This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:06:53 (UTC).

LBS Innovations, LLC v. Gasbuddy OpenStore, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 LBS Innovations, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Gasbuddy OpenStore, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne and Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00698

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

Judge

Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LBS Innovations, LLC

Defendant

Gasbuddy OpenStore, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian Andrew Carpenter

Attorney at Buether Joe & Carpenter, LLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 4750

Dallas, TX 75201

Niknaz Bukovcan

Attorney at Buether Joe & Carpenter, LLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 4750

Dallas, TX 75201

Christopher Michael Joe

Attorney at Buether Joe & Carpenter, LLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 4750

Dallas, TX 75201

Eric William Buether

Attorney at Buether Joe & Carpenter, LLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 4750

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorney

Joseph P Griffith

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP - Dallas

2200 Ross Ave, Suite 5200

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Gasbuddy OpenStore, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4709383.), filed by LBS Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 6,091,956 Patent, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Andrew Carpenter on behalf of LBS Innovations, LLC (Carpenter, Brian) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric William Buether on behalf of LBS Innovations, LLC (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LBS Innovations, LLC. Gasbuddy OpenStore, LLC served on 7/3/2014, answer due 7/24/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

#15

(#15) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:14-cv-697. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/16/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/17/2014)

#7

(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/18/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LBS Innovations, LLC (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gasbuddy Openstore, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff LBS Innovations, LLC's Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by LBS Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

#16

(#16) ORDER DISMISSING CASE - with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/30/15. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/01/2015)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Gasbuddy OpenStore, LLC. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LBS Innovations, LLC. Gasbuddy OpenStore, LLC served on 10/22/2014, answer due 11/12/2014. Per attorney the first summons returned executed was not actually received by defendant therefore sent to another address. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Niknaz Bukovcan on behalf of LBS Innovations, LLC (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#18

(#18) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III for all further proceedings. Judge Rodney Gilstrap no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/02/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

#17

(#17) GENERAL ORDER 14-20 ASSIGNING CIVIL AND CRIMINAL ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/19/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gasbuddy Openstore, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff LBS Innovations, LLC's Complaint for Patent Infringement by Gasbuddy OpenStore, LLC. (Griffith, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2014: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ). (Entered: 11/12/2014)

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gasbuddy OpenStore, LLC (Griffith, Joseph) (Entered: 11/13/2014)

#14

(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gasbuddy Openstore, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff LBS Innovations, LLC's Complaint for Patent Infringement Defendant Gasbuddy / Openstore, LLC's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff LBS Innovations, LLC's Complaint For Patent Infringement filed by Gasbuddy OpenStore, LLC. (Griffith, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2014)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III for all further proceedings. Judge Rodney Gilstrap no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/02/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) GENERAL ORDER 14-20 ASSIGNING CIVIL AND CRIMINAL ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/19/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER DISMISSING CASE - with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/30/15. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:14-cv-697. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/16/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gasbuddy Openstore, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff LBS Innovations, LLC's Complaint for Patent Infringement Defendant Gasbuddy / Openstore, LLC's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff LBS Innovations, LLC's Complaint For Patent Infringement filed by Gasbuddy OpenStore, LLC. (Griffith, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gasbuddy Openstore, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff LBS Innovations, LLC's Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by LBS Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gasbuddy OpenStore, LLC (Griffith, Joseph) (Entered: 11/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gasbuddy Openstore, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff LBS Innovations, LLC's Complaint for Patent Infringement by Gasbuddy OpenStore, LLC. (Griffith, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2014: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ). (Entered: 11/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LBS Innovations, LLC. Gasbuddy OpenStore, LLC served on 10/22/2014, answer due 11/12/2014. Per attorney the first summons returned executed was not actually received by defendant therefore sent to another address. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LBS Innovations, LLC. Gasbuddy OpenStore, LLC served on 7/3/2014, answer due 7/24/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Gasbuddy OpenStore, LLC. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/18/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Niknaz Bukovcan on behalf of LBS Innovations, LLC (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Andrew Carpenter on behalf of LBS Innovations, LLC (Carpenter, Brian) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric William Buether on behalf of LBS Innovations, LLC (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LBS Innovations, LLC (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Gasbuddy OpenStore, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4709383.), filed by LBS Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 6,091,956 Patent, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.