This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:12:57 (UTC).

Lawson v. Freescale Semiconductor, Ltd et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2015 Lawson filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Freescale Semiconductor, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Sam Sparks. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00360

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Sam Sparks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Lawson

Defendants

Gregg Lowe

Joanne M. Maguire

Thomas H. Lister

Nimble Acquisition Limited

NXP Semiconductors N.V.

James A. Quella

Gregory L. Summe

Daniel J. Heneghan

D. Mark Durcan

Freescale Semiconductor Ltd.

Peter Smitham

Krishnan Balasubramanian

John W. Marren

Claudius E. Watts, IV

Chinh E. Chu

Freescale Holdings L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James M. Wilson, Jr.

Attorney at Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

369 Lexington Avenue, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Randall C. Owens

Attorney at Wright and Close LLP

One Riverway, Suite 2200

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorneys

Wallis M. Hampton

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

1000 Louisiana Street - Suite 6800

Houston, TX 77002-5026

Charles Walter Schwartz

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP

1000 Lousiana Street - Suite 6800

Houston, TX 77002-5026

Noelle M. Reed

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana Street - Suite 6800

Houston, TX 77002-5026

Peter Eric Kazanoff

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

425 Lexington Ave.

New York, NY 10021

Sara Ann Ricciardi

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

425 Lexington Ave.

New York, NY 10021

Peter Andrew Stokes

Attorney at Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

98 San Jacinto Blvd, Suite 1100

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (os) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

#1

No Description Available

#12

(#12) Letter to Scott D. Musoff re: non-admitted status. (os) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Andrew Stokes on behalf of NXP Semiconductors N.V.. Attorney Peter Andrew Stokes added to party NXP Semiconductors N.V.(pty:dft) (Stokes, Peter) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

#2

(#2) Letters to Juan E. Monteverde and James M. Wilson, Jr. re: Non-Admitted Status. (afd) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/5/2015 to correct salutation) (afd). (Entered: 05/05/2015)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter Andrew Stokes for Peter Kazanoff ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7604063) by on behalf of NXP Semiconductors N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Peter) (Entered: 07/11/2015)

#14

(#14) ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sara Ann Ricciardi. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (os) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney James M. Wilson, Jr. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

#9

(#9) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Krishnan Balasubramanian, Chinh E. Chu, D. Mark Durcan, Freescale Holdings L.P., Freescale Semiconductor Ltd., Daniel J. Heneghan, Thomas H. Lister, Gregg Lowe, Joanne M. Maguire, John W. Marren, NXP Semiconductors N.V., James A. Quella, Peter Smitham, Gregory L. Summe, Claudius E. Watts, IV. (Reed, Noelle) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter Andrew Stokes for Sara Ann Ricciardi ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7604066) by on behalf of NXP Semiconductors N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Peter) (Entered: 07/11/2015)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Randall C. Owens for attorney James M. Wilson, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7440608) by on behalf of Eric Lawson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Owens, Randall) Modified on 5/12/2015 (jk). (Entered: 05/12/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Noelle M. Reed on behalf of Krishnan Balasubramanian, Chinh E. Chu, D. Mark Durcan, Freescale Holdings L.P., Freescale Semiconductor Ltd., Daniel J. Heneghan, Thomas H. Lister, Gregg Lowe, Joanne M. Maguire, John W. Marren, James A. Quella, Peter Smitham, Gregory L. Summe, Claudius E. Watts, IV. Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Krishnan Balasubramanian(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Chinh E. Chu(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party D. Mark Durcan(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Freescale Holdings L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Freescale Semiconductor Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Daniel J. Heneghan(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Thomas H. Lister(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Gregg Lowe(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Joanne M. Maguire(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party John W. Marren(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party James A. Quella(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Peter Smitham(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Gregory L. Summe(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Claudius E. Watts, IV(pty:dft) (Reed, Noelle) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eric Lawson (Owens, Randall) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

#10

(#10) APPENDIX to 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Krishnan Balasubramanian, Chinh E. Chu, D. Mark Durcan, Freescale Holdings L.P., Freescale Semiconductor Ltd., Daniel J. Heneghan, Thomas H. Lister, Gregg Lowe, Joanne M. Maguire, John W. Marren, NXP Semiconductors N.V., James A. Quella, Peter Smitham, Gregory L. Summe, Claudius E. Watts, IV. (Reed, Noelle) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

#11

(#11) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Freescale Holdings L.P., Freescale Semiconductor Ltd.. (Reed, Noelle) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Peter Eric Kazanoff. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (os) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (os) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Peter Eric Kazanoff. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (os) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sara Ann Ricciardi. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (os) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eric Lawson (Owens, Randall) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Letter to Scott D. Musoff re: non-admitted status. (os) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Freescale Holdings L.P., Freescale Semiconductor Ltd.. (Reed, Noelle) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPENDIX to 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Krishnan Balasubramanian, Chinh E. Chu, D. Mark Durcan, Freescale Holdings L.P., Freescale Semiconductor Ltd., Daniel J. Heneghan, Thomas H. Lister, Gregg Lowe, Joanne M. Maguire, John W. Marren, NXP Semiconductors N.V., James A. Quella, Peter Smitham, Gregory L. Summe, Claudius E. Watts, IV. (Reed, Noelle) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Krishnan Balasubramanian, Chinh E. Chu, D. Mark Durcan, Freescale Holdings L.P., Freescale Semiconductor Ltd., Daniel J. Heneghan, Thomas H. Lister, Gregg Lowe, Joanne M. Maguire, John W. Marren, NXP Semiconductors N.V., James A. Quella, Peter Smitham, Gregory L. Summe, Claudius E. Watts, IV. (Reed, Noelle) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter Andrew Stokes for Sara Ann Ricciardi ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7604066) by on behalf of NXP Semiconductors N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Peter) (Entered: 07/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter Andrew Stokes for Peter Kazanoff ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7604063) by on behalf of NXP Semiconductors N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Peter) (Entered: 07/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Andrew Stokes on behalf of NXP Semiconductors N.V.. Attorney Peter Andrew Stokes added to party NXP Semiconductors N.V.(pty:dft) (Stokes, Peter) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Noelle M. Reed on behalf of Krishnan Balasubramanian, Chinh E. Chu, D. Mark Durcan, Freescale Holdings L.P., Freescale Semiconductor Ltd., Daniel J. Heneghan, Thomas H. Lister, Gregg Lowe, Joanne M. Maguire, John W. Marren, James A. Quella, Peter Smitham, Gregory L. Summe, Claudius E. Watts, IV. Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Krishnan Balasubramanian(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Chinh E. Chu(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party D. Mark Durcan(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Freescale Holdings L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Freescale Semiconductor Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Daniel J. Heneghan(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Thomas H. Lister(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Gregg Lowe(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Joanne M. Maguire(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party John W. Marren(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party James A. Quella(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Peter Smitham(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Gregory L. Summe(pty:dft), Attorney Noelle M. Reed added to party Claudius E. Watts, IV(pty:dft) (Reed, Noelle) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney James M. Wilson, Jr. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Randall C. Owens for attorney James M. Wilson, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7440608) by on behalf of Eric Lawson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Owens, Randall) Modified on 5/12/2015 (jk). (Entered: 05/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letters to Juan E. Monteverde and James M. Wilson, Jr. re: Non-Admitted Status. (afd) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/5/2015 to correct salutation) (afd). (Entered: 05/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7418581). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Eric Lawson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Owens, Randall) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.