This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 07:59:27 (UTC).

Low T Holdings Texas, Inc. v. LTF Inc

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 Low T Holdings Texas, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LTF Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush and Judge Ron Clark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:15-CV-00529

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush

Judge

Judge Ron Clark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Low T Holdings Texas, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

LTF Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

David James Moraine

Attorney at Moraine & Associates, PLLC

60 Village Lane, Suite 110

Colleyville, TX 76034

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Ryan Grant Cole

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons, LLP - Dallas

700 North Pearl Street, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

John Garrett Browning

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Dallas

2100 Ross Ave., Suite 2000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Life Time Fitness, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5326825), filed by Life Time Fitness, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Index of Matters Being Filed, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 List of All Counsel of Record, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Certified Copy of LowT Holdings Texas Inc v LTF, Inc. Docket Sheet.pdf, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Civil Cover Sheet.pdf, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Index of State Court Filings.pdf, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5-A Plaintiff's Original Petition.pdf, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5-B Citation.pdf, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 5-C Rule 11 Agreement.pdf)(Browning, John) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

#2

(#2) ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against LTF Inc, filed by Low T Holdings Texas, Inc..(baf, ) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

#3

(#3) Defendant Life Time Fitness, Inc's Original ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Low T Holdings Texas, Inc. by LTF Inc.(Browning, John) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LTF Inc identifying Corporate Parent Life Time Fitness, Inc. for LTF Inc. (Browning, John) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

#5

(#5) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS - Rule 16 Management Conference set for 10/26/2015 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) - Bush before Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 8/13/2015. (baf, ) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS - Rule 16 Management Conference set for 10/26/2015 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) - Bush before Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 8/13/2015. (baf, ) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LTF Inc identifying Corporate Parent Life Time Fitness, Inc. for LTF Inc. (Browning, John) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Defendant Life Time Fitness, Inc's Original ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Low T Holdings Texas, Inc. by LTF Inc.(Browning, John) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against LTF Inc, filed by Low T Holdings Texas, Inc..(baf, ) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Life Time Fitness, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5326825), filed by Life Time Fitness, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Index of Matters Being Filed, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 List of All Counsel of Record, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Certified Copy of LowT Holdings Texas Inc v LTF, Inc. Docket Sheet.pdf, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Civil Cover Sheet.pdf, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Index of State Court Filings.pdf, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5-A Plaintiff's Original Petition.pdf, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5-B Citation.pdf, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 5-C Rule 11 Agreement.pdf)(Browning, John) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David James Moraine