This case was last updated from PACER on 06/03/2016 at 20:06:20 (UTC).

Loughlin v. Amerisave Mortgage Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2014 Loughlin filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Amerisave Mortgage Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Leigh Martin May and Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-03497

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Leigh Martin May

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kenneth Adams

Sean Loughlin

Antonio Gonzalez

Defendants

Amerisave Mortgage Corporation

Novo Appraisal Management Corporation

Patrick Markert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

G. Franklin Lemond, Jr.

Attorney at Webb, Klase & Lemond, LLC

Suite 480, 1900 The Exchange, Se

Atlanta, GA 30339

Edward Adam Webb

Attorney at Webb, Klase & Lemond, LLC

Suite 480, 1900 The Exchange, Se

Atlanta, GA 30339

Defendant Attorneys

Brian M. Forbes

Attorney at K & L Gates, LLP-MA

One Lincoln Street

Boston, MA 02111-2950

Christopher Knox Withers

Attorney at Arnall Golden & Gregory - Atlanta

Suite 2100, 171 17Th Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363-1031

Matthew N. Lowe

Attorney at K & L Gates, LLP-MA

One Lincoln Street

Boston, MA 02111-2950

R. Bruce Allensworth

Attorney at Kirkpatrick & Lockhart Nicholson Graham LLP-MA

Robert Leonard Rothman

Attorney at Arnall Golden & Gregory - Atlanta

Suite 2100, 171 17Th Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363-1031

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#44

#45

#46

#47

#49

#50

#51

#52

#53

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Answer, File Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, and Serve Initial Disclosures by Amerisave Mortgage Corporation, Patrick Markert, Novo Appraisal Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Withers, Christopher) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) STIPULATION of Dismissal of RESPA Section 8(b) Claim as to Patrick Markert by Patrick Markert. (Forbes, Brian) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 29 Amended Complaint, by Amerisave Mortgage Corporation, Patrick Markert, Novo Appraisal Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Withers, Christopher) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) ORDER ADOPTING the Magistrate's R&R 45 as the Order of this Court. Defendant Markert's Motion to Dismiss 27 is DENIED and Defendants Amerisave Mortgage Corp. and Novo Appraisal Management Corps.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss 36 is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to STRIKE Dkt. No. 48 from the Record. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/24/15. (ddm) (Entered: 08/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) RESPONSE re 47 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Amerisave Mortgage Corporation, Patrick Markert, Novo Appraisal Management Corporation. (Forbes, Brian) (Entered: 08/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) OBJECTIONS to 45 Report and Recommendation filed by Antonio Gonzalez. (Webb, Edward) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) ORDER for Service of 45 Report and Recommendation,,, by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 47/24/15. (ddm) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Defendant Patrick Markerts 27 Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process be DENIED. Plaintiffs 31 Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery and Plaintiffs 32 Motion for Service by Publication are DEEMED MOOT. This court also RECOMMENDS that Defendants Amerisave Mortgage Corporation and Novo Appraisal Management Corporations 36 Partial Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED. Additionally, Defendants Amerisave Mortgage Corporation and Novo Appraisal Management Corporations request for Oral Argument imbedded within the 36 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as the briefing is sufficient for the Court to analyze the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 7/24/15. (ddm) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) RESPONSE re 43 Notice (Other), Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Antonio Gonzalez, Sean Loughlin. (Webb, Edward) (Entered: 03/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) NOTICE by Amerisave Mortgage Corporation, Novo Appraisal Management Corporation re 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM RESPA Section 8(b) Claims MOTION for Oral Argument - Notice of Supplemental Authority re Clements v. LSI Title Agency Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Clements Decision)(Forbes, Brian) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION for Admission of R. Bruce Allensworth Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5503758) with Brief In Support by Amerisave Mortgage Corporation, Novo Appraisal Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rothman, Robert) (Entered: 11/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPLICATION for Admission of Brian M. Forbes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5503669) with Brief In Support by Amerisave Mortgage Corporation, Novo Appraisal Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rothman, Robert) (Entered: 11/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marvin H. Shoob for all further proceedings. Judge Orinda D. Evans no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:14-cv-3497-MHS-LTW. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 11/07/14. (fap) (Entered: 11/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to file an amended complaint up through and including November 7, 2014. (See Order or Other Specifics). Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 11/10/14. (fap) (Entered: 11/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by Sean Loughlin, Antonio Gonzalez.(Webb, Edward) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Amerisave Mortgage Corporation, Novo Appraisal Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Withers, Christopher) (Entered: 11/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Leonard Rothman on behalf of Amerisave Mortgage Corporation, Novo Appraisal Management Corporation (Rothman, Robert) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Knox Withers on behalf of Amerisave Mortgage Corporation, Novo Appraisal Management Corporation (Withers, Christopher) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amerisave Mortgage Corporation, Novo Appraisal Management Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Novo Appraisal Management LLC for Novo Appraisal Management Corporation; Corporate Parent Amerisave, LLC for Amerisave Mortgage Corporation. (Withers, Christopher) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT, filed by Novo Appraisal Management Corporation, Amerisave Mortgage Corporation. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-5475376). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AmeriSave Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George Franklin Lemond Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer E. Adam Webb