This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 00:44:13 (UTC).

LEE et al v. PENCE et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2014 LEE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against PENCE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore and Judge Richard L. Young. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00406

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore

Judge

Judge Richard L. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ

T. S. V.

J. S. V.

PAMELA LEE

TERESA WELBORN

ELIZABETH J. PIETTE

RUTH MORRISON

MARTHA LEVERETT

KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ

T. R. V.

Defendants

MICHAEL PINKHAM

KEN COCHRAN

BRET SWANSON

BRIAN ABBOTT

CHRIS ATKINS

MIKE PENCE

STEVE DANIELS

JODI GOLDEN

KYLE ROSEBROUGH

STEVE RUSSO

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kathleen M. Sweeney

Attorney at SWEENEY HAYES LLC

141 East Washington Street, Suite 225

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Karen Celestino-Horseman

Attorney at OF COUNSEL, AUSTIN & JONES, PC

One North Pennsylvania, Suite 220

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Mark W. Sniderman

Attorney at SNIDERMAN NGUYEN LLP

47 S. Meridian Street, Suite 400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

William R. Groth

Attorney at FILLENWARTH DENNERLINE GROTH & TOWE LLP

429 E. Vermont Street, Suite 200

Indianapolis, IN 46202

Robert A. Katz

Attorney at INDIANA UNIVERSITY MCKINNEY SCHOOL OF LAW

530 West New York Street, Room 349

Indianapolis, IN 46202

Defendant Attorney

Thomas M. Fisher

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

302 West Washington Street, Igcs - 5Th Floor

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-2989558) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Proposed Summons)(Groth, William) Modified on 3/17/2014 for party text (DJH). (Entered: 03/14/2014)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Groth on behalf of Plaintiffs CANDACE BATTEN-LEE, PAMELA LEE, MARTHA LEVERETT, RUTH MORRISON, ELIZABETH J. PIETTE, T. R. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, T. S. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, J. S. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAMOWICZ, KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TERESA WELBORN. (Groth, William) (Entered: 03/14/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Celestino Horseman on behalf of Plaintiffs CANDACE BATTEN-LEE, PAMELA LEE, MARTHA LEVERETT, RUTH MORRISON, ELIZABETH J. PIETTE, T. R. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, T. S. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, J. S. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAMOWICZ, KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TERESA WELBORN. (Horseman, Karen) (Entered: 03/14/2014)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Sniderman on behalf of Plaintiffs CANDACE BATTEN-LEE, PAMELA LEE, MARTHA LEVERETT, RUTH MORRISON, ELIZABETH J. PIETTE, T. R. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, T. S. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, J. S. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAMOWICZ, KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TERESA WELBORN. (Sniderman, Mark) (Entered: 03/14/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Sweeney on behalf of Plaintiffs CANDACE BATTEN-LEE, PAMELA LEE, MARTHA LEVERETT, RUTH MORRISON, ELIZABETH J. PIETTE, T. R. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, T. S. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, J. S. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAMOWICZ, KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TERESA WELBORN. (Sweeney, Kathleen) Modified on 3/17/2014 for firm name (DJH). (Entered: 03/14/2014)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (DJH) (Entered: 03/17/2014)

#7

(#7) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 03/17/2014)

#8

(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker for all further proceedings. This case is related to 4:14-CV-15-RLY-TAB. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson and Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/18/2014. (TMD) (Entered: 03/18/2014)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson, Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue no longer assigned to the case. Please include the new case number, 1:14-cv-0406-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (AAM) (Entered: 03/19/2014)

#74

(#74) ORDER granting 70 Motion for Extension of Time to File for reasonable attorneys' fees and costs until 95 days after the 7th Circuit issues its mandate in this case or the case is otherwise resolved in the 7th Circuit, or 35 days after any proceedings in this case in the US Supreme Court are resolved, whichever is later. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/19/2014. **Copy sent to USCA re #14-2388.** (CBU) Modified on 8/20/2014 (JLM). (Entered: 08/19/2014)

#75

(#75) ORDER of USCA as to (53 in 1:14-cv-00404-RLY-TAB) Notice of Appeal filed by CLERK, ALLEN COUNTY, INDIANA, COMMISSIONER, INDIANA STATE DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, CLERK, HAMILTON COUNTY, INDIANA [USCA No. 2387], (91 in 1:14-cv-00355-RLY-TAB) Notice of Appeal filed by PENNY BOGAN, WILLIAM C. VANNESS, GREG ZOELLER, PEGGY BEAVER [USCA No. 14-2386], (60 in 1:14-cv-00406-RLY-MJD) Notice of Appeal filed by MICHAEL PINKHAM, CHRIS ATKINS, BRET SWANSON, BRIAN ABBOTT, KEN COCHRAN, JODI GOLDEN, KYLE ROSEBROUGH, STEVE DANIELS, STEVE RUSSO [USCA No. 14-2388]: IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Stay of Mandate Pending Final Disposition of Petition for Writ of Certiorari is GRANTED. The mandate in appeals 142386, 142387, and 142388 is STAYED pending final disposition of petition for writ of certiorari. The stay will terminate automatically if the certiorari petition is denied or will terminate upon the judgment of the Supreme Court if the certiorari petition is granted. (LBT) (Entered: 09/16/2014)

#76

(#76) MANDATE of USCA as to 60 Notice of Appeal filed by MICHAEL PINKHAM, CHRIS ATKINS, BRET SWANSON, BRIAN ABBOTT, KEN COCHRAN, JODI GOLDEN, KYLE ROSEBROUGH, STEVE DANIELS, STEVE RUSSO (USCA #14-2388) - The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. The petition for writ of certiorari is DENIED by the U.S. Supreme Court. (LBT) (Entered: 10/07/2014)

#77

(#77) ORDER denying as moot 66 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/20/2014. (TMD) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

#78

(#78) MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/26/2015 TO FILE PETITION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS, filed by Plaintiffs CANDACE BATTEN-LEE, PAMELA LEE, MARTHA LEVERETT, RUTH MORRISON, ELIZABETH J. PIETTE, J. S. V., T. R. V., T. S. V., KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TERESA WELBORN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Groth, William) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

#79

(#79) ORDER granting 78 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. The Plaintiffs shall have up to and including 1/26/2015, to file their petition for attorney's fees and costs in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/7/2015. (JLM) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

#80

(#80) Third MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/25/2015 To File for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, filed by Plaintiffs CANDACE BATTEN-LEE, PAMELA LEE, MARTHA LEVERETT, RUTH MORRISON, ELIZABETH J. PIETTE, J. S. V., T. R. V., T. S. V., KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TERESA WELBORN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Groth, William) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

#81

(#81) ORDER granting 80 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall file their petition for reasonable attorneys' fees and costs on, or before, February 25, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/28/2015. (MGG) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

#82

(#82) NOTICE to Court regarding resolution of attorney's fees and costs, filed by Plaintiffs CANDACE BATTEN-LEE, PAMELA LEE, MARTHA LEVERETT, RUTH MORRISON, ELIZABETH J. PIETTE, J. S. V., T. R. V., T. S. V., KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TERESA WELBORN (Groth, William) Modified on 2/20/2015 (NRN). (Entered: 02/19/2015)

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) NOTICE to Court regarding resolution of attorney's fees and costs, filed by Plaintiffs CANDACE BATTEN-LEE, PAMELA LEE, MARTHA LEVERETT, RUTH MORRISON, ELIZABETH J. PIETTE, J. S. V., T. R. V., T. S. V., KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TERESA WELBORN (Groth, William) Modified on 2/20/2015 (NRN). (Entered: 02/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#81) ORDER granting 80 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall file their petition for reasonable attorneys' fees and costs on, or before, February 25, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/28/2015. (MGG) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#80) Third MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/25/2015 To File for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, filed by Plaintiffs CANDACE BATTEN-LEE, PAMELA LEE, MARTHA LEVERETT, RUTH MORRISON, ELIZABETH J. PIETTE, J. S. V., T. R. V., T. S. V., KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TERESA WELBORN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Groth, William) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) ORDER granting 78 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. The Plaintiffs shall have up to and including 1/26/2015, to file their petition for attorney's fees and costs in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/7/2015. (JLM) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#78) MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/26/2015 TO FILE PETITION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS, filed by Plaintiffs CANDACE BATTEN-LEE, PAMELA LEE, MARTHA LEVERETT, RUTH MORRISON, ELIZABETH J. PIETTE, J. S. V., T. R. V., T. S. V., KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TERESA WELBORN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Groth, William) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) ORDER denying as moot 66 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/20/2014. (TMD) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) MANDATE of USCA as to 60 Notice of Appeal filed by MICHAEL PINKHAM, CHRIS ATKINS, BRET SWANSON, BRIAN ABBOTT, KEN COCHRAN, JODI GOLDEN, KYLE ROSEBROUGH, STEVE DANIELS, STEVE RUSSO (USCA #14-2388) - The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. The petition for writ of certiorari is DENIED by the U.S. Supreme Court. (LBT) (Entered: 10/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) ORDER of USCA as to (53 in 1:14-cv-00404-RLY-TAB) Notice of Appeal filed by CLERK, ALLEN COUNTY, INDIANA, COMMISSIONER, INDIANA STATE DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, CLERK, HAMILTON COUNTY, INDIANA [USCA No. 2387], (91 in 1:14-cv-00355-RLY-TAB) Notice of Appeal filed by PENNY BOGAN, WILLIAM C. VANNESS, GREG ZOELLER, PEGGY BEAVER [USCA No. 14-2386], (60 in 1:14-cv-00406-RLY-MJD) Notice of Appeal filed by MICHAEL PINKHAM, CHRIS ATKINS, BRET SWANSON, BRIAN ABBOTT, KEN COCHRAN, JODI GOLDEN, KYLE ROSEBROUGH, STEVE DANIELS, STEVE RUSSO [USCA No. 14-2388]: IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Stay of Mandate Pending Final Disposition of Petition for Writ of Certiorari is GRANTED. The mandate in appeals 142386, 142387, and 142388 is STAYED pending final disposition of petition for writ of certiorari. The stay will terminate automatically if the certiorari petition is denied or will terminate upon the judgment of the Supreme Court if the certiorari petition is granted. (LBT) (Entered: 09/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) ORDER granting 70 Motion for Extension of Time to File for reasonable attorneys' fees and costs until 95 days after the 7th Circuit issues its mandate in this case or the case is otherwise resolved in the 7th Circuit, or 35 days after any proceedings in this case in the US Supreme Court are resolved, whichever is later. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/19/2014. **Copy sent to USCA re #14-2388.** (CBU) Modified on 8/20/2014 (JLM). (Entered: 08/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) Appeal Remark re (53 in 1:14-cv-00404-RLY-TAB) Notice of Appeal, (91 in 1:14-cv-00355-RLY-TAB) Notice of Appeal, (60 in 1:14-cv-00406-RLY-MJD) Notice of Appeal (USCA #14-2386, 14-2387, 14-2388): Supplemental record on appeal filed electronically by USCA. Contents of record : 3 sealed documents and 1 restricted transcripts. (LBT) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RETURN of Personal Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. MIKE PENCE served on 3/20/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Horseman, Karen) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson, Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue no longer assigned to the case. Please include the new case number, 1:14-cv-0406-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (AAM) (Entered: 03/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker for all further proceedings. This case is related to 4:14-CV-15-RLY-TAB. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson and Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/18/2014. (TMD) (Entered: 03/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 03/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (DJH) (Entered: 03/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Sweeney on behalf of Plaintiffs CANDACE BATTEN-LEE, PAMELA LEE, MARTHA LEVERETT, RUTH MORRISON, ELIZABETH J. PIETTE, T. R. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, T. S. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, J. S. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAMOWICZ, KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TERESA WELBORN. (Sweeney, Kathleen) Modified on 3/17/2014 for firm name (DJH). (Entered: 03/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Sniderman on behalf of Plaintiffs CANDACE BATTEN-LEE, PAMELA LEE, MARTHA LEVERETT, RUTH MORRISON, ELIZABETH J. PIETTE, T. R. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, T. S. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, J. S. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAMOWICZ, KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TERESA WELBORN. (Sniderman, Mark) (Entered: 03/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Celestino Horseman on behalf of Plaintiffs CANDACE BATTEN-LEE, PAMELA LEE, MARTHA LEVERETT, RUTH MORRISON, ELIZABETH J. PIETTE, T. R. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, T. S. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, J. S. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAMOWICZ, KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TERESA WELBORN. (Horseman, Karen) (Entered: 03/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Groth on behalf of Plaintiffs CANDACE BATTEN-LEE, PAMELA LEE, MARTHA LEVERETT, RUTH MORRISON, ELIZABETH J. PIETTE, T. R. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, T. S. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, J. S. V., BY THEIR PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS, SERGEANT KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ AND TAMMY VAUGHN-KAMOWICZ, KAREN VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TAMMY VAUGHN-KAJMOWICZ, TERESA WELBORN. (Groth, William) (Entered: 03/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-2989558) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Proposed Summons)(Groth, William) Modified on 3/17/2014 for party text (DJH). (Entered: 03/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less