This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2016 at 05:16:26 (UTC).

Lugo et al v. Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2014 Lugo filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-01618

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Yessica Acevedo

Conjugal Partnership Lugo-Acevedo

Conjugal partnership Colon-Perez

Sarai Perez-Mercado

Omar Lugo

Defendants

Conjugal Partnership Oppenheimer-Roe

Conjugal Partnership Roe-Roe

Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority

Zoraida Fuentes-Moure

Conjugal Partnership Doe-Alicea

Jane Doe

Conjugal Partnership Figueroa-Roe

Maria Teresa Adames-Aquino

Maria M. Mendez-Rivera

Juan Alicea-Flores

Conjugal Partnership Roe-Mendez

Angel Figueroa-Jaramillo

Insurance Company A,B, C

Conjugal Partnership Perez-Adames

Jorge Hernandez-Perez

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jane A. Becker-Whitaker

Attorney at Jane Becker Whitaker, PSC

Po Box 9023914

San Juan, PR 00902-3914

Defendant Attorneys

Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez

Attorney at Guzman & Rodriguez-Lopez Law Offices

Po Box 70250 Suite 279

San Juan, PR 00936

Jose A. Morales-Boscio

Attorney at Harry Anduze Montano Law Office

1454 Fernandez Juncos Ave

San Juan, PR 00909

Harry Anduze-Montano

Attorney at Harry Anduze Montano Law Office

1454 Fernandez Juncos Ave

San Juan, PR 00909

Aurea Yadira Rivera-Alvarado

Attorney at Rivera-Munich & Hernandez Law Offices PSC

P.O. Box 364908

San Juan, PR 00936-4908

Isabel C. Frau-Nicole

Attorney at Department of Justice Puerto Rico

Po Box 9020192

San Juan, PR 00902-0192

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-4039530.), filed by Yessica Acevedo, Conjugal partnership Colon-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Lugo-Acevedo, Oscar Colon. Service due by 12/12/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Statement Under Penalty of Perjury, # 2 Statement Under Penalty of Perjury, # 3 Category Sheet, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane) (Entered: 08/11/2014)

#2

(#2) MOTION Submitting Substitute civil cover sheet re: 1 Complaint, filed by Conjugal Partnership Lugo-Acevedo, Oscar Colon, Conjugal partnership Colon-Perez, Yessica Acevedo filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/28/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Related document(s) 1 ) (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) (Entered: 08/11/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (jla) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

#4

(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The record shows that the instant case is directly related to Civil No. 13-1844 (PAD) and Civil No. 13-1880 (PAD). Pursuant to Local Rule 3A (b) and (d), the Clerk will reassign the instant case to the Hon. Pedro Delgado Hernandez subject to his approval. In the event, Judge Delgado Hernandez approves the transfer, a case from Judge Delgado Hernandez' docket may be transferred to the undersigned. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/12/2014.(JAM) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order entered by Judge Daniel R. Domnguez on 08/12/2014 (Docket No. 4), and upon the consent of Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez, this case has been transferred to the docket of Judge Delgado-Hernandez. All future pleadings shall bear the initials of Judge Delgado-Hernandez next to the case number: Civil Case No. 14-1618(PAD). Judge Judge Daniel R. Dominguez no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 8/12/2014.(gr) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

#6

(#6) MOTION Submitting Summons re: 1 Complaint, filed by Conjugal Partnership Lugo-Acevedo, Oscar Colon, Conjugal partnership Colon-Perez, Yessica Acevedo filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/18/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons)(Related document(s) 1 ) (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) (Entered: 09/01/2014)

#7

(#7) ORDER: Noting 2 "Motion Filing Substitute Civil Cover Sheet." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 09/03/2014. (LMR) (Entered: 09/03/2014)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Noting 6 "Motion Submitting Summons." The Clerk shall issue the summons accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 09/03/2014. (LMR) (Entered: 09/03/2014)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Maria Teresa Adames-Aquino, Juan Alicea-Flores, Conjugal Partnership Alicea-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Figueroa-Roe, Conjugal Partnership Hernandez-Fuentes, Conjugal Partnership Mendez-Roe, Conjugal Partnership Oppenheimer-Roe, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Adames, Angel Figueroa-Jaramillo, Zoraida Fuentes-Moure, Jorge Hernandez-Perez, Maria M. Mendez-Rivera, Victor M. Oppenheimer-Soto, Manuel Perez-Soler, Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (rc) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

#65

(#65) USCA Case Number 16-1366 for 63 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sarai Perez-Mercado, Conjugal Partnership Lugo-Acevedo, Omar Lugo, Oscar Colon, Conjugal partnership Colon-Perez, Yessica Acevedo. (xi) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

#64

(#64) Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 63 Notice of Appeal, [Docket Entries 61, 62 & 63] (xi) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

#63

(#63) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 62 Judgment, 61 Order, Terminate Motions,, by Yessica Acevedo, Oscar Colon, Conjugal Partnership Lugo-Acevedo, Conjugal partnership Colon-Perez, Omar Lugo, Sarai Perez-Mercado. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0104-4836758.NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel should register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf/. Counsel should also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) (Entered: 03/18/2016)

#62

(#62) JUDGMENT dismissing plaintiffs' claims with prejudice. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 02/18/2016.(LMR) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

#61

(#61) ORDER: Granting 49 defendants' "Motion to Dismiss." Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed, albeit the dismissal of claims brought under Puerto Rico law is without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 02/18/2016.(LMR) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

#60

(#60) ORDER:Noting 59 "Motion Regarding Vacation Leave Period." The court will not authorize extensions of time in advance. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/22/2015. (LMR) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

#59

(#59) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Vacation Leave Period filed by Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of Juan Alicea-Flores, Jorge Hernandez-Perez, Maria M. Mendez-Rivera, Victor M. Oppenheimer-Soto, Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/8/2016 (Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

#58

(#58) ORDER: Granting 57 "Motion to Withdraw Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/16/2015. (LMR) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

#57

(#57) MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Jose A. Morales-Boscio filed by Jose A. Morales-Boscio on behalf of Maria Teresa Adames-Aquino, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Adames, Angel Figueroa-Jaramillo, Manuel Perez-Soler Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/30/2015 (Morales-Boscio, Jose) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) USCA Case Number 16-1366 for 63 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sarai Perez-Mercado, Conjugal Partnership Lugo-Acevedo, Omar Lugo, Oscar Colon, Conjugal partnership Colon-Perez, Yessica Acevedo. (xi) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 63 Notice of Appeal, [Docket Entries 61, 62 & 63] (xi) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 62 Judgment, 61 Order, Terminate Motions,, by Yessica Acevedo, Oscar Colon, Conjugal Partnership Lugo-Acevedo, Conjugal partnership Colon-Perez, Omar Lugo, Sarai Perez-Mercado. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0104-4836758.NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel should register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf/. Counsel should also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) (Entered: 03/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) JUDGMENT dismissing plaintiffs' claims with prejudice. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 02/18/2016.(LMR) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) ORDER: Granting 49 defendants' "Motion to Dismiss." Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed, albeit the dismissal of claims brought under Puerto Rico law is without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 02/18/2016.(LMR) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) ORDER:Noting 59 "Motion Regarding Vacation Leave Period." The court will not authorize extensions of time in advance. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/22/2015. (LMR) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Vacation Leave Period filed by Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of Juan Alicea-Flores, Jorge Hernandez-Perez, Maria M. Mendez-Rivera, Victor M. Oppenheimer-Soto, Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/8/2016 (Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) ORDER: Granting 57 "Motion to Withdraw Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/16/2015. (LMR) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Jose A. Morales-Boscio filed by Jose A. Morales-Boscio on behalf of Maria Teresa Adames-Aquino, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Adames, Angel Figueroa-Jaramillo, Manuel Perez-Soler Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/30/2015 (Morales-Boscio, Jose) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) NOTICE of Appearance by Jose A. Morales-Boscio on behalf of Maria Teresa Adames-Aquino, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Adames, Angel Figueroa-Jaramillo, Manuel Perez-Soler (Morales-Boscio, Jose) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/17/2014 to File Answer to the Complaint and Notice of Appearance re: 1 Complaint, filed by Conjugal Partnership Lugo-Acevedo, Oscar Colon, Conjugal partnership Colon-Perez, Yessica Acevedo filed by Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/3/2014 (Related document(s) 1 ) (Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Maria Teresa Adames-Aquino, Juan Alicea-Flores, Conjugal Partnership Alicea-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Figueroa-Roe, Conjugal Partnership Hernandez-Fuentes, Conjugal Partnership Mendez-Roe, Conjugal Partnership Oppenheimer-Roe, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Adames, Angel Figueroa-Jaramillo, Zoraida Fuentes-Moure, Jorge Hernandez-Perez, Maria M. Mendez-Rivera, Victor M. Oppenheimer-Soto, Manuel Perez-Soler, Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (rc) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: Noting 6 "Motion Submitting Summons." The Clerk shall issue the summons accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 09/03/2014. (LMR) (Entered: 09/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Noting 2 "Motion Filing Substitute Civil Cover Sheet." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 09/03/2014. (LMR) (Entered: 09/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION Submitting Summons re: 1 Complaint, filed by Conjugal Partnership Lugo-Acevedo, Oscar Colon, Conjugal partnership Colon-Perez, Yessica Acevedo filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/18/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons)(Related document(s) 1 ) (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) (Entered: 09/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order entered by Judge Daniel R. Domnguez on 08/12/2014 (Docket No. 4), and upon the consent of Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez, this case has been transferred to the docket of Judge Delgado-Hernandez. All future pleadings shall bear the initials of Judge Delgado-Hernandez next to the case number: Civil Case No. 14-1618(PAD). Judge Judge Daniel R. Dominguez no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 8/12/2014.(gr) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The record shows that the instant case is directly related to Civil No. 13-1844 (PAD) and Civil No. 13-1880 (PAD). Pursuant to Local Rule 3A (b) and (d), the Clerk will reassign the instant case to the Hon. Pedro Delgado Hernandez subject to his approval. In the event, Judge Delgado Hernandez approves the transfer, a case from Judge Delgado Hernandez' docket may be transferred to the undersigned. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/12/2014.(JAM) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (jla) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION Submitting Substitute civil cover sheet re: 1 Complaint, filed by Conjugal Partnership Lugo-Acevedo, Oscar Colon, Conjugal partnership Colon-Perez, Yessica Acevedo filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/28/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Related document(s) 1 ) (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) (Entered: 08/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-4039530.), filed by Yessica Acevedo, Conjugal partnership Colon-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Lugo-Acevedo, Oscar Colon. Service due by 12/12/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Statement Under Penalty of Perjury, # 2 Statement Under Penalty of Perjury, # 3 Category Sheet, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane) (Entered: 08/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.