This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2016 at 05:02:22 (UTC).

Life360, Inc. v. Advanced Ground Information Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2015 Life360, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Advanced Ground Information Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Hon. Beth Labson Freeman and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-00151

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Beth Labson Freeman

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Life360, Inc.

Defendant

Advanced Ground Information Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sara Petersen Graves

Jaideep Venkatesan

Defendant Attorneys

Loren Kieve

Michael Norman Zachary

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2015. Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2015 01:30 PM. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

#4

(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Petersen Graves (Graves, Sara) (Filed on 1/15/2015) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Life360, Inc. identifying other affiliate ADT Holdings, Inc. (Venkatesan, Jaideep) (Filed on 1/15/2015) Modified on 1/16/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/15/2015)

#7

(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this entry) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

#8

(#8) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FALSE MARKING, TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACT, INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH ECONOMIC ADVANTAGE, AND UNFAIR COMPETITION] against Advanced Ground Information Systems, Inc.. Filed by Life360, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons on First Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibits 1-5, # 3 Exhibit 6 (Part 1), # 4 Exhibit 6 (Part 2), # 5 Exhibits 7-9)(Venkatesan, Jaideep) (Filed on 1/26/2015) Modified on 6/16/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/16/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/26/2015)

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Life360, Inc... (Venkatesan, Jaideep) (Filed on 2/2/2015) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

#48

(#48) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Life360, Inc.. (Venkatesan, Jaideep) (Filed on 8/20/2015) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

#49

(#49) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference reset for 10/15/2015 at 11:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

#50

(#50) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Resetting Case Management Conference filed by Life360, Inc.. (Venkatesan, Jaideep) (Filed on 9/10/2015) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

#51

(#51) STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 50 ). Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

#52

(#52) ORDER DENYING 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; AND DENYING 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/21/2015. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

#53

(#53) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Norman Zachary (Zachary, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2015) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

#54

(#54) ANSWER to Amended Complaint byAdvanced Ground Information Systems, Inc.. (Zachary, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2015) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

#55

(#55) Certificate of Interested Entities by Advanced Ground Information Systems, Inc. (Zachary, Michael) (Filed on 10/8/2015) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#56

(#56) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Of Dismissal filed by Life360, Inc.. (Venkatesan, Jaideep) (Filed on 11/16/2015) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Of Dismissal filed by Life360, Inc.. (Venkatesan, Jaideep) (Filed on 11/16/2015) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) Certificate of Interested Entities by Advanced Ground Information Systems, Inc. (Zachary, Michael) (Filed on 10/8/2015) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) ANSWER to Amended Complaint byAdvanced Ground Information Systems, Inc.. (Zachary, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2015) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Norman Zachary (Zachary, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2015) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) ORDER DENYING 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; AND DENYING 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/21/2015. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 50 ). Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Resetting Case Management Conference filed by Life360, Inc.. (Venkatesan, Jaideep) (Filed on 9/10/2015) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference reset for 10/15/2015 at 11:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Life360, Inc.. (Venkatesan, Jaideep) (Filed on 8/20/2015) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) Supplemental Brief re: ( 40 ) Of Life360 Re Defendant Advanced Ground Information Systems, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss filed byLife360, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Jaideep Venkatesan In Support Of Supplemental Brief Of Life360 Re AGIS' Motion To Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan, # 11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan, # 12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan, # 13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan, # 14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan, # 15 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan, # 16 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan, # 17 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan, # 18 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan, # 19 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan, # 20 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Jaideep Venkatesan)(Venkatesan, Jaideep) (Filed on 6/30/2015) Modified text to add linkage on 6/30/2015 (srmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/30/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Life360, Inc... (Venkatesan, Jaideep) (Filed on 2/2/2015) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FALSE MARKING, TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACT, INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH ECONOMIC ADVANTAGE, AND UNFAIR COMPETITION] against Advanced Ground Information Systems, Inc.. Filed by Life360, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons on First Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibits 1-5, # 3 Exhibit 6 (Part 1), # 4 Exhibit 6 (Part 2), # 5 Exhibits 7-9)(Venkatesan, Jaideep) (Filed on 1/26/2015) Modified on 6/16/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/16/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/26/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this entry) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Life360, Inc. identifying other affiliate ADT Holdings, Inc. (Venkatesan, Jaideep) (Filed on 1/15/2015) Modified on 1/16/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/15/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Petersen Graves (Graves, Sara) (Filed on 1/15/2015) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2015. Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2015 01:30 PM. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for False Marking, Tortious Interference With Contract, Intentional Interference With Economic Advantage, and Unfair Competition against Advanced Ground Information Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9201340.). Filed byLife360, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5 to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Complaint [Part 1], # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Complaint [Part 2], # 4 Exhibit Exhibits 7-9 to Complaint, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Venkatesan, Jaideep) (Filed on 1/12/2015) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less