This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2016 at 09:39:51 (UTC).

Li v. KaloBios Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2015 Li filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against KaloBios Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins and Hon. Edward J. Davila. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-05841

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins

Judge

Hon. Edward J. Davila

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHRISTOPHER MASSAD

Kang Li

Petitioners

Abuhena M. Saifulislam

Javier Marte

Ernso Auguste

Bhaskar R. Gudlavenkatasiva

David Borges

Jing-Wei Wang

Zeke Ingram

Yi Wang

Ming Wang

Kaniz Fatema

Defendants

Martin Shkreli

Herb C. Cross

KaloBios Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Vincent Prongay

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Robert S. Green

Attorney at Green & Noblin, P.C.

2200 Larkspur Landing Circle, Suite 101

Larkspur, CA 94939

Lesley F Portnoy

Attorney at Glancy Prongay and Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Lionel Z. Glancy

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2722

Matthew Laurence Tuccillo

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

600 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Jennifer Pafiti

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

468 North Camden Drive

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Avraham Noam Wagner

Attorney at The Wagner Firm

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Adam Christopher McCall

Attorney at LEVI & KORSINSKY, LLP

445 S. Figueroa St., 31St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorney

J. Christopher Mitchell

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

525 University Avenue, 4Th Floor

Palo Alto, CA 94301

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT [Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws] against Herb C. Cross, KaloBios Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Martin Shkreli ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10078972.). Filed byKang Li. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Prongay, Robert) (Filed on 12/18/2015) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Prongay, Robert) (Filed on 12/18/2015) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Kang Li re 1 Complaint, (Prongay, Robert) (Filed on 12/18/2015) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

#4

(#4) Case assigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila and Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/28/2016. Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Herb C. Cross, KaloBios Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Martin Shkreli. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Without Prejudice by Kang Li (Prongay, Robert) (Filed on 12/21/2015) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING 7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Kang Li as to Defendant Herb C. Cross. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/22/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by KaloBios Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Suggestion of Bankruptcy (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mitchell, J.) (Filed on 1/8/2016) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

#34

(#34) MOTION to Continue HEARING DATE for 22 MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION No. 15-cv-05992-CRB, APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL AND TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES filed by Kaniz Fatema, Bhaskar R. Gudlavenkatasiva, Zeke Ingram, Abuhena M. Saifulislam. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/30/2016) Modified on 3/31/2016,(counsel failed to select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/31/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/30/2016)

#33

(#33) ORDER Granting (32 in case 5:15-cv-05841-EJD) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; Granting (18 in case 5:15-cv-06331-EJD) Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Matthew Tuccillo for Kaniz Fatema, Zeke Ingram, Bhaskar R. Gudlavenkatasiva, Abuhena M. Saifulislam and Austin Isensee in 5:15-cv-05841-EJD; 5:15-cv-06331-EJD. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/30/2016.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016) (Entered: 03/30/2016)

#32

(#32) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10327084.) filed by Kaniz Fatema, Bhaskar R. Gudlavenkatasiva, Zeke Ingram, Abuhena M. Saifulislam. (Tuccillo, Matthew) (Filed on 3/29/2016) (Entered: 03/29/2016)

#31

(#31) RELATED CASE ORDER. 15-cv-06331-WHO Isensee v. KaloBios Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and 5:15-cv-05841-EJD Li v. KaloBios Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/3/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016) (Entered: 03/03/2016)

#30

(#30) Statement of Non-Opposition TO MOTION OF KANIZ FATEMA, ZEKE INGRAM, BHASKAR R. GUDLAVENKATASIVA, AND ABUHENA M. SAIFULISLAM FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL filed byKaniz Fatema, Bhaskar R. Gudlavenkatasiva, Zeke Ingram, Abuhena M. Saifulislam. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/1/2016) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

#29

(#29) Statement of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed byJavier Marte, Jing-Wei Wang, Ming Wang, Yi Wang. (Prongay, Robert) (Filed on 3/1/2016) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

#28

(#28) Statement of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed byDavid Borges. (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 3/1/2016) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

#27

(#27) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel (Green, Robert) (Filed on 2/29/2016) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#26

(#26) Statement of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed byErnso Auguste. (Wagner, Avraham) (Filed on 2/29/2016) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MOTION to Continue HEARING DATE for 22 MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION No. 15-cv-05992-CRB, APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL AND TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES filed by Kaniz Fatema, Bhaskar R. Gudlavenkatasiva, Zeke Ingram, Abuhena M. Saifulislam. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/30/2016) Modified on 3/31/2016,(counsel failed to select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/31/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER Granting (32 in case 5:15-cv-05841-EJD) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; Granting (18 in case 5:15-cv-06331-EJD) Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Matthew Tuccillo for Kaniz Fatema, Zeke Ingram, Bhaskar R. Gudlavenkatasiva, Abuhena M. Saifulislam and Austin Isensee in 5:15-cv-05841-EJD; 5:15-cv-06331-EJD. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/30/2016.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016) (Entered: 03/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10327084.) filed by Kaniz Fatema, Bhaskar R. Gudlavenkatasiva, Zeke Ingram, Abuhena M. Saifulislam. (Tuccillo, Matthew) (Filed on 3/29/2016) (Entered: 03/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) RELATED CASE ORDER. 15-cv-06331-WHO Isensee v. KaloBios Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and 5:15-cv-05841-EJD Li v. KaloBios Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/3/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016) (Entered: 03/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Statement of Non-Opposition TO MOTION OF KANIZ FATEMA, ZEKE INGRAM, BHASKAR R. GUDLAVENKATASIVA, AND ABUHENA M. SAIFULISLAM FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL filed byKaniz Fatema, Bhaskar R. Gudlavenkatasiva, Zeke Ingram, Abuhena M. Saifulislam. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/1/2016) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Statement of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed byJavier Marte, Jing-Wei Wang, Ming Wang, Yi Wang. (Prongay, Robert) (Filed on 3/1/2016) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Statement of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed byDavid Borges. (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 3/1/2016) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel (Green, Robert) (Filed on 2/29/2016) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Statement of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed byErnso Auguste. (Wagner, Avraham) (Filed on 2/29/2016) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Certificate of Interested Entities by Kaniz Fatema, Bhaskar R. Gudlavenkatasiva, Zeke Ingram, Abuhena M. Saifulislam re 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/16/2016) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases No. 15-cv-05992-CRB filed by Kang Li. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 3/1/2016. Replies due by 3/8/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Green, Robert) (Filed on 2/16/2016) Modified on 3/31/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by KaloBios Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Suggestion of Bankruptcy (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mitchell, J.) (Filed on 1/8/2016) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER GRANTING 7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Kang Li as to Defendant Herb C. Cross. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/22/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Without Prejudice by Kang Li (Prongay, Robert) (Filed on 12/21/2015) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Herb C. Cross, KaloBios Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Martin Shkreli. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/28/2016. Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case assigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila and Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Kang Li re 1 Complaint, (Prongay, Robert) (Filed on 12/18/2015) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Prongay, Robert) (Filed on 12/18/2015) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT [Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws] against Herb C. Cross, KaloBios Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Martin Shkreli ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10078972.). Filed byKang Li. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Prongay, Robert) (Filed on 12/18/2015) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less