This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 15:17:29 (UTC).

Lewis v. Jackson et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2014 Lewis filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Jackson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes and Judge John W. deGravelles. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-00468

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes

Judge

Judge John W. deGravelles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Davidson Lewis

Angola, LA 70712

Defendants

Trin Carey

Quintillis K. Lawrence

Bonnie Jackson

Doug Welborn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

David Glen Sanders

Attorney at Louisiana Department of Justice - B.R.

P.O. Box 94005, 1885 North Third Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70804-9005

Jeffrey K. Cody

Attorney at Shows, Cali, Berthelot & Walsh, LLP

628 St. Louis Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Trin Carey, Bonnie Jackson, Quintillis K. Lawrence, Doug Welborn, filed by Davidson Lewis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Summons)(LLH) (Main Document 1 and exhibits replaced on 7/30/2014) (LLH). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/14/2014) (LLH). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/14/2014) (LLH). (Entered: 07/28/2014)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Davidson Lewis. (LLH) (Entered: 07/28/2014)

#3

(#3) Entered in error by Case Administrator. There is no docket entry Modified on 7/30/2014 (LLH). (Entered: 07/28/2014)

#4

(#4) Entered in error by Case Administrator. There is no docket entry. Modified on 7/30/2014 (LLH). (Entered: 07/28/2014)

#5

(#5) This case is reassigned to Judge John W. deGravelles. Judge James J. Brady no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 08/13/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(NLT ADI, ) (Entered: 08/13/2014)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. It is ordered that the plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $3.22 in accordance with 28 USC 1915. A copy of this order shall be sent to the plaintiff and to Centralized Inmate Banking. Filing Fee due by 9/8/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/14/2014. (JDL) (Entered: 08/14/2014)

#7

(#7) ORDER: Plaintiff was ordered to pay an initial partial filing fee. Partial filing fee was paid on 9/11/2014. CIB shall comply with the 8/14/2014 order until the balance of the filing fee, $346.78, is paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/15/2014. (JDL) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/15/2014 to add routing information) (JDL). (Entered: 09/15/2014)

#8

(#8) ORDER: USM is to serve the defendants wherever found. Within 90 days of the date of this order, the parties shall file cross motions for summary judgment as provided under Rule 56, Fed.R.Civ.P. All discovery requests and responses shall be filed in the record of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/14/2015. (SMG) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Trin Carey, Bonnie Jackson, Quintillis K. Lawrence, Doug Welborn. (Summons submitted to USM for service.) (Attachments: # 1 Lawrence, # 2 Carey, # 3 Welborn)(SMG) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

#18

(#18) REQUEST to Produce Documents by Davidson Lewis.(LLH) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

#19

(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Doug Welborn served on 6/10/2015, answer due 7/1/2015. SIGNED FOR BY DONNELL BOURGOYRE - EBR CLERK OF COURTS OFFICE. (US Marshal, ) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

#20

(#20) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to RULE 12(b)(6) by Doug Welborn. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Cody, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/6/2015 to edit text (LLH). (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#21

(#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Trin Carey served on 6/10/2015, answer due 7/1/2015; Quintillis K. Lawrence served on 7/7/2015, answer due 7/28/2015. ACCEPTED BY DONNELL BOURGOYN. (US Marshal, ) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

#22

(#22) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Trin Carey. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading;)(Sanders, David) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

#23

(#23) NOTICE: Pursuant to General Order 2016-02, this case is reassigned from Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger to Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/4/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(NLT) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

#24

(#24) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 15 , 20 and 22 MOTION to Dismiss. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that the Court decline the exercise of supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiff's state law claims and that the defendants' Motions to Dismiss (R. Docs. 15, 20 and 22) be granted, dismissing the plaintiff's federal claims asserted against the defendants, with prejudice and that this action be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 3/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/1/2016. (LLH) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

#25

(#25) OPINION Adopting 24 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court declines the exercise of supplemental jurisdiction over the Plaintiff's state law claims and the 15 20 22 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are granted, dismissing the plaintiff's federal claims asserted against the defendants, with prejudice, and that this action is dismissed. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 03/21/2016. (NLT) (Entered: 03/21/2016)

#26

(#26) JUDGMENT: The Court declines the exercise of supplemental jurisdiction over the Plaintiff's state law claims and the 15 20 22 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are granted, dismissing the plaintiff's federal claims asserted against the defendants, with prejudice, and this action is dismissed. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 03/21/2016. (NLT) (Entered: 03/21/2016)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) JUDGMENT: The Court declines the exercise of supplemental jurisdiction over the Plaintiff's state law claims and the 15 20 22 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are granted, dismissing the plaintiff's federal claims asserted against the defendants, with prejudice, and this action is dismissed. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 03/21/2016. (NLT) (Entered: 03/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) OPINION Adopting 24 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court declines the exercise of supplemental jurisdiction over the Plaintiff's state law claims and the 15 20 22 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are granted, dismissing the plaintiff's federal claims asserted against the defendants, with prejudice, and that this action is dismissed. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 03/21/2016. (NLT) (Entered: 03/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 15 , 20 and 22 MOTION to Dismiss. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that the Court decline the exercise of supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiff's state law claims and that the defendants' Motions to Dismiss (R. Docs. 15, 20 and 22) be granted, dismissing the plaintiff's federal claims asserted against the defendants, with prejudice and that this action be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 3/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/1/2016. (LLH) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE: Pursuant to General Order 2016-02, this case is reassigned from Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger to Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/4/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(NLT) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Trin Carey. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading;)(Sanders, David) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Trin Carey served on 6/10/2015, answer due 7/1/2015; Quintillis K. Lawrence served on 7/7/2015, answer due 7/28/2015. ACCEPTED BY DONNELL BOURGOYN. (US Marshal, ) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to RULE 12(b)(6) by Doug Welborn. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Cody, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/6/2015 to edit text (LLH). (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Doug Welborn served on 6/10/2015, answer due 7/1/2015. SIGNED FOR BY DONNELL BOURGOYRE - EBR CLERK OF COURTS OFFICE. (US Marshal, ) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) REQUEST to Produce Documents by Davidson Lewis.(LLH) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Objection to 15 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3)(BCL) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Trin Carey, Bonnie Jackson, Quintillis K. Lawrence, Doug Welborn filed by Davidson Lewis.(SMG) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Trin Carey, Bonnie Jackson, Quintillis K. Lawrence, Doug Welborn. (Summons submitted to USM for service.) (Attachments: # 1 Lawrence, # 2 Carey, # 3 Welborn)(SMG) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: USM is to serve the defendants wherever found. Within 90 days of the date of this order, the parties shall file cross motions for summary judgment as provided under Rule 56, Fed.R.Civ.P. All discovery requests and responses shall be filed in the record of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/14/2015. (SMG) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Plaintiff was ordered to pay an initial partial filing fee. Partial filing fee was paid on 9/11/2014. CIB shall comply with the 8/14/2014 order until the balance of the filing fee, $346.78, is paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/15/2014. (JDL) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/15/2014 to add routing information) (JDL). (Entered: 09/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. It is ordered that the plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $3.22 in accordance with 28 USC 1915. A copy of this order shall be sent to the plaintiff and to Centralized Inmate Banking. Filing Fee due by 9/8/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/14/2014. (JDL) (Entered: 08/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) This case is reassigned to Judge John W. deGravelles. Judge James J. Brady no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 08/13/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(NLT ADI, ) (Entered: 08/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Entered in error by Case Administrator. There is no docket entry. Modified on 7/30/2014 (LLH). (Entered: 07/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entered in error by Case Administrator. There is no docket entry Modified on 7/30/2014 (LLH). (Entered: 07/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Davidson Lewis. (LLH) (Entered: 07/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Trin Carey, Bonnie Jackson, Quintillis K. Lawrence, Doug Welborn, filed by Davidson Lewis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Summons)(LLH) (Main Document 1 and exhibits replaced on 7/30/2014) (LLH). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/14/2014) (LLH). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/14/2014) (LLH). (Entered: 07/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Glen Sanders