Corp.. (Zech, Kristin) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER granting 8 Motion to Change Venue. ORDERED this civil action be and is TRANSFERRED to the District of Connecticut. ORDERED that the hearing on defendant's Motions to Transfer [Dkt. No. 8], which is currently set for 10:00 a.m. on Friday, January 22, 2015, be and is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/20/16. (klau, ) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Conair Corp.. (Zech, Kristin) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Man-Q Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Sakagami, Sara) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Man-Q Corp.. (Sakagami, Sara) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting 14 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 01/06/16. (pmil, ) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting 13 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 01/06/16. (pmil, ) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting 12 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 01/06/16. (pmil, ) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Conair Corp.. (Zech, Kristin) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Travis Campbell and Certification of Local Counsel Kristin Zech Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4797792. by Conair Corp.. (Zech, Kristin) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael La Porte and Certification of Local Counsel Kristin Zech Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4797769. by Conair Corp.. (Zech, Kristin) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Hearing Date set for 1/22/2016 re 8 MOTION to Change Venue (Zech, Kristin) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Memorandum in Support re 8 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Conair Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ellen Slicklen)(Zech, Kristin) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Change Venue by Conair Corp.. (Zech, Kristin) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Conair Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Zech, Kristin) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Valdis Cumings on behalf of Conair Corp. (Cumings, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Anne Martin Zech on behalf of Conair Corp. (Zech, Kristin) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Man-Q Corp.. Conair Corp. waiver sent on 11/3/2015, answer due 1/4/2016. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Waiver of re 1 Complaint by Man-Q Corp. (DiMuro, Bernard) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/16/2015) (pmil, ). (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s) D391,020; D404,524; D627,509; D635,296; D688,815; 8,161,982. (kgra, ) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Conair Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683054805.), filed by Man-Q Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Letter, # 4 Receipt)(kgra, ) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.