This case was last updated from PACER on 06/03/2016 at 20:02:07 (UTC).

Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. et al v. Forever Gifts, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2014 Leading Edge Novelty, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Forever Gifts, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:14-CV-81595

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Leading Edge Novelty, Inc.

Tsan-Yao Chen

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Forever Gifts, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Joel Benjamin Rothman

Attorney at Schneider Rothman IP Law Group

4651 North Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Robert Houpt Thornburg

Attorney at Allen, Dyer, Doppelt, Milbrath & Gilchrist P.A.

1221 Brickell Avenue, Suite 2400

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF DEMANDED DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against FOREVER GIFTS, INC.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-7344293, filed by Leading Edge Novelty, Inc., Tsan-Yao Chen. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D)(Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

#2

(#2) Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra (ail) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

#3

(#3) Notice of Pendency of Other Action by Leading Edge Novelty, Inc., Tsan-Yao Chen (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tsan-Yao Chen, Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to FOREVER GIFTS, INC.. (ail) (Entered: 12/24/2014)

#6

(#6) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (ail) (Entered: 12/24/2014)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Reassign Case by Tsan-Yao Chen, Leading Edge Novelty, Inc.. (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 12/24/2014)

#8

(#8) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 12/29/14. Judge Kenneth A. Marra no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/29/2014. (mg) (Entered: 12/30/2014)

#9

(#9) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Complaint, by Tsan-Yao Chen, Leading Edge Novelty, Inc.. (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Leading Edge Novelty, Inc., Tsan-Yao Chen. FOREVER GIFTS, INC. served on 1/5/2015, answer due 1/26/2015. (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

#11

(#11) ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Forever Gifts, Inc. shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint by February 25, 2015. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/15/2015. (kcr) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

#12

(#12) ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 7 Motion to Reassign Case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/2/2015. (kcr) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

#13

(#13) Defendant Forever Gifts, Inc.'s ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Tsan-Yao Chen, Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. by FOREVER GIFTS, INC.. Attorney Robert Houpt Thornburg added to party FOREVER GIFTS, INC.(pty:dft). (Thornburg, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

#14

(#14) ORDER Requiring Response as to Consolidation ( Responses due by 3/24/2015). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/19/2015. (ls) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE/REPLY to 14 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings by Tsan-Yao Chen, Leading Edge Novelty, Inc.. (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

#16

(#16) RESPONSE/REPLY to 14 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings by FOREVER GIFTS, INC.. (Thornburg, Robert) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Counterclaim by Tsan-Yao Chen, Leading Edge Novelty, Inc.. (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

#18

(#18) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Case consolidated with Case No. 14-CIV-81447-DMM; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/25/2015. (ls) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Case consolidated with Case No. 14-CIV-81447-DMM; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/25/2015. (ls) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to Counterclaim by Tsan-Yao Chen, Leading Edge Novelty, Inc.. (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE/REPLY to 14 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings by FOREVER GIFTS, INC.. (Thornburg, Robert) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE/REPLY to 14 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings by Tsan-Yao Chen, Leading Edge Novelty, Inc.. (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER Requiring Response as to Consolidation ( Responses due by 3/24/2015). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/19/2015. (ls) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Defendant Forever Gifts, Inc.'s ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Tsan-Yao Chen, Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. by FOREVER GIFTS, INC.. Attorney Robert Houpt Thornburg added to party FOREVER GIFTS, INC.(pty:dft). (Thornburg, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 7 Motion to Reassign Case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/2/2015. (kcr) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Forever Gifts, Inc. shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint by February 25, 2015. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/15/2015. (kcr) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Leading Edge Novelty, Inc., Tsan-Yao Chen. FOREVER GIFTS, INC. served on 1/5/2015, answer due 1/26/2015. (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Complaint, by Tsan-Yao Chen, Leading Edge Novelty, Inc.. (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 12/29/14. Judge Kenneth A. Marra no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/29/2014. (mg) (Entered: 12/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Reassign Case by Tsan-Yao Chen, Leading Edge Novelty, Inc.. (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 12/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (ail) (Entered: 12/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to FOREVER GIFTS, INC.. (ail) (Entered: 12/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tsan-Yao Chen, Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Pendency of Other Action by Leading Edge Novelty, Inc., Tsan-Yao Chen (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra (ail) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF DEMANDED DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against FOREVER GIFTS, INC.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-7344293, filed by Leading Edge Novelty, Inc., Tsan-Yao Chen. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D)(Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Forever Gifts, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Leading Edge Novelty, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Houpt Thornburg