This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 16:07:45 (UTC).

Le v. MBF Leasing, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2015 Le filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against MBF Leasing, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr and Judge James C. Mahan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00861

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr

Judge

Judge James C. Mahan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ann Le

Defendants

Joseph I. Sussman, P.C.

Joseph I. Sussman

Ari A. Erdfarb

MBF Leasing, LLC

Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sandy Van

Attorney at Van Law Firm

4170 S. Decatur Blvd., Suite B5-6

Las Vegas, NV 89103

Defendant Attorney

Mark Malloy Weisenmiller

Attorney at Gordon Silver

3960 Howard Hughes Pkwy., 9Th Flr.

Las Vegas, NV 89169

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ari A. Erdfarb, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., MBF Leasing, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Joseph I. Sussman (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-3656519), filed by ANN LE. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/17/2015. Proof of service due by 9/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B-Part 2, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons) (Van, Sandy) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Ari A. Erdfarb, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., MBF Leasing, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Joseph I. Sussman. (Attachments: # 1 summons issued as to Ari A. Erdfarb, # 2 summons issued as to Joseph I Sussman, # 3 summons issued as to Joseph I. Sussman, PC, # 4 summons issued as to MBF Leasing, LLC, # 5 summons issued as to Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.)(MMM) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file her Certificate as to Interested Parties, whichfully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than June 1, 2015. Failure to comply may result in theissuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 05/21/2015)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by ANN LE. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Van, Sandy) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants MBF Leasing, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 7/18/2015. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/11/2015. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/15/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Weisenmiller, Mark) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for 6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants MBF Leasing, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.. (Weisenmiller, Mark) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to 6 Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Plaintiff Ann Le. Replies due by 7/25/2015. (Van, Sandy) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

#9

(#9) Request for Judicial Notice re 6 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Ann Le. (Van, Sandy) Modified event on 7/15/2015 (EDS). (Entered: 07/15/2015)

#38

(#38) ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 36 STIPULATION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines re 19 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 11/23/2015)

#37

(#37) Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on 36 STIPULATION for Extension of Time re: Discovery Deadlines; filed by Defendants Ari A. Erdfarb, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., MBF Leasing, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Joseph I. Sussman . (Weisenmiller, Mark) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

#36

(#36) STIPULATION for Extension of Time re: Discovery Deadlines; filed by Defendants Ari A. Erdfarb, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., MBF Leasing, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Joseph I. Sussman. (Weisenmiller, Mark) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

#35

(#35) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Ari A. Erdfarb, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., MBF Leasing, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Joseph I. Sussman. (Weisenmiller, Mark) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

#34

(#34) REPLY to Response to 25 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ann Le. (Van, Sandy) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#33

(#33) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for 30 Response to Motion, 32 Reply to Response to Motion, 31 Certificate of Interested Parties, by Defendants Ari A. Erdfarb, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., Joseph I. Sussman. (Weisenmiller, Mark) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#32

(#32) REPLY to Response to 23 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendants Ari A. Erdfarb, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., Joseph I. Sussman. (Weisenmiller, Mark) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#31

(#31) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Ari A. Erdfarb, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., MBF Leasing, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Joseph I. Sussman. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Weisenmiller, Mark) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#30

(#30) RESPONSE to 25 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint, filed by Defendants Ari A. Erdfarb, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., MBF Leasing, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Joseph I. Sussman. Replies due by 10/23/2015. (Weisenmiller, Mark) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 36 STIPULATION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines re 19 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 11/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on 36 STIPULATION for Extension of Time re: Discovery Deadlines; filed by Defendants Ari A. Erdfarb, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., MBF Leasing, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Joseph I. Sussman . (Weisenmiller, Mark) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) STIPULATION for Extension of Time re: Discovery Deadlines; filed by Defendants Ari A. Erdfarb, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., MBF Leasing, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Joseph I. Sussman. (Weisenmiller, Mark) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Ari A. Erdfarb, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., MBF Leasing, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Joseph I. Sussman. (Weisenmiller, Mark) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) REPLY to Response to 25 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ann Le. (Van, Sandy) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for 30 Response to Motion, 32 Reply to Response to Motion, 31 Certificate of Interested Parties, by Defendants Ari A. Erdfarb, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., Joseph I. Sussman. (Weisenmiller, Mark) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) REPLY to Response to 23 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendants Ari A. Erdfarb, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., Joseph I. Sussman. (Weisenmiller, Mark) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Ari A. Erdfarb, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., MBF Leasing, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Joseph I. Sussman. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Weisenmiller, Mark) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) RESPONSE to 25 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint, filed by Defendants Ari A. Erdfarb, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., MBF Leasing, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Joseph I. Sussman. Replies due by 10/23/2015. (Weisenmiller, Mark) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants MBF Leasing, LLC and Northern Leasing Systems, LLC shall file their Certificate as to Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than October 27, 2015. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/7/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Change of Address by Sandy Van. (Van, Sandy) (Entered: 07/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Request for Judicial Notice re 6 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Ann Le. (Van, Sandy) Modified event on 7/15/2015 (EDS). (Entered: 07/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to 6 Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Plaintiff Ann Le. Replies due by 7/25/2015. (Van, Sandy) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for 6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants MBF Leasing, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.. (Weisenmiller, Mark) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants MBF Leasing, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 7/18/2015. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/11/2015. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/15/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Weisenmiller, Mark) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by ANN LE. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Van, Sandy) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file her Certificate as to Interested Parties, whichfully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than June 1, 2015. Failure to comply may result in theissuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 05/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Ari A. Erdfarb, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., MBF Leasing, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Joseph I. Sussman. (Attachments: # 1 summons issued as to Ari A. Erdfarb, # 2 summons issued as to Joseph I Sussman, # 3 summons issued as to Joseph I. Sussman, PC, # 4 summons issued as to MBF Leasing, LLC, # 5 summons issued as to Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.)(MMM) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Ari A. Erdfarb, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., MBF Leasing, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Joseph I. Sussman (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-3656519), filed by ANN LE. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/17/2015. Proof of service due by 9/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B-Part 2, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons) (Van, Sandy) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.