This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 02:20:52 (UTC).

Maisonet v. Salem Housing Authority et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Maisonet filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Salem Housing Authority. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-12559

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Leo T. Sorokin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jorge A Maisonet

Salem, MA 01970

Defendants

Lorri A DeFrancesco

Carol A MacGown

Salem Housing Authority

Not Classified By Court

Judge M. Page Kelley

Judge Page Kelley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

C. Alex Hahn

42 Newbern St. Ste 3

Boston, MA 02130

Bradley A. Singer

Attorney at SINGER LAW FIRM

Two Salem Green

Salem, MA 01970

Defendant Attorney

Martin J. Rooney

Attorney at Curley & Curley PC

35 Braintree Hill Office Park, Suite 103

Braintree, MA 02184

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Affidavit of Service by Jorge A Maisonet re 4 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants, 3 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 1 Complaint, 6 Summons Issued, of Affidavit of Service (Singer, Bradley) Modified docket text on 6/19/2014 (Moore, Kellyann). (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#3

(#3) MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants filed by Jorge A Maisonet. (Singer, Bradley) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5062768 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jorge A Maisonet. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Sheet)(Singer, Bradley) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants by Jorge A Maisonet.(Singer, Bradley) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#54

(#54) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to MJ Kelley for Alternative Dispute Resolution.(Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 01/22/2015)

#57

(#57) ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING DUE TO WEATHER CONDITIONS: Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 2/12/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Lovett, Zita) (Entered: 02/05/2015)

#61

(#61) REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider (Lovett, Zita) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#62

(#62) Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered. Case no longer referred to Alternative Dispute Resolution.(Lovett, Zita) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed Salem Housing Authority served on 6/23/2014, answer due 7/14/2014. (Singer, Bradley) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

#58

(#58) MOTION to Continue to 02/24/15 Mediation Date (Assented to) by Lorri A DeFrancesco, Carol A MacGown, Salem Housing Authority.(Rooney, Martin) (Entered: 02/06/2015)

#59

(#59) Certified mail (Ref# 9896) re. 52 sent to Jorge A. Maisonet, returned as unclaimed. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Bradley A. Singer, Esq. in Support re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants filed by Jorge A Maisonet. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Exhibits A-C, # 2 Plaintiff's Exhibits D-F, # 3 Plaintiff's Exhibits G-H, # 4 Plaintiff's Exhibits I-N, # 5 Plaintiff's Exhibit O)(Singer, Bradley) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#55

(#55) AMENDED ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 2/9/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. Plaintiff and attorney for the defendant should attendant. any other parties who wish to attend may, but are not required to. If the parties wish to file updated memoranda they may do so but it is not required. If an update memorandum is filed, it should be emailed to patricia_macdougall@mad.uscourts.gov by Friday, February 6. (Lovett, Zita) Modified on 2/4/2015 (Lovett, Zita). Modified on 2/4/2015 (Lovett, Zita). (Entered: 01/23/2015)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Moore, Kellyann) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#60

(#60) Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 58 Motion to Continue Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 2/24/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. Parties do not need to re-submit memos unless they wish to. (Lovett, Zita) (Entered: 02/18/2015)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed Carol A MacGown served on 6/23/2014, answer due 7/14/2014. (Singer, Bradley) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

#56

(#56) Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge M. Page Kelley appointed.(Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 02/04/2015)

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered. Case no longer referred to Alternative Dispute Resolution.(Lovett, Zita) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider (Lovett, Zita) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 58 Motion to Continue Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 2/24/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. Parties do not need to re-submit memos unless they wish to. (Lovett, Zita) (Entered: 02/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) Certified mail (Ref# 9896) re. 52 sent to Jorge A. Maisonet, returned as unclaimed. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) MOTION to Continue to 02/24/15 Mediation Date (Assented to) by Lorri A DeFrancesco, Carol A MacGown, Salem Housing Authority.(Rooney, Martin) (Entered: 02/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING DUE TO WEATHER CONDITIONS: Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 2/12/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Lovett, Zita) (Entered: 02/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge M. Page Kelley appointed.(Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 02/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) AMENDED ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 2/9/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. Plaintiff and attorney for the defendant should attendant. any other parties who wish to attend may, but are not required to. If the parties wish to file updated memoranda they may do so but it is not required. If an update memorandum is filed, it should be emailed to patricia_macdougall@mad.uscourts.gov by Friday, February 6. (Lovett, Zita) Modified on 2/4/2015 (Lovett, Zita). Modified on 2/4/2015 (Lovett, Zita). (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to MJ Kelley for Alternative Dispute Resolution.(Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 01/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Status Conference held on 1/20/2015. The court goes over the procedures with the plaintiff. The plaintiff informs the court of his damages and how this has effected himself and his dogs. Plaintiff states he lives in fear of eviction and leaving the apartment due to the bullying and abuse of the defendant. The plaintiff is currently not sleeping in the apartment. The defendant states the plaintiff is not in compliance with the current lease regarding the requested re -certification process and has not paid his rent in 4 months. The court urges the parties to attend a further mediation. Both parties agree and will be referred back to Judge Kelley for further mediation. The parties shall file a status report as to the status of the case after the mediation, if the case does not settle the court will issue a schedule. (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez., raeufp@gmail.com.) (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 01/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed Lorri A DeFrancesco served on 6/23/2014, answer due 7/14/2014. (Singer, Bradley) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed Carol A MacGown served on 6/23/2014, answer due 7/14/2014. (Singer, Bradley) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed Salem Housing Authority served on 6/23/2014, answer due 7/14/2014. (Singer, Bradley) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Affidavit of Service by Jorge A Maisonet re 4 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants, 3 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 1 Complaint, 6 Summons Issued, of Affidavit of Service (Singer, Bradley) Modified docket text on 6/19/2014 (Moore, Kellyann). (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Moore, Kellyann) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Bradley A. Singer, Esq. in Support re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants filed by Jorge A Maisonet. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Exhibits A-C, # 2 Plaintiff's Exhibits D-F, # 3 Plaintiff's Exhibits G-H, # 4 Plaintiff's Exhibits I-N, # 5 Plaintiff's Exhibit O)(Singer, Bradley) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants filed by Jorge A Maisonet. (Singer, Bradley) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants by Jorge A Maisonet.(Singer, Bradley) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5062768 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jorge A Maisonet. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Sheet)(Singer, Bradley) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.