This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 06:13:32 (UTC).

Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe

Case Summary

On 02/11/2015 Malibu Media, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge James K. Bredar. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00402

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge James K. Bredar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malibu Media, LLC

Defendant

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jon Alexander Hoppe

Attorney at Maddox Hoppe Hoofnagle and Hafey LLC

1401 Mercantile Ln Ste 105

Largo, MD 20774

Defendant Attorney

Eric J Menhart

Attorney at Lexero Law

316 F St Ne, Suite 101

Washington, DC 20002

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

No Description Available

#2

(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Hoppe, Jon) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Malibu Media, LLC Responses due by 3/2/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Law, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoppe, Jon) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC of Inability to Confer (Hoppe, Jon) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

#5

(#5) Correspondence to the Register of Copyrights re: Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (c/m 2/11/15 bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 3 Motion to Expedite Discovery. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 2/11/2015. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC re 6 Order on Motion to Expedite of Filing Certifications (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Hoppe, Jon) (Entered: 02/19/2015)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION for More Definite Statement , MOTION to Quash by John Doe Responses due by 4/20/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Menhart, Eric) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Quash filed by Malibu Media, LLC. Replies due by 5/7/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoppe, Jon) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 5/12/2015. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/12/2015)

#11

(#11) ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss, for a More Definitive Statement, and/or to Quash. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 5/12/2015. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/12/2015)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Malibu Media, LLC (Hoppe, Jon) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

#13

(#13) ORDER directing Clerk to close the case in light of Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 5/20/2015. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/20/2015)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER directing Clerk to close the case in light of Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 5/20/2015. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Malibu Media, LLC (Hoppe, Jon) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss, for a More Definitive Statement, and/or to Quash. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 5/12/2015. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 5/12/2015. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Quash filed by Malibu Media, LLC. Replies due by 5/7/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoppe, Jon) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION for More Definite Statement , MOTION to Quash by John Doe Responses due by 4/20/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Menhart, Eric) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC re 6 Order on Motion to Expedite of Filing Certifications (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Hoppe, Jon) (Entered: 02/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 3 Motion to Expedite Discovery. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 2/11/2015. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Correspondence to the Register of Copyrights re: Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (c/m 2/11/15 bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC of Inability to Confer (Hoppe, Jon) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Malibu Media, LLC Responses due by 3/2/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Law, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoppe, Jon) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Hoppe, Jon) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-5219540.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Hoppe, Jon) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less