Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/29/2016 at 01:10:37 (UTC).

Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. v. Craig Electronics, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2015 Leading Edge Novelty, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Craig Electronics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    15-1964

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leading Edge Novelty, Inc.

Defendant

Craig Electronics, Inc.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 08/31/2015. [268526]Entry of Appearance due 09/15/2015. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/15/2015. Docketing Statement due 09/15/2015. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 11/02/2015.

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Ury Fischer as principal counsel for Appellee Craig Electronics, Inc.. Service: 09/02/2015 by email. [269121]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Craig Electronics, Inc.. Service: 09/02/2015 by email. [269122]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Craig Electronics, Inc.. Service: 09/02/2015 by email. [269123]

#6

(#6) CORRECTED certificate of service for Appellee Craig Electronics, Inc. for certificate of interest , Doc No. [3], attorney entry of appearance , Doc No. [2], docketing statement , Doc No. [4]. Service: 09/03/2015 by email. [269382]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Jerold I. Schneider, Esq. as principal counsel for Appellants Tsan-Yao Chen and Leading Edge Novelty, Inc.. Service: 09/11/2015 by email. [271520]

#8

(#8) Entry of appearance for Joel B. Rothman as of counsel for Appellants Tsan-Yao Chen and Leading Edge Novelty, Inc.. Service: 09/11/2015 by email. [271522]

#9

(#9) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellants Tsan-Yao Chen and Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 09/11/2015 by email. [271523]

#10

(#10) Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Tsan-Yao Chen and Leading Edge Novelty, Inc.. Service: 09/11/2015 by email. [271524]

#23

(#23) Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Larose Industries, Llc and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Service: 09/15/2015 by email. [272368]

#24

(#24) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Larose Industries, Llc and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Service: 09/15/2015 by email. [272370]

#25

(#25) CORRECTED certificate of service for Appellees Larose Industries, Llc and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. for attorney entry of appearance , Doc No. [22], certificate of interest , Doc No. [23], docketing statement , Doc No. [24]. Service: 09/15/2015 by email. [272377]

#27

(#27) MOTION of Appellants Tsan-Yao Chen, Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. and Appellees Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. and DGL Group, Ltd. to withdraw party, DGL Group, Ltd. Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. , as a party to this appeal. Response/Opposition is due 10/22/2015 [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 10/09/2015 by email. [279210]

#28

(#28) MOTION of Appellants Tsan-Yao Chen and Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. to withdraw party, La Rose Industries, LLC and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. , as a party to this appeal. Response/Opposition is due 10/29/2015 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 10/14/2015 by email. [280201]

#29

(#29) ORDER granting motions to withdraw parties to the appeal [27] [28] to the extent that the official caption is revised ot indicate that DGL Group, LTD; Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc.; LaRose Industries, LLC; and Wal-Mart Stoes, Inc. are not appellees in the appeal. The revised official caption and short caption are reflected in the order. Service: 10/16/2015 by clerk. [281072]

#30

(#30) MOTION of Appellants Tsan-Yao Chen and Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. to extend the time to 12/01/2015 at 05:00 pm to file the appellant/petitioner's principal brief. Response/Opposition is due 11/05/2015 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 10/21/2015 by email. [282443]

#34

(#34) MOTION of Appellants Tsan-Yao Chen, Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. and Appellee Craig Electronics, Inc. to terminate appeal through Dismissed with Prejudice. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 11/13/2015 by email. [288580]

#35

(#35) ORDER granting motion to terminate appeal [34] filed by Appellee Craig Electronics, Inc. and Appellants Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. and Tsan-Yao Chen; issuing mandate. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [288610]

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) ORDER granting motion to terminate appeal [34] filed by Appellee Craig Electronics, Inc. and Appellants Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. and Tsan-Yao Chen; issuing mandate. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [288610]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MOTION of Appellants Tsan-Yao Chen, Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. and Appellee Craig Electronics, Inc. to terminate appeal through Dismissed with Prejudice. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 11/13/2015 by email. [288580]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MOTION of Appellants Tsan-Yao Chen and Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. to extend the time to 12/01/2015 at 05:00 pm to file the appellant/petitioner's principal brief. Response/Opposition is due 11/05/2015 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 10/21/2015 by email. [282443]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER granting motions to withdraw parties to the appeal [27] [28] to the extent that the official caption is revised ot indicate that DGL Group, LTD; Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc.; LaRose Industries, LLC; and Wal-Mart Stoes, Inc. are not appellees in the appeal. The revised official caption and short caption are reflected in the order. Service: 10/16/2015 by clerk. [281072]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MOTION of Appellants Tsan-Yao Chen and Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. to withdraw party, La Rose Industries, LLC and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. , as a party to this appeal. Response/Opposition is due 10/29/2015 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 10/14/2015 by email. [280201]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION of Appellants Tsan-Yao Chen, Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. and Appellees Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. and DGL Group, Ltd. to withdraw party, DGL Group, Ltd. Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. , as a party to this appeal. Response/Opposition is due 10/22/2015 [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 10/09/2015 by email. [279210]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) CORRECTED certificate of service for Appellees Larose Industries, Llc and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. for attorney entry of appearance , Doc No. [22], certificate of interest , Doc No. [23], docketing statement , Doc No. [24]. Service: 09/15/2015 by email. [272377]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Larose Industries, Llc and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Service: 09/15/2015 by email. [272370]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Larose Industries, Llc and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Service: 09/15/2015 by email. [272368]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Entry of appearance for John K. Kim as principal counsel for Appellees Larose Industries, Llc and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Service: 09/15/2015 by email. [272366]

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORRECTED certificate of service for Appellants Tsan-Yao Chen and Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. for docketing statement , Doc No. [11], certificate of interest , Doc No. [10], transcript purchase order form , Doc No. [9], attorney entry of appearance , Doc No. [8], attorney entry of appearance , Doc No. [7]. Service: 09/11/2015 by email. [271531]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Tsan-Yao Chen and Leading Edge Novelty, Inc.. Service: 09/11/2015 by email. [271524]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellants Tsan-Yao Chen and Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 09/11/2015 by email. [271523]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Entry of appearance for Joel B. Rothman as of counsel for Appellants Tsan-Yao Chen and Leading Edge Novelty, Inc.. Service: 09/11/2015 by email. [271522]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for Jerold I. Schneider, Esq. as principal counsel for Appellants Tsan-Yao Chen and Leading Edge Novelty, Inc.. Service: 09/11/2015 by email. [271520]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORRECTED certificate of service for Appellee Craig Electronics, Inc. for certificate of interest , Doc No. [3], attorney entry of appearance , Doc No. [2], docketing statement , Doc No. [4]. Service: 09/03/2015 by email. [269382]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Craig Electronics, Inc.. Service: 09/02/2015 by email. [269123]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Craig Electronics, Inc.. Service: 09/02/2015 by email. [269122]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Ury Fischer as principal counsel for Appellee Craig Electronics, Inc.. Service: 09/02/2015 by email. [269121]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 08/31/2015. [268526]Entry of Appearance due 09/15/2015. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/15/2015. Docketing Statement due 09/15/2015. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 11/02/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Craig Electronics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. is a litigant