This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2016 at 06:49:21 (UTC).

LUCKY v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2014 LUCKY filed an Other lawsuit against TRANS UNION, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI (Settlement) and HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-05134

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI (Settlement)

Judge

HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSEPH LUCKY

Defendants

EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC

TRANS UNION, LLC

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.

WELLS FARGO & COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GREGORY J. GORSKI

Attorney at FRANCIS & MAILMAN

100 South Broad Street, 19Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19110

MARK D. MAILMAN

Attorney at FRANCIS & MAILMAN, PC

100 S. Broad St

Phila, PA 19110

Defendant Attorneys

JAMES CHRISTIE

Attorney at CHRISTIE SULLIVAN & YOUNG PC

1880 Jfk Blvd, 10Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

LINDSEY A. KOVENER

Attorney at SCHUCKIT & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

CASEY GREEN

Attorney at SIDKOFF, PINCUS & GREEN, P.C.

1101 Market Street, 2700 Aramark Tower

Philadelphia, PA 19107

JEFFREY J. IMMEL

Attorney at JONES DAY

500 Grant St Suite 4500

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

MOHAMMAD A. GHIASUDDIN

Attorney at KAPLIN STEWART MELOFF REITER & STEIN PC

910 Harvest Drive, P.O Box 3037

Blue Bell, PA 19422-0765

STEVEN J. ADAMS

Attorney at STEVENS & LEE

111 N. 6Th St, Pobx 679

Reading, PA 19603

CHRISTINE M. KOVAN

Attorney at STEVENS & LEE PC

620 Freedom Business Center, Suite 200

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY J. GORSKI on behalf of JOSEPH LUCKY (GORSKI, GREGORY) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN J. ADAMS on behalf of WELLS FARGO & COMPANY with Certificate of Service(ADAMS, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/15/2014)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE M. KOVAN on behalf of WELLS FARGO & COMPANY with Certificate of Service(KOVAN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 09/15/2014)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH LUCKY. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY waiver sent on 9/15/2014, answer due 11/14/2014. (GORSKI, GREGORY) (Entered: 09/15/2014)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH LUCKY. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC waiver sent on 9/11/2014, answer due 11/10/2014. (GORSKI, GREGORY) (Entered: 09/19/2014)

#7

(#7) APPLICATION/PETITION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Lindsey A. Kovener, Esquire (Filing fee $40 receipt number 108426) by TRANS UNION, LLC. (GREEN, CASEY) Modified on 9/23/2014 (ti, ). (Entered: 09/19/2014)

#8

(#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Trans Union Corp. and TransUnion Holding Company, Inc. with Certificate of Service by TRANS UNION, LLC.(GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 09/19/2014)

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF LINDSEY A. KOVENER, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 9/25/14. 9/26/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

#15

(#15) ORDER THAT A FED. R. CIV. P. 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE ON 12/4/2014 AT 3:00 PM, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/12/14. 11/13/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 11/13/2014)

#16

(#16) ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS AS TO DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO & COMPANY, PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41.1(b), ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/12/14. 11/13/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 11/13/2014)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jeffrey J. Immel, Esquire filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. (Filing fee $40 receipt number 111675) .Certificate of Service.(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) Modified on 11/20/2014 (ti, ). (Entered: 11/19/2014)

#18

(#18) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JEFFREY J. IMMEL, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/1/14.12/2/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 12/02/2014)

#19

(#19) JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT by JOSEPH LUCKY.(GORSKI, GREGORY) Modified on 12/4/2014 (afm, ). (Entered: 12/03/2014)

#20

(#20) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II Pretrial Conference held on 12/4/14 (ti, ) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

#21

(#21) ORDER THAT FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 4/3/2015. THE PARTIES SHALL CONTINUE TO PURSUE INFORMAL SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. FURTHER, THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO OCCUR ON OR AFTER 3/4/2015 BUT NO LATER THAN 6/2/2015. SHOULD SETTLEMENT NOT BE REACHED, THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A STATUS UPDATE WITH THE COURT NO LATER THAN 6/2/2015. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/5/14. 12/5/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 12/05/2014)

#22

(#22) ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS AS TO DEFENDANT TRANS UNION, LLC, PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC AND EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. REMAIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/19/14. 12/22/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 12/22/2014)

#23

(#23) ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 5/18/2015 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 3-E, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 2/6/15. 2/9/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 5/18/2015 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 3-E, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 2/6/15. 2/9/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS AS TO DEFENDANT TRANS UNION, LLC, PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC AND EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. REMAIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/19/14. 12/22/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 12/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER THAT FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 4/3/2015. THE PARTIES SHALL CONTINUE TO PURSUE INFORMAL SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. FURTHER, THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO OCCUR ON OR AFTER 3/4/2015 BUT NO LATER THAN 6/2/2015. SHOULD SETTLEMENT NOT BE REACHED, THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A STATUS UPDATE WITH THE COURT NO LATER THAN 6/2/2015. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/5/14. 12/5/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 12/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II Pretrial Conference held on 12/4/14 (ti, ) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT by JOSEPH LUCKY.(GORSKI, GREGORY) Modified on 12/4/2014 (afm, ). (Entered: 12/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JEFFREY J. IMMEL, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/1/14.12/2/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 12/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jeffrey J. Immel, Esquire filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. (Filing fee $40 receipt number 111675) .Certificate of Service.(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) Modified on 11/20/2014 (ti, ). (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS AS TO DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO & COMPANY, PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41.1(b), ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/12/14. 11/13/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 11/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER THAT A FED. R. CIV. P. 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE ON 12/4/2014 AT 3:00 PM, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/12/14. 11/13/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 11/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Equifax Inc. with Certificate of Service by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC.(CHRISTIE, JAMES) (Entered: 11/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TRANS UNION, LLC.(KOVENER, LINDSEY) (Entered: 10/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF LINDSEY A. KOVENER, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 9/25/14. 9/26/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Trans Union Corp. and TransUnion Holding Company, Inc. with Certificate of Service by TRANS UNION, LLC.(GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 09/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPLICATION/PETITION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Lindsey A. Kovener, Esquire (Filing fee $40 receipt number 108426) by TRANS UNION, LLC. (GREEN, CASEY) Modified on 9/23/2014 (ti, ). (Entered: 09/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH LUCKY. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC waiver sent on 9/11/2014, answer due 11/10/2014. (GORSKI, GREGORY) (Entered: 09/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH LUCKY. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY waiver sent on 9/15/2014, answer due 11/14/2014. (GORSKI, GREGORY) (Entered: 09/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE M. KOVAN on behalf of WELLS FARGO & COMPANY with Certificate of Service(KOVAN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 09/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN J. ADAMS on behalf of WELLS FARGO & COMPANY with Certificate of Service(ADAMS, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY J. GORSKI on behalf of JOSEPH LUCKY (GORSKI, GREGORY) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC, WELLS FARGO & COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-10101516.), filed by JOSEPH LUCKY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Case Management Track Form, # 3 Designation Form)(MAILMAN, MARK) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.