This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 15:02:24 (UTC).

Lavastone Capital LLC v. Coventry First LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2014 Lavastone Capital LLC filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Coventry First LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Jed S. Rakoff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-07139

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Jed S. Rakoff

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lavastone Capital LLC

Defendants

Reid Buerger

Coventry First LLC

LST I LLC

LST II LLC

Krista Lake

Montgomery Capital, Inc.

Alan Buerger

Constance Buerger

LST Holdings Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Randy M. Mastro

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue, 48Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Kristin Nicole Carlson

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP (CA2)

333 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 4600

Los Angeles, CA 90070

Akiva Shapiro

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Curtis Joseph Mahoney

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Ashley S. Boizelle

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP (DC)

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

James L. Hallowell

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue, 48Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Alexander H. Southwell

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

200 Park Avenue 47Th, Floor

New York, NY 10166

Reed Michael Brodsky

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue, 48Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Caitlin Joan Halligan

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue, 48Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Adam John Jantzi

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue, 48Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Heidi K. Hubbard

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Peter James Anthony

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

700 12Th St, N.W.,

Washington, DC 20008

Joe Petrosinelli

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Kenneth Jerome Brown

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Ryan T. Scarborough

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Giselle Barcia

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Charles Davant, IV

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

William Pruitt Ashworth

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Stewart Hill Ackerly

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 Twelfth Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20009

Paul B. Gaffney

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Alan Buerger, Constance Buerger, Reid Buerger, Coventry First LLC, LST Holdings Ltd., LST I LLC, LST II LLC, Krista Lake, Montgomery Capital, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401104143)Document filed by Lavastone Capital LLC.(moh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2014: # 1 Exhibit A) (moh). (Entered: 09/09/2014)

#2

(#2) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 09-cv-1086. Document filed by Alan Buerger, Constance Buerger, Reid Buerger, Coventry First LLC, LST Holdings Ltd., LST I LLC, LST II LLC, Krista Lake, Montgomery Capital, Inc..(moh) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Graphite Management LLC, Corporate Parent American International Group Inc. for Lavastone Capital LLC. Document filed by Lavastone Capital LLC.(Mastro, Randy) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: The Honorable Jed S. Rakoff, U.S.D.J. has ordered that counsel for all parties attend a conference, at the time and place fixed below, for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. You are directed to furnish all attorneys in this action with copies of this notice and enclosures, and to furnish Chambers with a copy of any transmittal letter(s). If you are unaware of the identity of counsel forany of the parties, you should send a copy of the notice and rules to that party personally, informing the party that any unrepresented party is required to appear at the conference in person. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 10-16-2014, AT THE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 500 PEARL STREET, NEW YORK, N.Y. IN COURTROOM 14-B AT 11:00A.M. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/16/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/17/2014) (ama) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Alan Buerger waiver sent on 9/5/2014, answer due 11/4/2014; Constance Buerger waiver sent on 9/5/2014, answer due 11/4/2014; Reid Buerger waiver sent on 9/5/2014, answer due 11/4/2014; Coventry First LLC waiver sent on 9/5/2014, answer due 11/4/2014; LST Holdings Ltd. waiver sent on 9/5/2014, answer due 11/4/2014; LST I LLC waiver sent on 9/5/2014, answer due 11/4/2014; LST II LLC waiver sent on 9/5/2014, answer due 11/4/2014; Krista Lake waiver sent on 9/5/2014, answer due 11/4/2014; Montgomery Capital, Inc. waiver sent on 9/5/2014, answer due 11/4/2014. Document filed by Lavastone Capital LLC. (Hallowell, James) (Entered: 09/23/2014)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Heidi K. Hubbard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10156538. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alan Buerger, Constance Buerger, Reid Buerger, Coventry First LLC, LST Holdings Ltd., LST I LLC, LST II LLC, Krista Lake, Montgomery Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Utah Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Heidi) (Entered: 09/30/2014)

#8

(#8) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Kenneth J. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10156639. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alan Buerger, Constance Buerger, Reid Buerger, Coventry First LLC, LST Holdings Ltd., LST I LLC, LST II LLC, Krista Lake, Montgomery Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DC - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit VA - Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Kenneth) Modified on 9/30/2014 (bcu). (Entered: 09/30/2014)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Ryan T. Scarborough to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10156722. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alan Buerger, Constance Buerger, Reid Buerger, Coventry First LLC, LST Holdings Ltd., LST I LLC, LST II LLC, Krista Lake, Montgomery Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing DC, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing - VA, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarborough, Ryan) (Entered: 09/30/2014)

#160

(#160) RULING ON DEPOSITION. ***Accepted for filing as a docket and file by Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#159

(#159) DEPOSITION of Neal Jacobs with Exhibits. ***Accepted for filing as a docket and file by Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#158

(#158) POST TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by Lavastone Capital LLC.(Mastro, Randy) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

#157

(#157) POST TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by Alan Buerger, Reid Buerger, Coventry First LLC, LST Holdings Ltd., LST I LLC, LST II LLC, Krista Lake, Montgomery Capital, Inc..(Ferguson, Meghan) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

#156

(#156) NOTICE of Letter. Document filed by Krista Lake. (Ferguson, Meghan) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

#155

(#155) NOTICE of Letter. Document filed by Alan Buerger, Constance Buerger, Reid Buerger, Coventry First LLC, LST Holdings Ltd., LST I LLC, LST II LLC, Krista Lake, Montgomery Capital, Inc.. (Ferguson, Meghan) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

#154

(#154) ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on the application of Defendants in Case No. 14-cv-7139 to file the following documents under seal (discussed with the Court on September 18, 2015): 1) JX-717.001 to JX-717.689; 2) JX-718.001 to JX-718.350; 3) JX-719.001 to JX-719.275; 4) JX-720.0001 to JX-720.7422; 5) JX-722.001 to JX-722.283; 6) JX-723.0001 to JX-723.1421; 7) JX-725.001 to JX-725.586; 8) DX-721.0001 - DX-721.5413; 9) DX-724.001 - DX-724.324; 10) DX-744.001 - DX-744.216; 11) DX-800.001 - DX-800.057; 12) DX-801.001 - DX-801.046; The Application is GRANTED and the foregoing documents may be filed under seal. Due to the volume and nature of the documents to be placed under seal, they may be provided on a USB flash drive. Documents created in Microsoft Excel may be provided in native format, and it is not necessary to convert all documents to PDF-A format. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/26/2015) (tn) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

#153

(#153) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings . Document filed by Krista Lake.(Ferguson, Meghan) Modified on 10/27/2015 (db). (Entered: 10/26/2015)

#152

(#152) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings . Document filed by Alan Buerger, Constance Buerger, Reid Buerger, Coventry First LLC, LST Holdings Ltd., LST I LLC, LST II LLC, Krista Lake, Montgomery Capital, Inc. (Ferguson, Meghan) Modified on 10/27/2015 (db). (Entered: 10/26/2015)

153 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#160) RULING ON DEPOSITION. ***Accepted for filing as a docket and file by Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#159) DEPOSITION of Neal Jacobs with Exhibits. ***Accepted for filing as a docket and file by Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#158) POST TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by Lavastone Capital LLC.(Mastro, Randy) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#157) POST TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by Alan Buerger, Reid Buerger, Coventry First LLC, LST Holdings Ltd., LST I LLC, LST II LLC, Krista Lake, Montgomery Capital, Inc..(Ferguson, Meghan) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#156) NOTICE of Letter. Document filed by Krista Lake. (Ferguson, Meghan) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#155) NOTICE of Letter. Document filed by Alan Buerger, Constance Buerger, Reid Buerger, Coventry First LLC, LST Holdings Ltd., LST I LLC, LST II LLC, Krista Lake, Montgomery Capital, Inc.. (Ferguson, Meghan) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#154) ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on the application of Defendants in Case No. 14-cv-7139 to file the following documents under seal (discussed with the Court on September 18, 2015): 1) JX-717.001 to JX-717.689; 2) JX-718.001 to JX-718.350; 3) JX-719.001 to JX-719.275; 4) JX-720.0001 to JX-720.7422; 5) JX-722.001 to JX-722.283; 6) JX-723.0001 to JX-723.1421; 7) JX-725.001 to JX-725.586; 8) DX-721.0001 - DX-721.5413; 9) DX-724.001 - DX-724.324; 10) DX-744.001 - DX-744.216; 11) DX-800.001 - DX-800.057; 12) DX-801.001 - DX-801.046; The Application is GRANTED and the foregoing documents may be filed under seal. Due to the volume and nature of the documents to be placed under seal, they may be provided on a USB flash drive. Documents created in Microsoft Excel may be provided in native format, and it is not necessary to convert all documents to PDF-A format. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/26/2015) (tn) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#153) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings . Document filed by Krista Lake.(Ferguson, Meghan) Modified on 10/27/2015 (db). (Entered: 10/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#152) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings . Document filed by Alan Buerger, Constance Buerger, Reid Buerger, Coventry First LLC, LST Holdings Ltd., LST I LLC, LST II LLC, Krista Lake, Montgomery Capital, Inc. (Ferguson, Meghan) Modified on 10/27/2015 (db). (Entered: 10/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#151) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on Transcript of Video Deposition of Constance Buerger on 3/24/2015. ENDORSEMENT: Court's rulings: "O" objection overruled (evidence admitted) "O"= objection sustained (evidence excluded-including exclusion of evidence offered only if party's objection is not sustained). SO ORDERED. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/21/2015) (As per chambers, see original transcript in court file.)(tro) Modified on 9/25/2015 (tro). (Entered: 09/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
140 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for William P. Ashworth to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10156801. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alan Buerger, Constance Buerger, Reid Buerger, Coventry First LLC, LST Holdings Ltd., LST I LLC, LST II LLC, Krista Lake, Montgomery Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing - DC, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing - TX, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ashworth, William) (Entered: 09/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Ryan T. Scarborough to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10156722. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alan Buerger, Constance Buerger, Reid Buerger, Coventry First LLC, LST Holdings Ltd., LST I LLC, LST II LLC, Krista Lake, Montgomery Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing DC, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing - VA, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarborough, Ryan) (Entered: 09/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Kenneth J. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10156639. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alan Buerger, Constance Buerger, Reid Buerger, Coventry First LLC, LST Holdings Ltd., LST I LLC, LST II LLC, Krista Lake, Montgomery Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DC - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit VA - Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Kenneth) Modified on 9/30/2014 (bcu). (Entered: 09/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Heidi K. Hubbard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10156538. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alan Buerger, Constance Buerger, Reid Buerger, Coventry First LLC, LST Holdings Ltd., LST I LLC, LST II LLC, Krista Lake, Montgomery Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Utah Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Heidi) (Entered: 09/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Alan Buerger waiver sent on 9/5/2014, answer due 11/4/2014; Constance Buerger waiver sent on 9/5/2014, answer due 11/4/2014; Reid Buerger waiver sent on 9/5/2014, answer due 11/4/2014; Coventry First LLC waiver sent on 9/5/2014, answer due 11/4/2014; LST Holdings Ltd. waiver sent on 9/5/2014, answer due 11/4/2014; LST I LLC waiver sent on 9/5/2014, answer due 11/4/2014; LST II LLC waiver sent on 9/5/2014, answer due 11/4/2014; Krista Lake waiver sent on 9/5/2014, answer due 11/4/2014; Montgomery Capital, Inc. waiver sent on 9/5/2014, answer due 11/4/2014. Document filed by Lavastone Capital LLC. (Hallowell, James) (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: The Honorable Jed S. Rakoff, U.S.D.J. has ordered that counsel for all parties attend a conference, at the time and place fixed below, for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. You are directed to furnish all attorneys in this action with copies of this notice and enclosures, and to furnish Chambers with a copy of any transmittal letter(s). If you are unaware of the identity of counsel forany of the parties, you should send a copy of the notice and rules to that party personally, informing the party that any unrepresented party is required to appear at the conference in person. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 10-16-2014, AT THE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 500 PEARL STREET, NEW YORK, N.Y. IN COURTROOM 14-B AT 11:00A.M. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/16/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/17/2014) (ama) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Graphite Management LLC, Corporate Parent American International Group Inc. for Lavastone Capital LLC. Document filed by Lavastone Capital LLC.(Mastro, Randy) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 09-cv-1086. Document filed by Alan Buerger, Constance Buerger, Reid Buerger, Coventry First LLC, LST Holdings Ltd., LST I LLC, LST II LLC, Krista Lake, Montgomery Capital, Inc..(moh) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Alan Buerger, Constance Buerger, Reid Buerger, Coventry First LLC, LST Holdings Ltd., LST I LLC, LST II LLC, Krista Lake, Montgomery Capital, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401104143)Document filed by Lavastone Capital LLC.(moh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2014: # 1 Exhibit A) (moh). (Entered: 09/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.