This case was last updated from PACER on 06/03/2016 at 20:33:36 (UTC).

Mako Surgical Corp. et al v. Blue Belt Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/30/2014 Mako Surgical Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Blue Belt Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Darrin P. Gayles and Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:14-CV-61263

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Darrin P. Gayles

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff

 

Party Details

Counter Claimants and Counter Defendants

Mako Surgical Corp.

All-Of-Innovation GmbH

Carnegie Mellon University

Blue Belt Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Claimant and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth Patterson

Danielle Coleman

Humberto H. Ocariz

Wesley Overson

Michael Aaron Holt

Wendy Ray

Wayne M. Barsky

Josh A. Krevitt

James Anthony Gale

Richard Guerra

Stuart M. Rosenberg

Timothy P. Best

Patrick J. McElhinny

Christopher M. Verdini

Jonathan Bart Morton

Karen Finesilver

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Blue Belt Technologies, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-6783964, filed by Mako Surgical Corp., All-Of-Innovation GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Exhibit)(Ocariz, Humberto) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

#2

(#2) Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke (yar) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

#3

(#3) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (yar) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Blue Belt Technologies, Inc.. (yar) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by All-Of-Innovation GmbH, Mako Surgical Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Stryker Corp. for Mako Surgical Corp. (Holt, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Elizabeth Patterson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 80723. (ksa) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Wendy Ray. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 80722. (ksa) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Danielle Coleman. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 80721. (ksa) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Wesley Overson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 80724. (ksa) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

#68

(#68) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Patrick J. McElhinny. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 94592. (ksa) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

#69

(#69) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher M. Verdini. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 94591. (ksa) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

#70

(#70) ENDORSED ORDER granting 68 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Patrick J. McElhinny is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Counterclaim Plaintiff Carnegie Mellon University for all purposes relating to this action. The Clerk is directed to provide notice of electronic filings to Mr. McElhinny at Patrick.McElhinny@klgates.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/11/2015. (hs01) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

#71

(#71) ENDORSED ORDER granting 69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Christopher M. Verdini is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Counterclaim Plaintiff Carnegie Mellon University for all purposes relating to this action. The Clerk is directed to provide notice of electronic filings to Mr. Verdini at Christopher.Verdini@klgates.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/11/2015. (hs01) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

#72

(#72) Joint MOTION to Stay by All-Of-Innovation GmbH, Mako Surgical Corp.. Responses due by 3/12/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holt, Michael) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

#73

(#73) WITHDRAWAL of Motion by All-Of-Innovation GmbH, Mako Surgical Corp. re 65 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review of the Counterclaimants' Patents-in-Suit MOTION for Hearing filed by All-Of-Innovation GmbH, Mako Surgical Corp. (Holt, Michael) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

#74

(#74) ENDORSED ORDER granting 72 Motion to Stay. The parties shall submit a joint status report within fourteen (14) days after the PTO reaches a decision as to whether to institute review on the last of the three IPR petitions. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/25/2015. (hs01) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

#75

(#75) ENDORSED ORDER. This case is closed for administrative purposes pending the stay. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/25/2015. (hs01) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69. (Entered: 02/25/2015)

#76

(#76) STATUS REPORT (JOINT) Regarding IPR Petitions by Mako Surgical Corp. (Ocariz, Humberto) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) STATUS REPORT (JOINT) Regarding IPR Petitions by Mako Surgical Corp. (Ocariz, Humberto) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) ENDORSED ORDER. This case is closed for administrative purposes pending the stay. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/25/2015. (hs01) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69. (Entered: 02/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) ENDORSED ORDER granting 72 Motion to Stay. The parties shall submit a joint status report within fourteen (14) days after the PTO reaches a decision as to whether to institute review on the last of the three IPR petitions. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/25/2015. (hs01) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) WITHDRAWAL of Motion by All-Of-Innovation GmbH, Mako Surgical Corp. re 65 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review of the Counterclaimants' Patents-in-Suit MOTION for Hearing filed by All-Of-Innovation GmbH, Mako Surgical Corp. (Holt, Michael) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) Joint MOTION to Stay by All-Of-Innovation GmbH, Mako Surgical Corp.. Responses due by 3/12/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holt, Michael) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) ENDORSED ORDER granting 69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Christopher M. Verdini is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Counterclaim Plaintiff Carnegie Mellon University for all purposes relating to this action. The Clerk is directed to provide notice of electronic filings to Mr. Verdini at Christopher.Verdini@klgates.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/11/2015. (hs01) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) ENDORSED ORDER granting 68 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Patrick J. McElhinny is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Counterclaim Plaintiff Carnegie Mellon University for all purposes relating to this action. The Clerk is directed to provide notice of electronic filings to Mr. McElhinny at Patrick.McElhinny@klgates.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/11/2015. (hs01) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher M. Verdini. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 94591. (ksa) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Patrick J. McElhinny. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 94592. (ksa) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) ANSWER to Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against Blue Belt Technologies, Inc., Carnegie Mellon University by Mako Surgical Corp.. (Ocariz, Humberto) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Order Transferring Case Pursuant to Administrative Order 2011-53. This matter is hereby reassigned to the calendar of United States District Judge K. Michael Moore for all further proceedings, Judge Marcia G. Cooke no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/12/2014. (tpe) (Entered: 06/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Wesley Overson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 80724. (ksa) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Danielle Coleman. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 80721. (ksa) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Wendy Ray. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 80722. (ksa) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Elizabeth Patterson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 80723. (ksa) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by All-Of-Innovation GmbH, Mako Surgical Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Stryker Corp. for Mako Surgical Corp. (Holt, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Blue Belt Technologies, Inc.. (yar) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (yar) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke (yar) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Blue Belt Technologies, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-6783964, filed by Mako Surgical Corp., All-Of-Innovation GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Exhibit)(Ocariz, Humberto) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less