This case was last updated from PACER on 06/02/2016 at 07:32:23 (UTC).

Lemberg Law, LLC v. Hussin et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2015 Lemberg Law, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hussin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Michael P. Shea and Judge Donna F. Martinez (Settlement). The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-00737

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Michael P. Shea

Referral Judge

Judge Donna F. Martinez (Settlement)

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

Lemberg Law, LLC

Counter Claimants

Tammy Hussin

Law Office of Tammy Hussin P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jenny DeFrancisco

Ryan W Scully

Peter M. Nolin

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Craig S. Taschner

Tammy L. Hussin

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ALL Defendants( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3605486.), filed by Lemberg Law, LLC.(Scully, Ryan) Modified on 5/18/2015 (Lynch, K.). (Entered: 05/15/2015)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 08/15/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 7/14/2015; Discovery due by 11/14/2015; Dispositive Motions due by 12/14/2015. Signed by Clerk on 05/15/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER: Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/15/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER: Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/15/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 3 Electronic Filing Order, 1 Complaint filed by Lemberg Law, LLC, 4 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 05/18/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Tammy Hussin* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ryan W Scully* *Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP - NH* *195 Church St. 18th floor, PO Box 1950* *New Haven, CT 06510-1950*. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Law Office of Tammy Hussin P.C.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ryan W Scully* *Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP - NH* *195 Church St. 18th floor, PO Box 1950* *New Haven, CT 06510-1950*. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Nolin on behalf of Lemberg Law, LLC (Nolin, Peter) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig S. Taschner on behalf of Law Office of Tammy Hussin P.C. (Taschner, Craig) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

#90

(#90) RESPONSE re 89 Affidavit, filed by Lemberg Law, LLC. (Scully, Ryan) (Entered: 03/16/2016)

#91

(#91) NOTICE of Related Case by Tammy Hussin (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachments to Horton's Motion to Quash)(Hussin, Tammy) (Entered: 03/22/2016)

#92

(#92) MOTION to Strike 91 Notice of Related Case NOTICE of Related Case by Lemberg Law, LLC.Responses due by 4/14/2016 (Scully, Ryan) (Entered: 03/24/2016)

#93

(#93) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. As an exhibit to its opposition to Defendants' motion to transfer, Plaintiff has attached a document containing copies of correspondences between Attorney Hussin and certain clients. (ECF No. 71-2.) The Court has noted that information contained in these documents, particularly those on pages 6 and 7 of the exhibit, may be privileged. Within seven days, Plaintiff shall show cause why the exhibit should not be sealed. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/7/2016.(Osher, D.) (Entered: 04/07/2016)

#94

(#94) RESPONSE TO 93 Order to Show Cause,, by Lemberg Law, LLC filed by Lemberg Law, LLC. (Scully, Ryan) (Entered: 04/07/2016)

#95

(#95) RESPONSE re 94 Response to Order to Show Cause, 93 Order to Show Cause,, filed by Tammy Hussin. (Hussin, Tammy) (Entered: 04/07/2016)

#96

(#96) MOTION for Status Conference by Tammy Hussin. (Hussin, Tammy) (Entered: 04/21/2016)

#97

(#97) ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, Defendants' 52 Motion to Transfer is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/26/2016. (Osher, D.) (Entered: 04/26/2016)

#98

(#98) MOTION to Vacate Deadlines by Tammy Hussin. (Hussin, Tammy) (Entered: 04/27/2016)

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) MOTION to Vacate Deadlines by Tammy Hussin. (Hussin, Tammy) (Entered: 04/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, Defendants' 52 Motion to Transfer is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/26/2016. (Osher, D.) (Entered: 04/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) MOTION for Status Conference by Tammy Hussin. (Hussin, Tammy) (Entered: 04/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) RESPONSE re 94 Response to Order to Show Cause, 93 Order to Show Cause,, filed by Tammy Hussin. (Hussin, Tammy) (Entered: 04/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#94) RESPONSE TO 93 Order to Show Cause,, by Lemberg Law, LLC filed by Lemberg Law, LLC. (Scully, Ryan) (Entered: 04/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#93) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. As an exhibit to its opposition to Defendants' motion to transfer, Plaintiff has attached a document containing copies of correspondences between Attorney Hussin and certain clients. (ECF No. 71-2.) The Court has noted that information contained in these documents, particularly those on pages 6 and 7 of the exhibit, may be privileged. Within seven days, Plaintiff shall show cause why the exhibit should not be sealed. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/7/2016.(Osher, D.) (Entered: 04/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#92) MOTION to Strike 91 Notice of Related Case NOTICE of Related Case by Lemberg Law, LLC.Responses due by 4/14/2016 (Scully, Ryan) (Entered: 03/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#91) NOTICE of Related Case by Tammy Hussin (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachments to Horton's Motion to Quash)(Hussin, Tammy) (Entered: 03/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#90) RESPONSE re 89 Affidavit, filed by Lemberg Law, LLC. (Scully, Ryan) (Entered: 03/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#89) AFFIDAVIT re 61 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Seal and/or Expunge, 59 MOTION to Seal Defendants Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims; Defendants Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, 60 Memorandum in Support of Motion Signed By Tammy Hussin filed by Tammy Hussin. (Hussin, Tammy) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time until August 2, 2015 Respond to Complaint by Law Office of Tammy Hussin P.C.. (Taschner, Craig) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig S. Taschner on behalf of Law Office of Tammy Hussin P.C. (Taschner, Craig) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Nolin on behalf of Lemberg Law, LLC (Nolin, Peter) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Law Office of Tammy Hussin P.C.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ryan W Scully* *Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP - NH* *195 Church St. 18th floor, PO Box 1950* *New Haven, CT 06510-1950*. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Tammy Hussin* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ryan W Scully* *Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP - NH* *195 Church St. 18th floor, PO Box 1950* *New Haven, CT 06510-1950*. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 3 Electronic Filing Order, 1 Complaint filed by Lemberg Law, LLC, 4 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 05/18/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER: Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/15/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER: Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/15/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 08/15/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 7/14/2015; Discovery due by 11/14/2015; Dispositive Motions due by 12/14/2015. Signed by Clerk on 05/15/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ALL Defendants( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3605486.), filed by Lemberg Law, LLC.(Scully, Ryan) Modified on 5/18/2015 (Lynch, K.). (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less