This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 09:11:50 (UTC).

Lewis et al v. Brazos Rock, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2015 Lewis filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Brazos Rock, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge David A. Ezra and Judge David B. Fannin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:15-CV-00013

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge David A. Ezra

Referral Judge

Judge David B. Fannin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mark Morton

Don Brewster

Edward Glenn Lewis

Defendant

Brazos Rock, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allen R. Vaught

Attorney at Baron and Budd PC

3102 Oak Lawn Ave - Ste 1100

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorney

John M. Rogers

Attorney at ROGERS, LLP

409 West 4Th Street, Ste. 102, P.O. Box 2530

Weatherford, TX 76086

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7216488), filed by Edward Glenn Lewis, Don Brewster, Mark Morton. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 02/19/2015)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Don Brewster, Edward Glenn Lewis, Mark Morton. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 02/19/2015)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Parties by Don Brewster, Edward Glenn Lewis, Mark Morton. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 02/19/2015)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Brazos Rock, Inc.. (sk) (Entered: 02/19/2015)

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Robert A. Junell no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (sk) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to 1 Complaint . Attorney John M. Rogers added to party Brazos Rock, Inc.(pty:dft) by Brazos Rock, Inc..(Rogers, John) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/24/2015) (sk). (Entered: 03/23/2015)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interested Parties by Brazos Rock, Inc.. (Rogers, John) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/24/2015) (sk). (Entered: 03/23/2015)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Glenn Lewis, Don Brewster, Mark Morton. Brazos Rock, Inc. served on 3/2/2015, answer due 3/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

#9

(#9) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/29/2015,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (sk) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

#47

(#47) AMENDED ORDER, (Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/27/2015, Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2015 02:00 PM before Judge David B. Fannin). Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jk) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

#46

(#46) NOTICE of Filing of Consent for Eleazar Garcia, Martin Torres, Adam Bueno, Jose Alberto Munoz Estrada, Rodolfo Marks, Bradley Ray Podsednik, Juan Antonio Garcia Avila, Deric B. Holloway, Fransisco Madrid, Jesus Chavez, Fernando Michel, Jason Michel, Ross Reinhart, and Ramsey Gamez by Don Brewster, Edward Glenn Lewis, Mark Morton (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

#45

(#45) ORDER, (Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/27/2015, Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2015 02:00 PM before Judge David B. Fannin). Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jk) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

#44

(#44) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent for Michael Wayne Cascio, Frank Barraza, Juan C. Hinojos, Merwyn Parker, Gumersindo Longoria, Juan Manuel Gonzalez, Juan S. Garcia, Luis A. Vazquez, James Hiriams, Luis Garza, Jose Moreno, Larry Ferrington, Rogelio Olivas, Wenseslao Leyva, Jorge Ortiz Zuniga, Israel Duarte, Christopher K. Capers, Aniceto Castro, Javier Leal-Ramirez, Alfredo Garcia, Gilberto Alanis, and Edgar Torres by Don Brewster, Edward Glenn Lewis, Mark Morton (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

#43

(#43) ORDER GRANTING 40 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery and Pretrial Matters filed by Brazos Rock, Inc., VACATING 12 Scheduling Order, REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David B. Fannin. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (jk) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

#42

(#42) NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Consent for William Derbin, Eladio Maldonado Tula, William Cotton, Luis C. Garcia, Eduardo Lopez, Rocky L. Gilpin, Noe Garza, Sean Tiger, David Borrego, Noe Duran Frausto, Mario Leal, Rogelio Garza, Jonas Robbins, Jeremy Morris, Joey Morales, Salvador Morales, Isael DeLao, Rene Alanis, Serapio Vasquez Jr., Serapio Vasquez Sr., Mario A. Rodriguez, Rene R. Alanis, Tommy Barrows, and Justin Bertao by Don Brewster, Edward Glenn Lewis, Mark Morton (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

#41

(#41) NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Consent for Philip Marlow by Don Brewster, Edward Glenn Lewis, Mark Morton (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

#40

(#40) Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery and Pretrial Matters by Brazos Rock, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Consolidating Cases for Discovery and Pretrial Purposes)(Rogers, John) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

#39

(#39) NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Consent by Don Brewster, Edward Glenn Lewis, Mark Morton (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) AMENDED ORDER, (Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/27/2015, Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2015 02:00 PM before Judge David B. Fannin). Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jk) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) NOTICE of Filing of Consent for Eleazar Garcia, Martin Torres, Adam Bueno, Jose Alberto Munoz Estrada, Rodolfo Marks, Bradley Ray Podsednik, Juan Antonio Garcia Avila, Deric B. Holloway, Fransisco Madrid, Jesus Chavez, Fernando Michel, Jason Michel, Ross Reinhart, and Ramsey Gamez by Don Brewster, Edward Glenn Lewis, Mark Morton (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) ORDER, (Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/27/2015, Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2015 02:00 PM before Judge David B. Fannin). Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jk) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent for Michael Wayne Cascio, Frank Barraza, Juan C. Hinojos, Merwyn Parker, Gumersindo Longoria, Juan Manuel Gonzalez, Juan S. Garcia, Luis A. Vazquez, James Hiriams, Luis Garza, Jose Moreno, Larry Ferrington, Rogelio Olivas, Wenseslao Leyva, Jorge Ortiz Zuniga, Israel Duarte, Christopher K. Capers, Aniceto Castro, Javier Leal-Ramirez, Alfredo Garcia, Gilberto Alanis, and Edgar Torres by Don Brewster, Edward Glenn Lewis, Mark Morton (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) ORDER GRANTING 40 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery and Pretrial Matters filed by Brazos Rock, Inc., VACATING 12 Scheduling Order, REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David B. Fannin. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (jk) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Consent for William Derbin, Eladio Maldonado Tula, William Cotton, Luis C. Garcia, Eduardo Lopez, Rocky L. Gilpin, Noe Garza, Sean Tiger, David Borrego, Noe Duran Frausto, Mario Leal, Rogelio Garza, Jonas Robbins, Jeremy Morris, Joey Morales, Salvador Morales, Isael DeLao, Rene Alanis, Serapio Vasquez Jr., Serapio Vasquez Sr., Mario A. Rodriguez, Rene R. Alanis, Tommy Barrows, and Justin Bertao by Don Brewster, Edward Glenn Lewis, Mark Morton (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Consent for Philip Marlow by Don Brewster, Edward Glenn Lewis, Mark Morton (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery and Pretrial Matters by Brazos Rock, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Consolidating Cases for Discovery and Pretrial Purposes)(Rogers, John) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Consent by Don Brewster, Edward Glenn Lewis, Mark Morton (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Brazos Rock, Inc..(sm) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STATUS REPORT Joint by Don Brewster, Edward Glenn Lewis, Mark Morton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/29/2015,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (sk) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Glenn Lewis, Don Brewster, Mark Morton. Brazos Rock, Inc. served on 3/2/2015, answer due 3/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Interested Parties by Brazos Rock, Inc.. (Rogers, John) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/24/2015) (sk). (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to 1 Complaint . Attorney John M. Rogers added to party Brazos Rock, Inc.(pty:dft) by Brazos Rock, Inc..(Rogers, John) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/24/2015) (sk). (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Robert A. Junell no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (sk) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Brazos Rock, Inc.. (sk) (Entered: 02/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Parties by Don Brewster, Edward Glenn Lewis, Mark Morton. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 02/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Don Brewster, Edward Glenn Lewis, Mark Morton. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 02/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7216488), filed by Edward Glenn Lewis, Don Brewster, Mark Morton. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 02/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.