This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2016 at 19:46:43 (UTC).

Laura Dana v. The Hershey Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2015 Laura Dana filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against The Hershey Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-04453

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laura Dana

Defendants

The Hershey Company

Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steve W. Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1918 Eighth Avenue, Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98101

Elaine T. Byszewski

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shaprio LLP

301 N. Lake Avenue, Suite 203

Pasadena, CA 91101

Ashley A Bede

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1918 Eighth Avenue, Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98101

Kevin Kamuf Green

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro

701 B Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Christopher Robert Pitoun

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

301 North Lake Avenue, Suite 203

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant Attorneys

Jonah M Knobler

Attorney at Patterson Belknap Webb and Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Steven A. Zalesin

Attorney at Patterson Belknap Webb and Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-6710

Gary T. Lafayette

Attorney at Lafayette & Kumagai LLP

101 Mission Street, Suite 600

San Francisco, CA 94105-1738

Brian H. Chun

Attorney at Lafayette & Kumagai LLP

101 Mission Street, Suite 600

San Francisco, CA 94105-1738

Travis J. Tu

Attorney at Patterson Belknap Webb and Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Byszewski, Elaine) (Filed on 9/28/2015) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

#3

(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery Corporation, The Hershey Company. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Laura Dana.. (Byszewski, Elaine) (Filed on 10/12/2015) (Entered: 10/12/2015)

#7

(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9917197.) filed by Laura Dana. (Bede, Ashley) (Filed on 10/15/2015) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#8

(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9917246.) filed by Laura Dana. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/15/2015) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#9

(#9) Order, signed 10/16/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Ashley Bede.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

#30

(#30) REPLY (re 22 MOTION to Dismiss / Hersheys Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byHershey Chocolate & Confectionery Corporation, The Hershey Company. (Zalesin, Steven) (Filed on 2/19/2016) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

#31

(#31) Request for Judicial Notice re 22 MOTION to Dismiss / Hersheys Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof / Supplemental Request filed byHershey Chocolate & Confectionery Corporation, The Hershey Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 22 ) (Zalesin, Steven) (Filed on 2/19/2016) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

#32

(#32) CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to 22 MOTION to Dismiss / Hersheys Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Regardless of whether the Court reschedules the hearing date, all opposition and reply papers shall be timely filed pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-7(d). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#33

(#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Kamuf Green (Green, Kevin) (Filed on 3/2/2016) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

#34

(#34) Letter from BRIAN H. CHUN [LETTER TO THE HONORABLE JOSEPH C. SPERO FROM BRIAN H. CHUN]. (Chun, Brian) (Filed on 3/15/2016) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

#35

(#35) ORDER GRANTING re 34 Letter filed by Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery Corporation, The Hershey Company for Gary Lafayette to appear by phone on 3/18/16 at 2:00 PM. Signed, as modified, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/16/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016) (Entered: 03/16/2016)

#36

(#36) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Motion Hearing held on 3/18/2016 re 22 MOTION to Dismiss / Hersheys Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery Corporation, The Hershey Company. Motion submitted.FTR Time FTR 2:01-2:52. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/21/2016) (Entered: 03/21/2016)

#37

(#37) Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 22 Motion to Dismiss. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016) (Entered: 03/29/2016)

#38

(#38) CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery Corporation, The Hershey Company against Laura Dana (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016) (Entered: 03/30/2016)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery Corporation, The Hershey Company against Laura Dana (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016) (Entered: 03/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 22 Motion to Dismiss. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016) (Entered: 03/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Motion Hearing held on 3/18/2016 re 22 MOTION to Dismiss / Hersheys Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery Corporation, The Hershey Company. Motion submitted.FTR Time FTR 2:01-2:52. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/21/2016) (Entered: 03/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) ORDER GRANTING re 34 Letter filed by Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery Corporation, The Hershey Company for Gary Lafayette to appear by phone on 3/18/16 at 2:00 PM. Signed, as modified, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/16/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016) (Entered: 03/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Letter from BRIAN H. CHUN [LETTER TO THE HONORABLE JOSEPH C. SPERO FROM BRIAN H. CHUN]. (Chun, Brian) (Filed on 3/15/2016) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Kamuf Green (Green, Kevin) (Filed on 3/2/2016) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to 22 MOTION to Dismiss / Hersheys Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Regardless of whether the Court reschedules the hearing date, all opposition and reply papers shall be timely filed pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-7(d). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Request for Judicial Notice re 22 MOTION to Dismiss / Hersheys Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof / Supplemental Request filed byHershey Chocolate & Confectionery Corporation, The Hershey Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 22 ) (Zalesin, Steven) (Filed on 2/19/2016) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) REPLY (re 22 MOTION to Dismiss / Hersheys Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byHershey Chocolate & Confectionery Corporation, The Hershey Company. (Zalesin, Steven) (Filed on 2/19/2016) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byLaura Dana. (Related document(s) 25 , 22 ) (Byszewski, Elaine) (Filed on 2/17/2016) (Entered: 02/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Order, signed 10/16/15, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Steve Berman.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order, signed 10/16/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Ashley Bede.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9917246.) filed by Laura Dana. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/15/2015) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9917197.) filed by Laura Dana. (Bede, Ashley) (Filed on 10/15/2015) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Laura Dana.. (Byszewski, Elaine) (Filed on 10/12/2015) (Entered: 10/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery Corporation, The Hershey Company. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Byszewski, Elaine) (Filed on 9/28/2015) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violation of California Consumer Protection Laws; Demand for Jury Trial against Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery Corporation, The Hershey Company (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-9871464.). Filed by Laura Dana. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Byszewski, Elaine) (Filed on 9/28/2015) Modified on 9/29/2015 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less