This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 17:19:21 (UTC).

Lorillard Tobacco Company et al v. Tyco Integrated Security, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2015 Lorillard Tobacco Company filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Tyco Integrated Security, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Manish S. Shah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-01684

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Manish S. Shah

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Factory Mutual Insurance Company

Lorillard Tobacco Company

Defendants

Amed Villa

Tyco Integrated Security, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Anthony Smith

Attorney at Senak Keegan Gleason Smith & Michaud, Ltd.

621 S. Plymouth Court, Suite 100

Chicago, IL 60605

Thomas Bernard Keegan

Attorney at Senak Keegan Gleason Smth & Michaud, Ltd.

621 S. Plymouth Court, Suite 100

Chicago, IL 60605

Mark Nicholas Senak

Attorney at Senak Keegan Gleason Smith & Michaud, Ltd.

621 S. Plymouth Court, Suite 100

Chicago, IL 60605

Defendant Attorneys

Jason R. Scott

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.l.p.

2555 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108

Marcelline DeFalco

Attorney at Mulherin, Rehfeldt & Varchetto, P.C.

211 South Wheaton Avenue, Suite 200

Wheaton, IL 60187

Kerensa Cassis

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon Llp

2555 Grand Blvd

Kansas City, MO 64108

Riley C. Mendoza

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

111 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 5100

Chicago, IL 60606

Katherine Anne Neville

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

11 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (DeFalco, Marcelline) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tyco Integrated Security, LLC by Marcelline DeFalco (DeFalco, Marcelline) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

#4

(#4) JURY Demand (DeFalco, Marcelline) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

#5

(#5) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tyco Integrated Security, LLC (DeFalco, Marcelline) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lorillard Tobacco Company by Thomas Anthony Smith (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 02/26/2015)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lorillard Tobacco Company by Mark Nicholas Senak (Senak, Mark) (Entered: 02/26/2015)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lorillard Tobacco Company by Thomas Bernard Keegan (Keegan, Thomas) (Entered: 02/26/2015)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is hereby set before Judge Shah on 4/1/15 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/JudgeInfo.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

#25

(#25) WITHDRAWING Katherine A. Neville as counsel for Defendant Tyco Integrated Security, LLC and substituting Riley C. Mendoza as counsel of record (Mendoza, Riley) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

#26

(#26) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10694608. (Cassis, Kerensa) (Entered: 05/29/2015)

#27

(#27) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. The court will issue a ruling on the pending Motion to Dismiss 12 via CM/ECF. Plaintiff's counsel advises the court that Plaintiff will be moving for default judgment against Defendant Amed Villa. Counsel for the parties advise the court they anticipate discovery disputes and multiple expert witnesses in this matter. No later than 6/16/15, the parties shall file a joint status report with a proposed discovery schedule. The parties may submit competing proposed discovery schedules in the status report if they are unable to agree. An order will issue via CM/ECF setting out a discovery schedule as well as a further status hearing date. The Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 26 is granted. Kerensa Cassis may file an appearance on behalf of Tyco Integrated Security and is added as counsel of record. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#28

(#28) MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/2/2015: Tyco Integrated Security, LLC's motion to dismiss 12 is denied. [For further detail see attached order.] Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#29

(#29) MOTION by counsel for Defendant Tyco Integrated Security, LLC to withdraw as attorney (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeFalco, Marcelline) (Entered: 06/04/2015)

#30

(#30) NOTICE of Motion by Marcelline DeFalco for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 29 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/17/2015 at 09:45 AM. (DeFalco, Marcelline) (Entered: 06/04/2015)

#31

(#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The Motion to Withdraw as Counsel 29 is granted. Marcelline DeFalco may withdraw her appearance on behalf of Defendant Tyco Integrated Security, LLC and is terminated as counsel of record. Motion hearing previously set for 6/17/15 at 9:45 a.m. is hereby stricken and no appearance is necessary. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 06/04/2015)

#32

(#32) MOTION by Plaintiffs Factory Mutual Insurance Company, Lorillard Tobacco Company for default judgment as to Defendant Amed Villa (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

#33

(#33) NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Anthony Smith for presentment of motion for default judgment 32 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 7/9/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Anthony Smith for presentment of motion for default judgment 32 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 7/9/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MOTION by Plaintiffs Factory Mutual Insurance Company, Lorillard Tobacco Company for default judgment as to Defendant Amed Villa (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The Motion to Withdraw as Counsel 29 is granted. Marcelline DeFalco may withdraw her appearance on behalf of Defendant Tyco Integrated Security, LLC and is terminated as counsel of record. Motion hearing previously set for 6/17/15 at 9:45 a.m. is hereby stricken and no appearance is necessary. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 06/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE of Motion by Marcelline DeFalco for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 29 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/17/2015 at 09:45 AM. (DeFalco, Marcelline) (Entered: 06/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MOTION by counsel for Defendant Tyco Integrated Security, LLC to withdraw as attorney (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeFalco, Marcelline) (Entered: 06/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/2/2015: Tyco Integrated Security, LLC's motion to dismiss 12 is denied. [For further detail see attached order.] Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. The court will issue a ruling on the pending Motion to Dismiss 12 via CM/ECF. Plaintiff's counsel advises the court that Plaintiff will be moving for default judgment against Defendant Amed Villa. Counsel for the parties advise the court they anticipate discovery disputes and multiple expert witnesses in this matter. No later than 6/16/15, the parties shall file a joint status report with a proposed discovery schedule. The parties may submit competing proposed discovery schedules in the status report if they are unable to agree. An order will issue via CM/ECF setting out a discovery schedule as well as a further status hearing date. The Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 26 is granted. Kerensa Cassis may file an appearance on behalf of Tyco Integrated Security and is added as counsel of record. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10694608. (Cassis, Kerensa) (Entered: 05/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) WITHDRAWING Katherine A. Neville as counsel for Defendant Tyco Integrated Security, LLC and substituting Riley C. Mendoza as counsel of record (Mendoza, Riley) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tyco Integrated Security, LLC by Riley C. Mendoza (Mendoza, Riley) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Factory Mutual Insurance Company (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is hereby set before Judge Shah on 4/1/15 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/JudgeInfo.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lorillard Tobacco Company by Thomas Bernard Keegan (Keegan, Thomas) (Entered: 02/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lorillard Tobacco Company by Mark Nicholas Senak (Senak, Mark) (Entered: 02/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lorillard Tobacco Company by Thomas Anthony Smith (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 02/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tyco Integrated Security, LLC (DeFalco, Marcelline) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) JURY Demand (DeFalco, Marcelline) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tyco Integrated Security, LLC by Marcelline DeFalco (DeFalco, Marcelline) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (DeFalco, Marcelline) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, case number (15 L 687) filed by Tyco Integrated Security, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10380477. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(DeFalco, Marcelline) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less