This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2016 at 23:02:35 (UTC).

Lindsey Webb v. Carter's, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/06/2008 Lindsey Webb filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Carter's, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle and Judge Gary A. Feess. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:08-CV-07367

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle

Judge

Judge Gary A. Feess

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anastasia Booth

Jayme Sanchez

Lindsey Webb

Amy Muir

Kina Abrams

Nancy Muir

Defendants

Pacific Concept Industries Limited

Pacific Concept Industries (USA) LLC

Carter's, Inc.

Avery Dennison, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan M Mansfield

Attorney at The Consumer Law Group

10200 Willow Creek Road Suite 160

San Diego, CA 92131

Robert A Jigarjian

Attorney at Jigarjian Law Office

101 Lucas Valley Road Suite 120

San Rafael, CA 94903

Edith M Kallas

Attorney at Whatley Drake and Kallas LLC

380 Madison Avenue 23Rd Floor

New York, NY 10017

Thomas D Mauriello

Attorney at Mauriello Law Firm APC

1181 Puerta Del Sol Suite 120

San Clemente, CA 92673

John G Emerson

Attorney at Emerson Poynter LLP

830 Apollo Lane

Houston, TX 77058

Christopher D Jennings

Attorney at Emerson Poynter LLP

500 President Clinton Avenue Suite 305

Little Rock, AR 72201

Gina M Dougherty

Attorney at Emerson Poynter LLP

500 President Clinton Avenue Suite 305

Little Rock, AR 72201

J Gerard Stranch, IV

Attorney at Branstetter Stranch & Jennings PLLC

227 Second Avenue North 4Th Floor

Nashville, TN 37201-1631

Jack T Patterson, II

Attorney at Emerson Poynter LLP

500 President Clinton Avenue Suite 305

Little Rock, AR 72201

James G Stranch, III

Attorney at Branstetter Stranch & Jennings PLLC

227 2Nd Avenue North 4Th Floor

Nashville, TN 37201-1631

Michael G Stewart

Attorney at Branstetter Stranch & Jennings PLLC

227 Second Avenue North 4Th Floor

Nashville, TN 37201

Scott E Poynter

Attorney at Emerson Poynter LLP

500 President Clinton Avenue Suite 305

Little Rock, AR 72201

Thomas J Butler

Attorney at Whatley Drake and Kallas

2001 Park Place North Suite 1000

Birmingham, AL 35203

William T Crowder

Attorney at Emerson Poynter LLP

500 President Clinton Avenue Suite 305

Little Rock, AR 72201

Defendant Attorneys

David S Osterman

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

902 Carnegie Center Boulevard Suite 100

Princeton, NJ 08540-6530

Anita R Hotchkiss

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

902 Carnegie Center Suite 100

Princeton, NJ 08540

Steven S Vahidi

Attorney at Yukevich Calfo and Cavanaugh

355 South Grand Avenue 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Beth O'Neal Arnese

Attorney at Drinker Biddle and Reath

50 Fremont Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Steven M Selna

Attorney at Drinker Biddle & Reath

50 Fremont St, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105-2230

Stella Fey Epling

Attorney at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

50 Fremont Street 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2235

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#312

#313

#314

#315

#316

#317

#319

#320

310 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#320) STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii); AND ORDER by Judge Gary A. Feess,, (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bp) (Entered: 12/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#319) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case 318 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. The stipulation and order are to be submitted as separate documents. The stipulation should be filed as the main document and the proposed order submitted as an attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp) (Entered: 12/20/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#318) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiffs Kina Abrams, Anastasia Booth, Nancy Muir, Jayme Sanchez, Lindsey Webb. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Mansfield, Alan) (Entered: 12/20/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#317) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Gary A. Feess. The parties are ordered to file a Stipulation and Proposed Order Dismissing the action on or before December 21, 2012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/17/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#316) STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement filed by Defendant Avery Dennison, Inc. (Epling, Stella) (Entered: 11/26/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#315) NOTICE of Change of address by Robert A Jigarjian attorney for Plaintiffs Kina Abrams, Anastasia Booth, Amy Muir, Nancy Muir, Jayme Sanchez, Lindsey Webb. Changing attorneys address to 101 Lucas Valley Road Suite 120 San Rafael, CA 94903. Filed by Plaintiffs Kina Abrams, Anastasia Booth, Amy Muir, Nancy Muir, Jayme Sanchez, Lindsey Webb. (Jigarjian, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#314) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Gary A. Feess. The parties are ordered to file a Stipulation and Proposed Order Dismissing the action on or before November 26, 2012 or, in the alternative a Joint Status Report. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/16/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#313) STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement (Joint) filed by Plaintiffs Kina Abrams, Anastasia Booth, Amy Muir, Nancy Muir, Jayme Sanchez, Lindsey Webb. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Mansfield, Alan) (Entered: 10/22/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#312) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Gary A. Feess: The parties are ordered to file a Stipulation and Proposed Order Dismissing the action on or before October 22, 2012 or, in the alternative a Joint Status Report THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/25/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#311) JOINT STATUS REPORT of CASE filed by Defendant Carter's, Inc.. (Kizirian, Eric) (Entered: 09/20/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
300 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Thomas J. Butler for Plaintiff Lindsey Webb. (et) (Entered: 11/10/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Scott E Poynter for Plaintiff Lindsey Webb. (et) (Entered: 11/10/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney John G Emerson for Plaintiff Lindsey Webb. (et) (Entered: 11/10/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Joe R Whatley, Jr for Plaintiff Lindsey Webb. (et) (Entered: 11/10/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney James G Stranch, III for Plaintiff Lindsey Webb. (et) (Entered: 11/10/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney J Gerard Stranch, IV for Plaintiff Lindsey Webb. (et) (Entered: 11/10/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Edith M Kallas for Plaintiff Lindsey Webb. (et) (Entered: 11/10/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Christopher D. Jennings for Plaintiff Lindsey Webb. (et) (Entered: 11/10/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATION AS TO Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lindsey Webb. (et) (ds). (Entered: 11/10/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Defendant Carter's, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Lindsey Webb. (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2008: # 1 Notice of Assignment, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Summons) (ds). (Entered: 11/10/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVERY DENNISON CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR is a litigant

Latest cases where Carter is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Scott Osterman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Michael Selna